EP3283181 - PENETRATION FIRESTOP SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.07.2022 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.01.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2018/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HULTEEN, John C. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
FROST, George W. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
HAFFNER, Richard J. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
SCHMIDT, Ernst L. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2018/08] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2018/08] | Application number, filing date | 16780438.4 | 30.03.2016 | [2018/08] | WO2016US24821 | Priority number, date | US201562149122P | 17.04.2015 Original published format: US 201562149122 P | [2018/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016167956 | Date: | 20.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3283181 | Date: | 21.02.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 20.10.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/94, F16L5/04, // F16L5/14 | [2018/51] | CPC: |
E04B1/948 (EP,CN,US);
A62C2/065 (CN,US);
E04B1/947 (US);
E04B1/6801 (US);
E04B1/6803 (US);
F16L5/025 (EP,US);
F16L5/04 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/08] | A62C2/06, E04C2/00, E04B1/94 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/08] | Title | German: | EINDRINGBRANDSCHUTZSYSTEM | [2018/08] | English: | PENETRATION FIRESTOP SYSTEM | [2018/08] | French: | SYSTÈME COUPE-FEU POUR PÉNÉTRATIONS | [2018/08] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2017 | Search fee paid | 17.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/08] | 17.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]JPH0742271 (RONBITSUKU JAPAN KK) [X] 1,5,6,8,11,12,14 * figure - * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0038] * [Y] 2,4,13 [I] 3,7,9,10,15; | [A]US2006027388 (COLLINS P M [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0027] , [0028] ** figure - *; | [Y]US2010159180 (SEGUR DAVID G [US]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraphs [0073] , [0074] * * figures 10-14,25-26 *; | [Y]US2012097405 (CORDTS BRANDON L [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0028] * * figure - * | International search | [A]US6536169 (DYKHOFF MICHAEL G [US]) [A] 1-10* See abstract, claims 1-8 and figure 1-6. *; | [Y]WO03038206 (GRACE W R & CO [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * See abstract, page 5, lines 1-12, page 24, line 29 - page 31, line 24, claims 47-50 and figures 3-5, 12-15. *; | [A]US2009197060 (CHO JAE-KU [KR]) [A] 1-10 * See abstract, claim 1 and figures 1-5. *; | [A]US2011302860 (CORDTS BRANDON L [US]) [A] 1-10 * See abstract, claim 8 and figures 1-8. *; | [Y]US2012097405 (CORDTS BRANDON L [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * See abstract, paragraph [0020], claim 1 and figure 2. * |