EP3350157 - COMPOUNDS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR INTRACELLULAR DELIVERY OF THERAPEUTIC AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.08.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.08.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.12.2022 [2022/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ModernaTX, Inc. 200 Technology Square Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2022/23] |
Former [2018/30] | For all designated states Modernatx, Inc. 200 Technology Square Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENENATO, Kerry, E. 200 Technology Square Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 02 /
KUMARASINGHE, Ellalahewage, Sathyajith 200 Technology Square Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 03 /
CORNEBISE, Mark 200 Technology Square Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2018/30] | Representative(s) | Cooley (UK) LLP 22 Bishopsgate London EC2N 4BQ / GB | [2022/01] |
Former [2018/30] | Cooley (UK) LLP Dashwood 69 Old Broad Street London EC2M 1QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 16781895.4 | 16.09.2016 | [2018/30] | WO2016US52352 | Priority number, date | US201562220085P | 17.09.2015 Original published format: US 201562220085 P | US201562220091P | 17.09.2015 Original published format: US 201562220091 P | US201562252316P | 06.11.2015 Original published format: US 201562252316 P | US201562253433P | 10.11.2015 Original published format: US 201562253433 P | US201562266460P | 11.12.2015 Original published format: US 201562266460 P | US201662333557P | 09.05.2016 Original published format: US 201662333557 P | US201662382740P | 01.09.2016 Original published format: US 201662382740 P | US201662393940P | 13.09.2016 Original published format: US 201662393940 P | [2018/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2017049245 | Date: | 23.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3350157 | Date: | 25.07.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3350157 | Date: | 05.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07C229/12, C07D233/72, A61K9/127, C07C271/20, C07C279/12, C07C279/28, C07C279/32, C07C311/07, C07C311/49, C07C321/14, C07D249/04, C07D263/20, C07C237/04, C07C237/06, C07D265/33, C07D271/06, C07D271/10, C07D207/27, C07D277/38 | [2018/30] | CPC: |
C07C229/12 (EP,US);
A61K31/7105 (EP,US);
A61K38/1725 (EP,US);
A61K38/1816 (EP,US);
A61K47/543 (EP,US);
A61K47/6911 (EP,US);
A61K48/0033 (US);
A61K48/005 (US);
A61K9/0019 (EP,US);
A61K9/0043 (EP,US);
A61K9/0073 (EP,US);
A61K9/127 (US);
A61K9/1272 (EP,US);
A61K9/1617 (US);
A61K9/1641 (US);
A61K9/5123 (US);
A61K9/5146 (US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
C07C227/16 (US);
C07C227/18 (US);
C07C229/16 (EP,US);
C07C233/36 (EP,US);
C07C233/72 (US);
C07C235/10 (EP,US);
C07C255/24 (EP,US);
C07C263/20 (US);
C07C271/20 (EP,US);
C07C275/14 (EP,US);
C07C279/12 (EP,US);
C07C279/24 (EP,US);
C07C279/28 (EP,US);
C07C279/32 (EP,US);
C07C311/05 (EP,US);
C07C335/08 (EP,US);
C07D207/27 (EP,US);
C07D233/72 (EP,US);
C07D249/04 (EP,US);
C07D263/20 (EP,US);
C07D265/33 (EP,US);
C07D271/06 (EP,US);
C07D271/10 (EP,US);
C07D277/38 (EP,US);
C07F9/091 (EP,US);
C07K14/505 (US);
A61K48/00 (US);
A61K9/1271 (EP,US);
C07C2601/02 (EP,US);
C07C2601/04 (EP,US);
C07C2601/14 (EP,US);
C07C2601/18 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGEN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR INTRAZELLULÄREN VERABREICHUNG VON THERAPEUTISCHEN WIRKSTOFFEN | [2018/30] | English: | COMPOUNDS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR INTRACELLULAR DELIVERY OF THERAPEUTIC AGENTS | [2018/30] | French: | COMPOSÉS ET COMPOSITIONS POUR L'ADMINISTRATION INTRACELLULAIRE D'AGENTS THÉRAPEUTIQUES | [2018/30] | Entry into regional phase | 17.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 17.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/30] | 17.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.11.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP20180006.7 / EP3736261 | EP23202539.5 | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5807861 (KLEIN J PETER [US], et al) [X] 1-4,10,21,22,42,43,45,76,77,108-111 * column 21; compound 3563 * * column 23; compounds 3584, 3593 * * column 25; compound 5574 ** column 27; compound 6533 *; | [I]WO2009086558 (TEKMIRA PHARMACEUTICALS CORP [CA], et al) [I] 1-4,10-75,78-83,85,86,101,104-188 * Claim 3: in particular fourth and fifth aminolipid structure on page 157 * * claims 4, 10, 11 *; | [Y]WO2009129395 (ABBOTT LAB [US], et al) [Y] 1-5,10-75,78-86,101,104-188 * claims 1-3 *; | [Y]WO2009129385 (ABBOTT LAB [US], et al) [Y] 1-5,10-75,78-86,101,104-188 * claims 1-3 *; | [Y]WO2010030739 (ABBOTT LAB [US], et al) [Y] 1-5,10-75,78-86,101,104-188 * claims 1-3 *; | [I]WO2013016058 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [US], et al) [I] 1-5,10-75,78-86,101,104-188 * page 15 - page 20; compounds 6-30 * * page 1, line 6 - line 37 *; | [XP]WO2015199952 (ACUITAS THERAPEUTICS INC [CA]) [XP] 1-5,10,11,14,15,30,32,34,40,42-45,53,54,69,73,84,105,108,110,111,127,130,131 * precursor C-3 in examples 31 to 33 and 36 according to general reaction scheme 3 *; | [E]WO2016176330 (UNIV PENNSYLVANIA [US], et al) [E] 1-5,10,11,14,15,30,32,34,40,42-45,53,54,69,73,84,105,108,110,111,127,130,131 * page 92 - page 96; table 3 * | by applicant | US4270537 | US4596556 | US4790824 | US4886499 | US4940460 | US4941880 | US5015235 | US5064413 | US5141496 | US5190521 | US5312335 | US5328483 | US5334144 | US5339163 | US5383851 | US5417662 | US5466220 | US5480381 | US5503627 | US5520639 | US5527288 | US5569189 | US5599302 | WO9713537 | US5649912 | WO9737705 | US5704911 | US5893397 | WO9924595 | WO9934850 | US5993412 | WO0155369 | WO0155371 | US6310197 | WO02098443 | WO03051401 | WO2004004743 | US6849405 | WO2005016376 | US2005222064 | WO2006024518 | WO2006122828 | US7183395 | US2007048776 | WO2007025008 | WO2007095976 | WO2008014979 | WO2008016473 | WO2008052770 | WO2008077592 | WO2008083949 | WO2008127688 | US7456273 | US7468275 | WO2009030481 | US2009093049 | WO2009075886 | WO2009095226 | US2009226470 | WO2009127230 | WO2010037539 | WO2010088927 | WO2011015347 | WO2011026641 | US2011124100 | WO2011069586 | WO2011144358 | WO2012009644 | WO2012013326 | WO2012019780 | WO2012089338 | WO2012113513 | WO2012116811 | WO2012116810 | EP2610341 | EP2610340 | US2013177581 | WO2013103659 | WO2013113502 | WO2013113501 | WO2013113736 | WO2013120626 | WO2013120627 | WO2013120628 | WO2013120629 | WO2013120497 | WO2013120500 | WO2013120498 | WO2013120499 | US8519110 | WO2013143698 | WO2013143699 | WO2013143700 | WO2013174409 | WO2014127917 | WO2015002667 | WO2015024669 | WO2015024668 | WO2015024667 | WO2015024665 | WO2015024666 | WO2015024664 | WO2015062738 | WO2015101415 | WO2015101414 | WO2015101416 | - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, 17th ed.,, MACK PUBLISHING COMPANY, (1985), page 1418 | - BERGE ET AL., JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCE, (1977), vol. 66, pages 1 - 19 | - KORE ET AL., BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (2013), vol. 21, pages 4570 - 4574 | - PANEK ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (2013), pages 1 - 10 | - CHAPPELL ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2004), vol. 101, pages 9590 - 9594 | - ZHOU ET AL., PNAS, (2005), vol. 102, pages 6273 - 6278 |