EP3306610 - RECORDING DEVICE, RECORDING METHOD, OPTICAL RECORDING MEDIUM, REPRODUCTION DEVICE, REPRODUCTION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2021/30] |
Former [2018/15] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IKUTA, Kazuki c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2018/15] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2018/15] | Application number, filing date | 16799651.1 | 23.03.2016 | [2018/15] | WO2016JP59161 | Priority number, date | JP20150106576 | 26.05.2015 Original published format: JP 2015106576 | [2018/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016189943 | Date: | 01.12.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3306610 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.12.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/0045, G11B7/007, G11B7/1263, G11B7/1267 | [2018/15] | CPC: |
G11B7/1267 (EP,US);
G11B7/0045 (EP,US);
G11B7/007 (US);
G11B7/0079 (US);
G11B7/1263 (US);
G11B2007/0013 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/15] | Title | German: | AUFZEICHNUNGSVORRICHTUNG, AUFZEICHNUNGSVERFAHREN, OPTISCHES AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM, WIEDERGABEVORRICHTUNG, WIEDERGABEVERFAHREN | [2018/15] | English: | RECORDING DEVICE, RECORDING METHOD, OPTICAL RECORDING MEDIUM, REPRODUCTION DEVICE, REPRODUCTION METHOD | [2018/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ENREGISTREMENT, PROCÉDÉ D'ENREGISTREMENT, SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT OPTIQUE, DISPOSITIF DE REPRODUCTION, PROCÉDÉ DE REPRODUCTION | [2018/15] | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.2017 | Translation filed | 17.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.2017 | Search fee paid | 17.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/15] | 17.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.10.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 05.10.2022 | 05.10.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 17.10.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2023/10] | 27.10.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2006153055 (SUH SANG W [KR]) [X] 1-11 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0067]; figures 2-9 *; | [A]US2011194393 (AKIMOTO YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0245] - paragraph [0610]; figures 11-26 *; | [A]US2011317535 (MIYAMOTO HARUKAZU [JP], et al) [A] 1-11* paragraph [0104] - paragraph [0110]; figures 1,2 * | International search | [A]JP2005071470 (RICOH KK) [A] 1-12* , claims 1 to 5 & US 2005/0052975 A1 claims 1 to 17 *; | [A]JP2005302086 (SHARP KK) [A] 1-12 * , paragraphs [0024] to [0027]; fig. 3 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2011138575 (HITACHI CONSUMER ELECTRONICS) [A] 1-12 * , fig. 2, 3 & US 2011/0158069 A1 fig. 2, 3 & CN 102110447 A *; | [A]JP2013218782 (PANASONIC CORP) [A] 1-12 * , paragraphs [0097] to [0108]; fig. 3 & US 2011/0096643 A1 paragraphs [0131] to [0140]; fig. 3 & WO 2010/050143 A1 & EP 2341500 A1 & MX 2010013194 A & CN 102077281 A & TW 201025308 A & KR 10-2011-0074956 A & RU 2010154076 A *; | [A]JP2013225360 (SONY CORP) [A] 1-12 * , fig. 7 & US 2013/0279316 A1 fig. 7 & CN 103377663 A *; | [XA]JP2014071922 (HITACHI LG DATA STORAGE INC, et al) [X] 1, 5, 6, 9-12 * , paragraphs [0028] to [0037] (Family: none) * [A] 2-4, 7, 8 |