EP3361946 - GUIDING SYSTEM FOR THE INSERTION OF A MEDICAL NEEDLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 26.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.06.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.04.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amorizzo, Ezio Via Trionfale 7683 00135 Roma / IT | For all designated states Cusano, Andrea Via Ferrarecce, 75 81100 Caserta / IT | For all designated states Cutolo, Antonello Via Parthenope 5 80121 Napoli / IT | For all designated states Mercieri, Marco Via Pavia 124 00161 Roma / IT | For all designated states Micco, Alberto Via Enrico Fermi snc 82100 Benevento / IT | For all designated states Ricciardi, Armando C.da Pezzapiana 18 82100 Benevento / IT | [2018/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2018/34] | Representative(s) | Celona, Antonio, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2018/34] | Celona, Antonio, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 16812822.1 | 17.10.2016 | [2018/34] | WO2016IB56212 | Priority number, date | IT2015UB05218 | 16.10.2015 Original published format: IT UB20155218 | [2018/34] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017064682 | Date: | 20.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3361946 | Date: | 22.08.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3361946 | Date: | 31.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/34, A61B17/00, A61B5/06, G02B6/02, A61M25/01, A61B34/20 | [2019/11] | CPC: |
A61B5/065 (EP,US);
A61B17/3403 (US);
A61B17/3401 (EP,US);
A61B34/20 (US);
G02B6/02076 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00022 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00057 (EP,US);
A61B2017/3409 (EP,US);
A61B2034/2061 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0166 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/34] | A61B5/06, G02B6/02, A61M25/01, A61B34/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FÜHRUNGSSYSTEM ZUR EINFÜHRUNG EINER MEDIZINISCHEN NADEL | [2018/34] | English: | GUIDING SYSTEM FOR THE INSERTION OF A MEDICAL NEEDLE | [2018/34] | French: | SYSTÈME DE GUIDAGE POUR L'INSERTION D'UNE AIGUILLE MÉDICALE | [2018/34] | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/34] | 16.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.06.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 31.07.2019 | CY | 31.07.2019 | EE | 31.07.2019 | LT | 31.07.2019 | LV | 31.07.2019 | MC | 31.07.2019 | MK | 31.07.2019 | MT | 31.07.2019 | SI | 31.07.2019 | LU | 17.10.2019 | IS | 30.10.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/34] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
CY | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
MT | 31.07.2019 | ||
SI | 31.07.2019 | ||
LU | 17.10.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
CY | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
SI | 31.07.2019 | ||
LU | 17.10.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
SI | 31.07.2019 | ||
LU | 17.10.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
LU | 17.10.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
LU | 17.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
IS | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
IS | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | LT | 31.07.2019 | |
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
IS | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 31.07.2019 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US8050523 (YOUNGE ROBERT G [US], et al); | [YA]WO2012159000 (SOLODEX LLC [US], et al); | [A]WO2015023665 (INTUITIVE SURGICAL OPERATIONS [US]); | [Y]US2015190123 (PARK YONG-LAE [US], et al) |