EP3313490 - TUBING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Linear Health Sciences, LLC 5333 Wisteria Dr. Oklahoma City, OK 73142 / US | [2021/02] |
Former [2018/18] | For all designated states Linear Health Science, LLC 4501 Farm Hill Road Norman, OK 73072 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DENNIS, Ryan Wayne 5333 Wisteria Dr. Oklahoma City, OK 73142 / US | 02 /
CLARK, Daniel, Lawrence 3111 Highland Avenue Unit A Manhattan Beach, CA 90266 / US | 03 /
WATERS, Adam, James 3606 Fiday Road Joliet, IL 60431 / US | [2021/08] |
Former [2020/47] | 01 /
RYAN, Wayne, Dennis 5333 Wisteria Dr. Oklahoma City, OK 73142 / US | ||
02 /
CLARK, Daniel, Lawrence 3111 Highland Avenue Unit A Manhattan Beach, CA 90266 / US | |||
03 /
WATERS, Adam, James 3606 Fiday Road Joliet, IL 60431 / US | |||
Former [2018/25] | 01 /
RYAN, Wayne, Dennis 4501 Farm Hill Road Norman, OK 73072 / US | ||
02 /
CLARK, Daniel, Lawrence 3111 Highland Avenue Unit A Manhattan Beach, CA 90266 / US | |||
03 /
WATERS, Adam, James 3606 Fiday Road Joliet, IL 60431 / US | |||
Former [2018/18] | 01 /
RYAN, Wayne, Dennis 4501 Farm Hill Road Norman, OK 73072 / US | ||
02 /
CLARK, Daniel, Lawrence 4407 Crest Drive Manhattan Beach, CA 90226 / US | |||
03 /
WATERS, Adam, James 4645 Park Commons Drive Apt. 510 St. Louis Park, MN 55416 / US | Representative(s) | Stephenson, Philip Bailey Walsh & Co LLP 1 York Place Leeds, LS1 2DR / GB | [2018/18] | Application number, filing date | 16815404.5 | 24.06.2016 | [2018/18] | WO2016US39318 | Priority number, date | US201562183996P | 24.06.2015 Original published format: US 201562183996 P | [2018/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016210300 | Date: | 29.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3313490 | Date: | 02.05.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3313490 | Date: | 13.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/02] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP3313490 | Date: | 31.03.2021 | [2021/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.12.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61M16/08, A61M25/18, A61M39/10, F16L37/138 | [2018/18] | CPC: |
A61M39/1011 (EP,GB,US);
A61M39/26 (US);
A61M2039/1027 (EP,US);
A61M2039/1061 (EP,US);
A61M2039/267 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/18] | Extension states | BA | 15.01.2018 | ME | 15.01.2018 | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROHRLEITUNGSSYSTEM | [2018/18] | English: | TUBING SYSTEM | [2018/18] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TUBAGE | [2018/18] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2018 | Search fee paid | 15.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/18] | 15.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.10.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.10.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.06.2016 | AL | 13.01.2021 | CY | 13.01.2021 | CZ | 13.01.2021 | EE | 13.01.2021 | FI | 13.01.2021 | HR | 13.01.2021 | LT | 13.01.2021 | LV | 13.01.2021 | MC | 13.01.2021 | RO | 13.01.2021 | RS | 13.01.2021 | SI | 13.01.2021 | SK | 13.01.2021 | SM | 13.01.2021 | BG | 13.04.2021 | GR | 14.04.2021 | IS | 13.05.2021 | PT | 13.05.2021 | LU | 24.06.2021 | [2023/33] |
Former [2023/30] | AL | 13.01.2021 | |
CY | 13.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SI | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
LU | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 13.01.2021 | |
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SI | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
LU | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 13.01.2021 | |
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SI | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
LU | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 13.01.2021 | |
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SI | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 13.01.2021 | |
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 13.01.2021 | |
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | CZ | 13.01.2021 | |
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | CZ | 13.01.2021 | |
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 13.01.2021 | |
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | FI | 13.01.2021 | |
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 13.01.2021 | |
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 13.01.2021 | |
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 13.01.2021 | |
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 13.01.2021 | |
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2008287920 (FANGROW THOMAS F [US], et al) [X] 9,15 * figures 23c, 64ff., 82a, 82b * * paragraphs [0300] , [ 304] , [ 335] - [0338] * [I] 1-8,10-14,17-20; | [A]US2010256573 (MANSOUR GEORGE M [US], et al) [A] 1-20* paragraph [46ff.]; figures 10a-d *; | [XI]WO2011029056 (BRAUN MELSUNGEN AG [DE], et al) [X] 1 * figure 33 * * paragraphs [0002] , [ 189] , [ 191] * [I] 2-8; | [I]WO2012088463 (COLDER PROD CO [US], et al) [I] 1,9-14 * paragraph [0049]; figure 38 * * paragraph [46ff.] * | International search | [A]US3831629 (MACKAL G, et al) [A] 1-8 * ; figure 8; column 1, lines 1-16; column 6, lines 21-32 *; | [A]US5405336 (AUSTIN JON W [US], et al) [A] 1-14, 17-20 * ; figures 1, 2a-b; column 4, lines 47-63; column 5, lines 1-11, 34-67 *; | [X]US2004171993 (BONALDO JEAN M [US]) [X] 15-16 * ; figures 3a, 10; paragraphs [0045], [0048]) *; | [A]US2008103476 (SCHULTE GREGORY T [US]) [A] 9-14, 17-20* ; figure 1; paragraph [0018] *; | [A]US2013104884 (VAZALES BRAD EUGENE [US], et al) [A] 1-14, 17-20 * ; figure 3b; paragraphs [0143], [0146], [0155] * |