EP3391245 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REMOTE PARENTAL CONTROL OF CONTENT VIEWING IN AUGMENTED REALITY SETTINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.02.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, Rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [2018/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OSWAL, Urvashi c/o Technicolor USA Inc 175 South San Antonio Rd Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | 02 /
ERIKSSON, Brian c/o Technicolor USA Inc 175 South San Antonio Rd Los Altos, California 94022 / US | 03 /
LIM, Cong Han c/o Technicolor USA Inc 175 South San Antonio Rd Los Altos, California 94022 / US | 04 /
SEIFI, Hasti c/o Technicolor USA Inc 175 South San Antonio Rd Los Altos, California 94022 / US | 05 /
BHAMIDIPATI, Subrahmanya Sandilya c/o Technicolor USA Inc 175 South San Antonio Rd Los Altos, California 94022 / US | 06 /
HAMIDI-RAD, Shahab c/o Technicolor USA Inc 175 South San Antonio Rd Los Altos, California 94022 / US | 07 /
NATARAJAN, Annamalai c/o Technicolor USA Inc 175 South San Antonio Rd Los Altos, California 94022 / US | 08 /
SYMINELAKIS, Paris c/o Technicolor USA Inc 175 South San Antonio Rd Los Altos, California 94022 / US | [2018/43] | Representative(s) | Vidon Brevets & Stratégie 16B, rue de Jouanet BP 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | [2018/43] | Application number, filing date | 16816651.0 | 15.12.2016 | [2018/43] | WO2016EP81265 | Priority number, date | US201562268644P | 17.12.2015 Original published format: US 201562268644 P | US201562268640P | 17.12.2015 Original published format: US 201562268640 P | [2018/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017102988 | Date: | 22.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3391245 | Date: | 24.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2018/43] | CPC: |
G06F16/783 (EP,US);
G02B27/0172 (US);
G06F16/739 (EP,US);
G06F16/78 (EP,US);
G06F18/23213 (US);
G06T19/006 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR ENTFERNTE ELTERLICHE KONTROLLE VON INHALT, DER IN EINSTELLUNGEN MIT ERWEITERTER REALITÄT ANGESEHEN WIRD | [2018/43] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REMOTE PARENTAL CONTROL OF CONTENT VIEWING IN AUGMENTED REALITY SETTINGS | [2018/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE CONTRÔLE PARENTAL À DISTANCE DE VISUALISATION DE CONTENU DANS DES RÉGLAGES DE RÉALITÉ AUGMENTÉE | [2018/43] | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/43] | 18.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.02.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/12] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2018 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2002147782 (DIMITROVA NEVENKA [US], et al) [I] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraphs [0013] , [0018] , [0019] * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0059] *; | [Y]US2003093790 (LOGAN JAMES D [US], et al) [Y] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraphs [0162] , [0399] , [0402] *; | [Y]US2005257242 (MONTGOMERY STEPHEN J [US], et al) [Y] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0036] * * figures 3-4 *; | [A]US2007297641 (CRIDDLE LINDA [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * figures 6-8 * * figures 10-11 ** paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0047] * |