EP3323242 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR GENERATING AN AUDIT TRAIL FOR AUDITABLE DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.06.2024 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Axon Enterprise, Inc. 17800 North 85th Street Scottsdale AZ 85255 / US | [2018/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANCHETT, Mark A. c/o Taser International, Inc. 17800 North 85th Street Scottsdale, AZ 85255 / US | 02 /
KLOC, Aaron J. c/o Taser International, Inc. 17800 North 85th Street Scottsdale, AZ 85255 / US | 03 /
CONANT, Tyler J. c/o Taser International, Inc. 17800 North 85th Street Scottsdale, AZ 85255 / US | [2018/21] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/21] | Graham, Emma Louise, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 16824812.8 | 19.02.2016 | [2018/21] | WO2016US18722 | Priority number, date | US201562192466P | 14.07.2015 Original published format: US 201562192466 P | [2018/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017011033 | Date: | 19.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3323242 | Date: | 23.05.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.01.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.01.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/00, H04N21/422, H04N21/436, H04N21/4363, H04N21/00, H04N5/77, H04N7/18 | [2018/52] | CPC: |
H04N21/00 (EP);
H04N5/77 (EP);
H04N5/772 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2018/21] | H04N7/18, H04N5/232, H04N5/225, G06F3/01, G03B17/56 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/21] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINER AUDITSPUR FÜR AUDITIERBARE VORRICHTUNGEN | [2018/21] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR GENERATING AN AUDIT TRAIL FOR AUDITABLE DEVICES | [2018/21] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS PERMETTANT DE GÉNÉRER UNE PISTE DE VÉRIFICATION DESTINÉE À DES DISPOSITIFS VÉRIFIABLES | [2018/21] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2018 | Search fee paid | 01.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/21] | 24.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005078672 (CALISKAN ALAATTIN [US], et al) [A] 1-15* abstract; figures 1-15 *; | [XI]EP2109074 (TASER INT INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4-6,8-10,12-15 * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0090] * * figures 1-8 * [I] 3,7,11; | [A]US2014215885 (SULLIVAN KEVIN MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * | International search | [XY]KR20080093798 (JIN JONG BOK [KR]) [X] 1-3, 6, 8, 15-18 * See paragraphs [0028]-[0046] and figures 1-4. * [Y] 4-5, 7, 9-14, 19-22; | [Y]KR101050710B (TELECOMLAND CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 9-14 * See paragraphs [0032], [0049]-[0079] and figures 1-5. *; | [Y]US2011298736 (MADONNA ROBERT P [US], et al) [Y] 4-5 * See paragraphs [0025], [0035] and figures 1, 3. *; | [Y]KR20120037076 (UNIV SUNGKYUNKWAN FOUND [KR]) [Y] 7 * See paragraph [0025] and figure 3. *; | [Y]KR20150069249 (WATEC [KR]) [Y] 19-22* See paragraphs [0030]-[0033] and figures 1-2. * |