blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3394215

EP3394215 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING A RESIDUAL BASE OIL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2018/44]RESIDUAL BASE OIL
[2021/29]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.09.2022
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.10.2021
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.07.2021
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  19.06.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  28.09.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  05.07.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  24.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.04.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V.
Carel van Bylandtlaan 30
2596 HR The Hague / NL
[2018/44]
Inventor(s)01 / CREYGHTON, Edward, Julius
Grasweg 31
1031 HW Amsterdam / NL
02 / ROMANUKA, Julija
Jan van Nassaustraat 5
2596 BL The Hague / NL
 [2018/44]
Representative(s)Shell Legal Services IP
PO Box 384
2501 CJ The Hague / NL
[2018/44]
Application number, filing date16826059.423.12.2016
[2018/44]
WO2016EP82589
Priority number, dateEP2015020257523.12.2015         Original published format: EP 15202575
[2018/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2017109191
Date:29.06.2017
Language:EN
[2017/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3394215
Date:31.10.2018
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2018/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3394215
Date:03.11.2021
Language:EN
[2021/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.06.2017
ClassificationIPC:C10G65/04, C10G65/12, C10M109/02, C10M107/02, C10N20/02, C10N30/02, C10M171/02, C10M171/04
[2021/29]
CPC:
C10G65/043 (EP,US); C10G69/10 (US); C10G65/12 (EP,US);
C10M105/02 (US); C10M107/02 (EP,US); C10M109/02 (EP,US);
C10M171/02 (EP,US); C10M171/04 (EP,US); C10G2300/1022 (EP,US);
C10G2300/304 (EP,US); C10G2400/10 (EP,US); C10M2205/173 (EP,US);
C10N2020/02 (EP,US); C10N2030/02 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2018/44]C10G65/04, C10G65/12, C10M109/02, C10M171/02, C10M171/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/44]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES RESTBASISÖLS[2021/29]
English:PROCESS FOR PREPARING A RESIDUAL BASE OIL[2021/29]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'UNE HUILE DE BASE RÉSIDUELLE[2021/29]
Former [2018/44]RESTBASISÖLS
Former [2018/44]RESIDUAL BASE OIL
Former [2018/44]HUILE DE BASE RÉSIDUELLE
Entry into regional phase08.06.2018National basic fee paid 
08.06.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
08.06.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.06.2018Examination requested  [2018/44]
08.06.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
08.02.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.06.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.11.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.02.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.06.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.12.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
18.02.2021Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.07.2021Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.09.2021Fee for grant paid
27.09.2021Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.09.2021Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)04.08.2022No opposition filed within time limit [2022/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
13.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
14.12.2020Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU23.12.2016
AL03.11.2021
AT03.11.2021
CY03.11.2021
CZ03.11.2021
DK03.11.2021
EE03.11.2021
ES03.11.2021
FI03.11.2021
HR03.11.2021
IT03.11.2021
LT03.11.2021
LV03.11.2021
MC03.11.2021
MK03.11.2021
PL03.11.2021
RO03.11.2021
RS03.11.2021
SE03.11.2021
SI03.11.2021
SK03.11.2021
SM03.11.2021
IE23.12.2021
LU23.12.2021
BE31.12.2021
CH31.12.2021
LI31.12.2021
BG03.02.2022
GB03.02.2022
NO03.02.2022
GR04.02.2022
IS03.03.2022
PT03.03.2022
[2024/22]
Former [2023/33]HU23.12.2016
AL03.11.2021
AT03.11.2021
CY03.11.2021
CZ03.11.2021
DK03.11.2021
EE03.11.2021
ES03.11.2021
FI03.11.2021
HR03.11.2021
IT03.11.2021
LT03.11.2021
LV03.11.2021
MC03.11.2021
PL03.11.2021
RO03.11.2021
RS03.11.2021
SE03.11.2021
SI03.11.2021
SK03.11.2021
SM03.11.2021
IE23.12.2021
LU23.12.2021
BE31.12.2021
CH31.12.2021
LI31.12.2021
BG03.02.2022
GB03.02.2022
NO03.02.2022
GR04.02.2022
IS03.03.2022
PT03.03.2022
Former [2023/30]AL03.11.2021
AT03.11.2021
CY03.11.2021
CZ03.11.2021
DK03.11.2021
EE03.11.2021
ES03.11.2021
FI03.11.2021
HR03.11.2021
IT03.11.2021
LT03.11.2021
LV03.11.2021
MC03.11.2021
PL03.11.2021
RO03.11.2021
RS03.11.2021
SE03.11.2021
SI03.11.2021
SK03.11.2021
SM03.11.2021
IE23.12.2021
LU23.12.2021
BE31.12.2021
CH31.12.2021
LI31.12.2021
BG03.02.2022
GB03.02.2022
NO03.02.2022
GR04.02.2022
IS03.03.2022
PT03.03.2022
Former [2023/27]AL03.11.2021
AT03.11.2021
CZ03.11.2021
DK03.11.2021
EE03.11.2021
ES03.11.2021
FI03.11.2021
HR03.11.2021
IT03.11.2021
LT03.11.2021
LV03.11.2021
MC03.11.2021
PL03.11.2021
RO03.11.2021
RS03.11.2021
SE03.11.2021
SI03.11.2021
SK03.11.2021
SM03.11.2021
IE23.12.2021
LU23.12.2021
BE31.12.2021
CH31.12.2021
LI31.12.2021
BG03.02.2022
GB03.02.2022
NO03.02.2022
GR04.02.2022
IS03.03.2022
PT03.03.2022
Former [2023/08]AL03.11.2021
AT03.11.2021
CZ03.11.2021
DK03.11.2021
EE03.11.2021
ES03.11.2021
FI03.11.2021
HR03.11.2021
LT03.11.2021
LV03.11.2021
MC03.11.2021
PL03.11.2021
RO03.11.2021
RS03.11.2021
SE03.11.2021
SI03.11.2021
SK03.11.2021
SM03.11.2021
IE23.12.2021
LU23.12.2021
BE31.12.2021
CH31.12.2021
LI31.12.2021
BG03.02.2022
GB03.02.2022
NO03.02.2022
GR04.02.2022
IS03.03.2022
PT03.03.2022
Former [2023/03]AL03.11.2021
AT03.11.2021
CZ03.11.2021
DK03.11.2021
EE03.11.2021
ES03.11.2021
FI03.11.2021
HR03.11.2021
LT03.11.2021
LV03.11.2021
MC03.11.2021
PL03.11.2021
RO03.11.2021
RS03.11.2021
SE03.11.2021
SI03.11.2021
SK03.11.2021
SM03.11.2021
IE23.12.2021
LU23.12.2021
BE31.12.2021
CH31.12.2021
LI31.12.2021
BG03.02.2022
NO03.02.2022
GR04.02.2022
IS03.03.2022
PT03.03.2022
Former [2023/01]AL03.11.2021
AT03.11.2021
CZ03.11.2021
DK03.11.2021
EE03.11.2021
ES03.11.2021
FI03.11.2021
HR03.11.2021
LT03.11.2021
LV03.11.2021
MC03.11.2021
PL03.11.2021
RO03.11.2021
RS03.11.2021
SE03.11.2021
SI03.11.2021
SK03.11.2021
SM03.11.2021
IE23.12.2021
LU23.12.2021
BE31.12.2021
BG03.02.2022
NO03.02.2022
GR04.02.2022
IS03.03.2022
PT03.03.2022
Former [2022/49]AL03.11.2021
AT03.11.2021
CZ03.11.2021
DK03.11.2021
EE03.11.2021
ES03.11.2021
FI03.11.2021
HR03.11.2021
LT03.11.2021
LV03.11.2021
MC03.11.2021
PL03.11.2021
RO03.11.2021
RS03.11.2021
SE03.11.2021
SK03.11.2021
SM03.11.2021
IE23.12.2021
LU23.12.2021
BG03.02.2022
NO03.02.2022
GR04.02.2022
IS03.03.2022
PT03.03.2022
Former [2022/48]AT03.11.2021
CZ03.11.2021
DK03.11.2021
EE03.11.2021
ES03.11.2021
FI03.11.2021
HR03.11.2021
LT03.11.2021
LV03.11.2021
MC03.11.2021
PL03.11.2021
RO03.11.2021
RS03.11.2021
SE03.11.2021
SK03.11.2021
SM03.11.2021
IE23.12.2021
LU23.12.2021
BG03.02.2022
NO03.02.2022
GR04.02.2022
IS03.03.2022
PT03.03.2022
Former [2022/46]AT03.11.2021
CZ03.11.2021
DK03.11.2021
EE03.11.2021
ES03.11.2021
FI03.11.2021
HR03.11.2021
LT03.11.2021
LV03.11.2021
MC03.11.2021
PL03.11.2021
RO03.11.2021
RS03.11.2021
SE03.11.2021
SK03.11.2021
SM03.11.2021
LU23.12.2021
BG03.02.2022
NO03.02.2022
GR04.02.2022
IS03.03.2022
PT03.03.2022
Former [2022/39]AT03.11.2021
CZ03.11.2021
DK03.11.2021
EE03.11.2021
ES03.11.2021
FI03.11.2021
HR03.11.2021
LT03.11.2021
LV03.11.2021
MC03.11.2021
PL03.11.2021
RO03.11.2021
RS03.11.2021
SE03.11.2021
SK03.11.2021
SM03.11.2021
BG03.02.2022
NO03.02.2022
GR04.02.2022
IS03.03.2022
PT03.03.2022
Former [2022/35]AT03.11.2021
CZ03.11.2021
DK03.11.2021
EE03.11.2021
ES03.11.2021
FI03.11.2021
HR03.11.2021
LT03.11.2021
LV03.11.2021
PL03.11.2021
RO03.11.2021
RS03.11.2021
SE03.11.2021
SK03.11.2021
SM03.11.2021
BG03.02.2022
NO03.02.2022
GR04.02.2022
IS03.03.2022
PT03.03.2022
Former [2022/34]AT03.11.2021
EE03.11.2021
ES03.11.2021
FI03.11.2021
HR03.11.2021
LT03.11.2021
LV03.11.2021
PL03.11.2021
RO03.11.2021
RS03.11.2021
SE03.11.2021
SM03.11.2021
BG03.02.2022
NO03.02.2022
GR04.02.2022
IS03.03.2022
PT03.03.2022
Former [2022/33]AT03.11.2021
ES03.11.2021
FI03.11.2021
HR03.11.2021
LT03.11.2021
LV03.11.2021
PL03.11.2021
RS03.11.2021
SE03.11.2021
SM03.11.2021
BG03.02.2022
NO03.02.2022
GR04.02.2022
IS03.03.2022
PT03.03.2022
Former [2022/25]AT03.11.2021
ES03.11.2021
FI03.11.2021
HR03.11.2021
LT03.11.2021
LV03.11.2021
PL03.11.2021
RS03.11.2021
SE03.11.2021
BG03.02.2022
NO03.02.2022
GR04.02.2022
IS03.03.2022
PT03.03.2022
Former [2022/24]AT03.11.2021
ES03.11.2021
FI03.11.2021
HR03.11.2021
LT03.11.2021
LV03.11.2021
PL03.11.2021
RS03.11.2021
SE03.11.2021
BG03.02.2022
GR04.02.2022
IS03.03.2022
PT03.03.2022
Former [2022/23]AT03.11.2021
ES03.11.2021
FI03.11.2021
HR03.11.2021
LT03.11.2021
LV03.11.2021
PL03.11.2021
RS03.11.2021
BG03.02.2022
PT03.03.2022
Former [2022/22]AT03.11.2021
FI03.11.2021
LT03.11.2021
RS03.11.2021
BG03.02.2022
Former [2022/21]AT03.11.2021
RS03.11.2021
BG03.02.2022
Former [2022/19]BG03.02.2022
Cited inInternational search[X]EP2341122  (JX NIPPON OIL & ENERGY CORP [JP]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0025] , [0 96] *;
 [IY]US2011083995  (GLEESON JAMES W [US], et al) [I] 9 * paragraphs [0039] - [0049] - [0 84] * [Y] 1-9;
 [Y]US3660273  (CUMMINS BILLY H) [Y] 1-9 * column 4, lines 17-26 *;
 [Y]US3670888  (BOROUGHS RAYMOND MILTON, et al) [Y] 1-9 * column 3, lines 1-11, 25-27 *;
 [Y]WO2014001546  (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL], et al) [Y] 1-9 * claims 1-14 *
ExaminationUS2015203769
    - Anonymous, "Oil Viscosity Explained", (20150429), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20150429073921/https://www.kewengineering.co.uk/Auto_oils/oil_viscosity_explained.htm, (20200131), XP055664125
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.