EP3327952 - BASE STATION AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.01.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.02.2020 [2020/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2018/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDO, Takeshi c/o NEC CORPORATION 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2018/22] | Representative(s) | MacDougall, Alan John Shaw, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/22] | MacDougall, Alan John Shaw, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 16827428.0 | 15.07.2016 | [2018/22] | WO2016JP03340 | Priority number, date | JP20150142795 | 17.07.2015 Original published format: JP 2015142795 | [2018/22] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017013861 | Date: | 26.01.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3327952 | Date: | 30.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.01.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/10, H04W16/28, H04W64/00, H04B7/06 | [2019/07] | CPC: |
H04B7/10 (EP);
H04W16/28 (EP);
H04W64/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2018/22] | H04B7/10, H04W16/28, H04W64/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/22] | Title | German: | BASISSTATION UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2018/22] | English: | BASE STATION AND METHOD | [2018/22] | French: | STATION DE BASE ET PROCÉDÉ | [2018/22] | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2018 | Translation filed | 22.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.2018 | Search fee paid | 22.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/22] | 22.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/07] | 20.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2019 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2009247173 (ROSMANN DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-10,12 * paragraph [0034] * * figure 5 * [I] 5,11; | [XI]US2012151207 (ZHAO ZHENLI [CN], et al) [X] 1-4,6-10,12 * paragraphs [0044] - [0049] * * figure 3 *[I] 5,11; | [X]EP2843984 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [X] 1-12 * paragraphs [0042] - [0043] - [0 47] , [0 56] * * figure 10 * | International search | [X]JP2001102979 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1-12 * , paragraph [0055] (Family: none) *; | [X]US2009247173 (ROSMANN DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1-12* , paragraph [0034]; fig. 5, 7 & US 2012/0303757 A1 & US 2013/0281103 A1 *; | [X]US2012151207 (ZHAO ZHENLI [CN], et al) [X] 1-12 * , paragraphs [0044] to [0049]; fig. 6 & WO 2011/023005 A1 & EP 2475201 A1 & CN 102006592 A * |