EP3272402 - GAME CONTROLLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.01.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.10.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.12.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nintendo Co., Ltd. 11-1 Hokotate-cho Kamitoba Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601-8501 / JP | [2018/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSUCHIYA Hitoshi c/o NINTENDO CO. LTD. 11-1 Hokotate-cho Kamitoba Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601-8501 / JP | 02 /
SUETAKE Fumiyoshi c/o NINTENDO CO. LTD. 11-1 Hokotate-cho Kamitoba Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601-8501 / JP | 03 /
OKAMURA Takanori c/o NINTENDO CO. LTD. 11-1 Hokotate-cho Kamitoba Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601-8501 / JP | [2018/04] | Representative(s) | Karl, Christof Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2018/04] | Application number, filing date | 16831611.5 | 19.10.2016 | [2018/04] | WO2016JP80996 | Priority number, date | JP20160116696 | 10.06.2016 Original published format: JP 2016116696 | [2018/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017212663 | Date: | 14.12.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3272402 | Date: | 24.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3272402 | Date: | 27.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.12.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A63F13/24, A63F13/285, A63F13/92, A63F13/98 | [2018/04] | CPC: |
A63F13/24 (EP,US);
A63F13/285 (EP,US);
A63F2300/1043 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPIELSTEUERGERÄT | [2018/04] | English: | GAME CONTROLLER | [2018/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE JEU | [2018/04] | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2017 | Translation filed | 07.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2017 | Search fee paid | 07.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2017 | Examination requested [2018/04] | 07.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.01.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP18208899.7 / EP3473310 | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.10.2016 | AL | 27.02.2019 | AT | 27.02.2019 | CY | 27.02.2019 | CZ | 27.02.2019 | DK | 27.02.2019 | EE | 27.02.2019 | ES | 27.02.2019 | FI | 27.02.2019 | HR | 27.02.2019 | IT | 27.02.2019 | LT | 27.02.2019 | LV | 27.02.2019 | MC | 27.02.2019 | MK | 27.02.2019 | MT | 27.02.2019 | NL | 27.02.2019 | PL | 27.02.2019 | RO | 27.02.2019 | RS | 27.02.2019 | SE | 27.02.2019 | SI | 27.02.2019 | SK | 27.02.2019 | SM | 27.02.2019 | TR | 27.02.2019 | BG | 27.05.2019 | NO | 27.05.2019 | GR | 28.05.2019 | IS | 27.06.2019 | PT | 27.06.2019 | IE | 19.10.2019 | LU | 19.10.2019 | BE | 31.10.2019 | CH | 31.10.2019 | LI | 31.10.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 19.10.2016 | |
AL | 27.02.2019 | ||
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CY | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
MT | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
IE | 19.10.2019 | ||
LU | 19.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 19.10.2016 | |
AL | 27.02.2019 | ||
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CY | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
IE | 19.10.2019 | ||
LU | 19.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CY | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
IE | 19.10.2019 | ||
LU | 19.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
IE | 19.10.2019 | ||
LU | 19.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
LU | 19.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
LU | 19.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 27.02.2019 | |
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 27.02.2019 | |
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0768052 (NAMCO LTD) [A] 1-20* abstract *; | [A]EP1681658 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [A] 1-20 * abstract *; | [XA]EP2698185 (NINTENDO CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0032] * [A] 2-20; | [XAI]EP2888017 (IRONBURG INV S LTD [GB]) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 17,20 [I] 2-16,18,19; | [XAI]WO2015118082 (IRONBURG INV S [GB]) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * * page 1, line 10 - page 2, line 3 * * page 11, line 20 - line 29 * * page 11, line 32 - page 12, line 10 * * page 7, line 33 - page 8, line 18 * * page 10, line 27 - page 11, line 31 * [A] 17,20 [I] 4-16,18,19; | [XA]EP2908224 (SONY COMPUTER ENTERTAINMENT INC [JP]) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0093] - paragraph [0098] * [A] 2-20 | International search | [Y]JPH1153994 (SEGA ENTERPRISES KK) [Y] 13-14, 19 * , paragraphs [0017], [0024] to [0026]; fig. 2, 6 (Family: none) *; | [YA]JPH1190042 (SONY COMPUTER ENTERTAINMENT INC) [Y] 1-16, 18-19 * , paragraphs [0025], [0078] to [0080]; fig. 1, 21 to 23 & US 6394906 B1 column 4, lines 36 to 52; column 13, lines 26 to 57; fig. 1, 21 to 23 & EP 903659 A2 & DE 69836525 T2 & AU 8424298 A & CA 2247718 A1 & SG 68688 A1 & HK 1017746 A1 & CN 1220905 A & ES 2273389 T3 & MY 125892 A * [A] 17, 20; | [A]WO9936136 (GRYPSOFT INC [US]) [A] 1-20 * , page 5, line 24 to page 6, line 33; fig. 1 to 4 & AU 2213199 A *; | [YA]JP2001143556 (SONY COMPUTER ENTERTAINMENT INC) [Y] 1-16, 18-19 * , paragraphs [0028] to [0061]; fig. 2 to 8 & US 6710766 B1 column 4, line 26 to column 8, line 9; fig. 2 to 8 & WO 2001/036060 A1 & EP 1140303 A1 & DE 60032731 D1 & AU 1305901 A & BR 7422 A & NZ 513243 A & CA 2358712 A1 & AU 767752 B2 & TW 564450 B & CN 1336841 A * [A] 17, 20; | [A]EP2208518 (ACCESSORIES 4 TECHNOLOGY LTD [GB]) [A] 1-20* , paragraphs [0055] to [0060]; fig. 1 to 12 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2012249923 (SONY COMPUTER ENTERTAINMENT INC) [Y] 11 * , paragraphs [0026], [0034]; fig. 3, 6 & US 2014/0094309 A1 paragraphs [0080], [0088]; fig. 3, 6 & WO 2012169367 A1 & CN 103561830 A * | by applicant | WO2013157052 |