EP3333127 - ELECTRODE CATALYST FOR FUEL CELLS COMPRISING TIN OXIDE, MEMBRANE ELECTRODE ASSEMBLY, AND SOLID POLYMER FUEL CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/24] | TIN OXIDE, ELECTRODE CATALYST FOR FUEL CELLS, MEMBRANE ELECTRODE ASSEMBLY, AND SOLID POLYMER FUEL CELL | ||
[2020/36] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.08.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.05.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsui Mining and Smelting Co., Ltd. 1-11-1 Osaki Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8584 / JP | [2018/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIYAKE, Koichi c/o Mitsui Mining&Smelting Co. Ltd. 1333-2 Haraichi Ageo-shi Saitama 362-0021 / JP | 02 /
TAKAHASHI, Susumu c/o Mitsui Mining&Smelting Co. Ltd. 1333-2 Haraichi Ageo-shi Saitama 362-0021 / JP | 03 /
WATANABE, Hiromu c/o Mitsui Mining&Smelting Co. Ltd. 1333-2 Haraichi Ageo-shi Saitama 362-0021 / JP | 04 /
ABE, Naohiko c/o Mitsui Mining&Smelting Co. Ltd. 1333-2 Haraichi Ageo-shi Saitama 362-0021 / JP | 05 /
TSUKUDA, Ryoma c/o Mitsui Mining&Smelting Co. Ltd. 1333-2 Haraichi Ageo-shi Saitama 362-0021 / JP | 06 /
AMITANI, Kenichi c/o Mitsui Mining&Smelting Co. Ltd. 1333-2 Haraichi Ageo-shi Saitama 362-0021 / JP | 07 /
TANIGUCHI, Koji c/o Mitsui Mining&Smelting Co. Ltd. 1333-2 Haraichi Ageo-shi Saitama 362-0021 / JP | 08 /
TAKAHASHI, Hiroki c/o Mitsui Mining&Smelting Co. Ltd. 1333-2 Haraichi Ageo-shi Saitama 362-0021 / JP | 09 /
YONEDA, Yoshihiro c/o Mitsui Mining&Smelting Co. Ltd. 1333-2 Haraichi Ageo-shi Saitama 362-0021 / JP | 10 /
KATO, Kazuhiko c/o Mitsui Mining&Smelting Co. Ltd. 1333-2 Haraichi Ageo-shi Saitama 362-0021 / JP | [2018/24] | Representative(s) | Forstmeyer, Dietmar, et al Boeters & Lieck Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/24] | Forstmeyer, Dietmar, et al BOETERS & LIECK Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16832778.1 | 21.07.2016 | [2018/24] | WO2016JP71386 | Priority number, date | JP20150154294 | 04.08.2015 Original published format: JP 2015154294 | [2018/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017022499 | Date: | 09.02.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3333127 | Date: | 13.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3333127 | Date: | 20.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C01G35/00, B01J23/648, B01J32/00, H01M4/86, H01M8/10, C01G19/00, C01G19/02, H01M8/1004, H01M8/1023, H01M8/1039, H01M4/92, H01M8/1018 | [2021/03] | CPC: |
H01M4/925 (EP,US);
C01G19/006 (EP,US);
C01G19/02 (EP,US);
C01G33/006 (US);
C01G35/006 (EP,US);
H01M4/8657 (US);
H01M8/1004 (US);
H01M8/1023 (US);
H01M8/1039 (US);
C01P2002/52 (EP,US);
C01P2004/62 (EP,US);
C01P2006/40 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/24] | C01G35/00, B01J23/648, B01J32/00, C01G33/00, H01M4/86, H01M8/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRODENKATALYSATOR FÜR BRENNSTOFFZELLEN ENTHALTEND ZINNOXID, MEMBRANELEKTRODENANORDNUNG UND FESTPOLYMERBRENNSTOFFZELLE | [2020/36] | English: | ELECTRODE CATALYST FOR FUEL CELLS COMPRISING TIN OXIDE, MEMBRANE ELECTRODE ASSEMBLY, AND SOLID POLYMER FUEL CELL | [2020/36] | French: | CATALYSEUR D'ÉLECTRODE POUR PILES À COMBUSTIBLE COMPRENANT DE L'OXYDE D'ÉTAIN, ENSEMBLE ÉLECTRODE À MEMBRANE, ET PILE À COMBUSTIBLE À POLYMÈRE SOLIDE | [2020/36] |
Former [2018/24] | ZINNOXID, ELEKTRODENKATALYSATOR FÜR BRENNSTOFFZELLEN, MEMBRANELEKTRODENANORDNUNG UND FESTPOLYMERBRENNSTOFFZELLE | ||
Former [2018/24] | TIN OXIDE, ELECTRODE CATALYST FOR FUEL CELLS, MEMBRANE ELECTRODE ASSEMBLY, AND SOLID POLYMER FUEL CELL | ||
Former [2018/24] | OXYDE D'ÉTAIN, CATALYSEUR D'ÉLECTRODE POUR PILES À COMBUSTIBLE, ENSEMBLE ÉLECTRODE À MEMBRANE, ET PILE À COMBUSTIBLE À POLYMÈRE SOLIDE | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.2017 | Translation filed | 06.12.2017 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2017 | Search fee paid | 06.12.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/24] | 06.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.12.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.10.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.07.2016 | AL | 20.01.2021 | AT | 20.01.2021 | CY | 20.01.2021 | CZ | 20.01.2021 | DK | 20.01.2021 | EE | 20.01.2021 | ES | 20.01.2021 | FI | 20.01.2021 | HR | 20.01.2021 | IT | 20.01.2021 | LT | 20.01.2021 | LV | 20.01.2021 | MC | 20.01.2021 | NL | 20.01.2021 | PL | 20.01.2021 | RO | 20.01.2021 | RS | 20.01.2021 | SE | 20.01.2021 | SI | 20.01.2021 | SK | 20.01.2021 | SM | 20.01.2021 | BG | 20.04.2021 | NO | 20.04.2021 | GR | 21.04.2021 | IS | 20.05.2021 | PT | 20.05.2021 | IE | 21.07.2021 | LU | 21.07.2021 | BE | 31.07.2021 | CH | 31.07.2021 | LI | 31.07.2021 | [2023/30] |
Former [2023/29] | HU | 21.07.2016 | |
AL | 20.01.2021 | ||
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
IT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
IE | 21.07.2021 | ||
LU | 21.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
IT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
IE | 21.07.2021 | ||
LU | 21.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
IT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
LU | 21.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
IT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
LU | 21.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 20.01.2021 | |
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 20.01.2021 | |
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 20.01.2021 | |
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH06183733 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP) [X] 1-5 * the whole document * [A] 6-9; | [XA]JP3120663B (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP) [X] 1,3-5 * the whole document *[A] 2,6-9; | [X]US2014183054 (LEGZDINS COLLEEN [CA]) [X] 1-9 * paragraphs [0013] , [0017] , [0021] , [0057] , [0077] , [0082] , [0084]; tables 2,3 *; | [XI] - QIONGFANG ZHUO ET AL, "Efficient Electrochemical Oxidation of Perfluorooctanoate Using a Ti/SnO 2 -Sb-Bi Anode", ENVIRONMENTAL SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY, US, (20110301), vol. 45, no. 7, doi:10.1021/es1024542, ISSN 0013-936X, pages 2973 - 2979, XP055563318 [X] 1-6 * Section: Electrode Preparation and Characterization * [I] 7-9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/es1024542 | International search | [XA]JPH05246784 (TDK CORP) [X] 1-5 * , claims 1, 2; paragraphs [0022] to [0023]; samples 12 to 14 (Family: none) * [A] 6-9; | [A]JPH0848909 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP) [A] 1-9* , (Family: none) *; | [XA]JPH0864035 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD) [X] 1-5 * , claims 1 to 3; examples 1, 2 (Family: none) * [A] 6-9; | [XA]JP2009114531 (MITSUI MINING & SMELTING CO) [X] 1-5 * , claims 1 to 5; each example & WO 2009/060901 A1 & KR 10-2009-0077071 A & CN 101568665 A & TW 200936790 A * [A] 6-9; | [A]WO2015083383 (PANASONIC CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * , & JP 2015-129347 A * |