Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPWO2017022683 | Global Dossier | 24.05.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016JP72390 | 29.07.2016 | JP2015152445 | 31.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107848343B | Global Dossier | 26.11.2019 | B | CN107848343 | 27.03.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016JP72390 | 29.07.2016 | JP2015152445 | 31.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3330105 | Global Dossier | 01.05.2019 | B1 | EP3330105 | 04.07.2018 | A4 | EP3330105 | 06.06.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016JP72390 | 29.07.2016 | JP2015152445 | 31.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2683043 | 26.03.2019 | C1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016JP72390 | 29.07.2016 | JP2015152445 | 31.07.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017022683 | Global Dossier | 09.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2015152445 | 31.07.2015 |