EP3346331 - PHOTOSENSITIVE RESIN COMPOSITION, LITHOGRAPHIC PRINTING ORIGINAL PLATE AND PLATE MAKING METHOD FOR LITHOGRAPHIC PRINTING PLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.01.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2018/28] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOZAKI, Atsuyasu c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 4000 Kawashiri Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka 421-0396 / JP | 02 /
YASUHARA, Yuichi c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 4000 Kawashiri Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka 421-0396 / JP | [2018/28] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2018/28] | Application number, filing date | 16841455.5 | 10.08.2016 | [2018/28] | WO2016JP73654 | Priority number, date | JP20150171038 | 31.08.2015 Original published format: JP 2015171038 | JP20160129350 | 29.06.2016 Original published format: JP 2016129350 | [2018/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017038423 | Date: | 09.03.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3346331 | Date: | 11.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.03.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/039, C08G69/32, G03F7/00, G03F7/004, G03F7/095, G03F7/11, G03F7/32, B41C1/10, G03F7/12, G03F7/20 | [2018/28] | CPC: |
B41C1/1033 (EP,US);
G03F7/039 (US);
C08G69/32 (EP,US);
G03F7/00 (EP,US);
G03F7/004 (EP,US);
G03F7/095 (EP,US);
G03F7/11 (EP,US);
G03F7/12 (US);
G03F7/32 (EP,US);
G03F7/20 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/28] | Title | German: | LICHTEMPFINDLICHE HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG, LITHOGRAFISCHE ORIGINALDRUCKPLATTE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER LITHOGRAFISCHEN DRUCKPLATTE | [2018/28] | English: | PHOTOSENSITIVE RESIN COMPOSITION, LITHOGRAPHIC PRINTING ORIGINAL PLATE AND PLATE MAKING METHOD FOR LITHOGRAPHIC PRINTING PLATE | [2018/28] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE PHOTOSENSIBLE, CLICHÉ ORIGINAL D'IMPRESSION LITHOGRAPHIQUE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉALISATION D'UN CLICHÉ D'IMPRESSION LITHOGRAPHIQUE | [2018/28] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2018 | Translation filed | 25.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2018 | Search fee paid | 25.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/28] | 25.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.01.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005064325 (NAKAMURA IPPEI [JP], et al) [X] 1-6* paragraphs [0003] , [0051] - [0067] - [0248] , [0273] , [0300] , [0301]; examples 1-10; claims 1-20 * | International search | [A]JP2000143806 (JAPAN CHEMICAL INNOVATION INST) [A] 1-11 * , claims; examples (Family: none) *; | [XA]JP2004145320 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [X] 1-4 * , claims; examples; synthesis examples 10, 11, 13, 14; paragraph [0047] (Family: none) * [A] 5-11; | [A]JP2004157461 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [A] 1-11* , claims; examples & US 2007/0122743 A1 claims; examples & EP 1418047 A2 & CN 101046632 A & AT 398020 T *; | [XA]JP2005091429 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [X] 1, 4-5, 8-11 * , claims; example 6; paragraphs [0163] to [0191] & US 2005/0064325 A1 claims; example 6; paragraphs [0310] to [0358] * [A] 2-3, 6-7; | [A]JP2005266001 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [A] 1-11 * , claims; examples & US 2005/0214675 A1 claims; examples & EP 1577111 A1 & DE 602005000609 T2 & AT 355183 T *; | [XA]WO2011067998 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP], et al) [X] 1-4 * , claims; examples 2, 10; paragraph [0047] & US 8901225 B2 claims; examples 2, 10; column 10, line 55 to column 11, line 12 & JP 5088419 B2 & EP 2508947 A1 & CN 102640054 A & SG 181464 A & KR 10-2012-0109489 A & TW 201129867 A * [A] 5-11 |