EP3343229 - AUTOMATIC ANALYSIS DEVICE AND REAGENT BOTTLE CARRYING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi High-Tech Corporation 17-1, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-6409 / JP | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | [2020/25] |
Former [2018/27] | For all designated states Hitachi High-Technologies Corporation 24-14 Nishishimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8717 / JP | ||
For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | |||
For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORI, Takamichi Tokyo 105-6409 / JP | 02 /
NONAKA, Kouhei Tokyo 105-6409 / JP | 03 /
HARA, Masaki Tokyo 105-6409 / JP | 04 /
ISHIZAWA, Masato Tokyo 105-6409 / JP | 05 /
TOKIEDA, Hitoshi Tokyo 105-6409 / JP | 06 /
SATTLER, Stephan Kempter Strasse 4 82319 Starnberg / DE | [2023/31] |
Former [2018/27] | 01 /
MORI, Takamichi c/o HITACHI HIGH-TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION 24-14 Nishi Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8717 / JP | ||
02 /
NONAKA, Kouhei c/o HITACHI HIGH-TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION 24-14 Nishi Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8717 / JP | |||
03 /
HARA, Masaki c/o HITACHI HIGH-TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION 24-14 Nishi Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8717 / JP | |||
04 /
ISHIZAWA, Masato c/o HITACHI HIGH-TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION 24-14 Nishi Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8717 / JP | |||
05 /
TOKIEDA, Hitoshi c/o HITACHI HIGH-TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION 24-14 Nishi Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8717 / JP | |||
06 /
SATTLER, Stephan Kempter Strasse 4 82319 Starnberg / DE | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2018/27] | Application number, filing date | 16841578.4 | 23.08.2016 | [2018/27] | WO2016JP74462 | Priority number, date | JP20150168643 | 28.08.2015 Original published format: JP 2015168643 | [2018/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017038546 | Date: | 09.03.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3343229 | Date: | 04.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3343229 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.03.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01N35/00 | [2018/27] | CPC: |
G01N35/0092 (EP,US);
G01N35/1002 (US);
G01N35/00 (EP,US);
G01N35/00732 (US);
G01N35/04 (US);
G01N2035/00673 (EP,US);
G01N2035/0094 (EP,US);
G01N2035/0405 (US);
G01N2035/0443 (US);
G01N2035/0465 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHE ANALYSEVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM TRAGEN VON REAGENZIENFLASCHEN | [2018/27] | English: | AUTOMATIC ANALYSIS DEVICE AND REAGENT BOTTLE CARRYING METHOD | [2018/27] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ANALYSE AUTOMATIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSPORT DE BOUTEILLE DE RÉACTIF | [2018/27] | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.2018 | Translation filed | 16.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2018 | Search fee paid | 16.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/27] | 16.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.08.2023 | FI | 02.08.2023 | HR | 02.08.2023 | LT | 02.08.2023 | LV | 02.08.2023 | NL | 02.08.2023 | PL | 02.08.2023 | RS | 02.08.2023 | SE | 02.08.2023 | SM | 02.08.2023 | LU | 23.08.2023 | NO | 02.11.2023 | GR | 03.11.2023 | IS | 02.12.2023 | PT | 04.12.2023 | [2024/21] |
Former [2024/20] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 02.08.2023 | |
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2012269682 (WATANABE HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * figures 1-3 ** paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0076] *; | [A]EP2520939 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0082] * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2014141518 (PUFAHL HOLGER [DE]) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * figure 1 * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0045] * | International search | [A]JP2005037171 (HITACHI HIGH TECH CORP, et al) [A] 1-29* , entire text; all drawings & US 2005/0207938 A1 & EP 1498734 A1 & CA 2474175 A1 & CN 1576849 A *; | [A]JP2007524082 (Dade Behring Inc.) [A] 1-29 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2005/0013735 A1 & WO 2005/006831 A2 *; | [A]JP2008203004 (HITACHI HIGH TECH CORP) [A] 1-29 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2008/0199358 A1 & EP 1959257 A2 & CN 101251544 A *; | [A]JP2010085249 (OLYMPUS CORP) [A] 1-29 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2011027663 (HITACHI HIGH TECH CORP, et al) [A] 1-29 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2012/0301359 A1 & US 2013/0089464 A1 & US 2016/0124008 A1 & WO 2011/012657 A1 & EP 2520939 A2 & CA 2769501 A1 & CN 102597785 A & CN 102818907 A *; | [A]WO2011074202 (HITACHI HIGH TECH CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-29 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2012/0251389 A1 & EP 2515117 A1 & CN 102667491 A *; | [A]JP2011191062 (SYSMEX CORP) [A] 1-29 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2011/0223682 A1 & EP 2365340 A2 & CN 102192995 A * |