EP3358375 - RADIOGRAPHIC IMAGE ACQUISITION SYSTEM AND RADIOGRAPHIC IMAGE ACQUISITION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.08.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SM | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | [2018/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUGIYAMA Mototsugu c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1 Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | 02 /
ONISHI Tatsuya c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1 Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | 03 /
SUYAMA Toshiyasu c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1 Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | [2018/32] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2018/32] | Application number, filing date | 16850857.0 | 29.07.2016 | [2018/32] | WO2016JP72441 | Priority number, date | JP20150194643 | 30.09.2015 Original published format: JP 2015194643 | [2018/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017056680 | Date: | 06.04.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3358375 | Date: | 08.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3358375 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.04.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01T1/20 | [2018/32] | CPC: |
G01T1/20 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G01N23/04 (KR);
G01T7/08 (US);
G06T5/92 (CN,US);
G06T2207/10116 (CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RÖNTGENBILDERFASSUNGSSYSTEM UND RÖNTGENBILDERFASSUNGSVERFAHREN | [2018/32] | English: | RADIOGRAPHIC IMAGE ACQUISITION SYSTEM AND RADIOGRAPHIC IMAGE ACQUISITION METHOD | [2018/32] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ACQUISITION D'IMAGE RADIOGRAPHIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ D'ACQUISITION D'IMAGE RADIOGRAPHIQUE | [2018/32] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2018 | Translation filed | 16.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2018 | Search fee paid | 16.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/32] | 16.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.04.2023 | 04.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 02.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HR | 13.09.2023 | LT | 13.09.2023 | LV | 13.09.2023 | RS | 13.09.2023 | SE | 13.09.2023 | SM | 13.09.2023 | NO | 13.12.2023 | GR | 14.12.2023 | [2024/20] |
Former [2024/10] | HR | 13.09.2023 | |
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | LT | 13.09.2023 | |
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 13.09.2023 | |
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2001038707 (OHARA HIROMU [JP]) [X] 1,7,9,14 * paragraphs [0090] , [0096] , [0127] , [0129] * * figures 1,3,6 * [I] 2,5,6,8,12,13,15; | [XI]US7135686 (GRADY JOHN K [US]) [X] 1,2,9 * column 4, lines 37-59 * * figure 1 *[I] 5,6,8,12,13,15; | [XI]JP2014198831 (UNIV TOYO) [X] 1,2,9 * paragraphs [0016] , [0020] , [0021] * * figures 2,7,8 * [I] 5,6,8,12,13,15; | [XI]EP2813841 (HITACHI HIGH TECH CORP [JP]) [X] 1-4,9-11 * paragraphs [0022] , [0027] , [0052] , [0053] * * figure 1 * [I] 5,6,8,12,13,15 | International search | [Y]JP2001299733 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND) [Y] 7-8, 14-15* , paragraphs [0058] to [0059], [0064] to [0066], [0074] to [0080], [0095] to [0097]; fig. 1, 3 & US 2001/0038707 A1 paragraphs [0090] to [0091], [0096] to [0098], [0104] to [0112], [0127] to [0129]; fig. 1, 3 & EP 1164547 A2 *; | [Y]JP2007155653 (OLYMPUS CORP, et al) [Y] 1-15 * , paragraphs [0013] to [0020]; fig. 1 to 2 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2011064640 (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK) [Y] 3-8, 10-15 * , paragraphs [0020] to [0038]; fig. 1 to 4 & US 2012/0145911 A1 paragraphs [0033] to [0052]; fig. 1 to 4 & WO 2011/0033841 A1 & EP 2479559 A1 & TW 1132965 A *; | [Y]JP2011143138 (YOSHIDA SEISAKUSHO KK) [Y] 4-8, 11-15 * , paragraph [0007] (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2013178242 (HITACHI HIGH TECH CORP) [Y] 5-8, 12-15 * , paragraphs [0016] to [0020], [0025], [0042] to [0044]; fig. 1 to 2 & US 2014/0328459 A1 paragraphs [0028] to [0032], [0038] to [0039]; fig. 1 to 2 & WO 2013/0118386 A1 & EP 2813841 A1 & CN 103975233 A & KR 10-2014-0089431 *; | [Y]JP2014198831 (UNIV TOYO) [Y] 1-15 * , paragraph [0021]; fig. 8 (Family: none) * | Examination | DE4310542 | US2014286476 | EP2876466 | - Dericioglu Arcan F. ET AL, "Effect of Chemical Composition on the Optical Properties and Fracture Toughness of Transparent Magnesium Aluminate Spinel Ceramics", Materials Transactions, JP, vol. 46, no. 5, doi:10.2320/matertrans.46.996, ISSN 1345-9678, (20050101), pages 996 - 1003, URL: https://www.jim.or.jp/journal/e/pdf3/46/05/996.pdf, XP055787331 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2320/matertrans.46.996 |