EP3357778 - DRIVING CONTROL DEVICE, DRIVING CONTROL METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2021/30] |
Former [2018/32] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWAMOTO, Kenta c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2018/32] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2018/32] | Application number, filing date | 16851233.3 | 16.09.2016 | [2018/32] | WO2016JP77432 | Priority number, date | JP20150194555 | 30.09.2015 Original published format: JP 2015194555 | [2018/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017057059 | Date: | 06.04.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3357778 | Date: | 08.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3357778 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.04.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B60W30/14, B60W30/182, B60W50/10, B60W50/08, G01C21/26, G08G1/16, B60W50/00, B60W50/14, B60W30/085, B60W30/09, B60W30/10 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
B60W30/085 (EP,KR,US);
B60W60/001 (KR);
B60W60/0013 (US);
B60W30/09 (EP,KR,US);
B60W30/10 (EP,KR,US);
B60W30/14 (EP,KR,US);
B60W30/182 (EP,KR,US);
B60W50/0098 (EP,KR,US);
B60W50/082 (EP,KR,US);
B60W50/085 (EP,KR,US);
B60W50/10 (EP,KR,US);
B60W50/14 (EP,KR,US);
B60W60/0016 (US);
B60W60/0051 (US);
B60W60/0053 (US);
G01C21/26 (EP,KR,US);
G05D1/0088 (US);
G08G1/16 (EP,KR,US);
B60W2050/0002 (KR);
B60W2050/146 (KR);
B60W2540/22 (KR);
B60W2540/30 (US);
B60W2554/00 (EP,US);
B60W2554/4029 (US);
B60W2554/4041 (US);
B60W2554/4044 (US);
B60W2554/802 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/21] | B60W30/14, B60W30/182, B60W50/10, G01C21/26, G08G1/16, B60W50/00, B60W50/14, B60W30/085, B60W30/09, B60W30/10 | ||
Former IPC [2018/32] | B60W30/14, B60W30/182, B60W50/10, G01C21/26, G08G1/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTRIEBSSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG, ANTRIEBSSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM | [2018/32] | English: | DRIVING CONTROL DEVICE, DRIVING CONTROL METHOD, AND PROGRAM | [2018/32] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE CONDUITE, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE CONDUITE, ET PROGRAMME | [2018/32] | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.2018 | Translation filed | 19.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.2018 | Search fee paid | 19.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/32] | 19.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 26.10.2022 | AT | 26.10.2022 | CZ | 26.10.2022 | DK | 26.10.2022 | EE | 26.10.2022 | ES | 26.10.2022 | FI | 26.10.2022 | HR | 26.10.2022 | LT | 26.10.2022 | LV | 26.10.2022 | NL | 26.10.2022 | PL | 26.10.2022 | RO | 26.10.2022 | RS | 26.10.2022 | SE | 26.10.2022 | SI | 26.10.2022 | SK | 26.10.2022 | SM | 26.10.2022 | NO | 26.01.2023 | GR | 27.01.2023 | IS | 26.02.2023 | PT | 27.02.2023 | [2023/51] |
Former [2023/38] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
ES | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 26.10.2022 | |
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/17] | NL | 26.10.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP2314490 (AUDI AG [DE]) [I] 1,9,10* paragraph [0013] *; | [XAI]DE112012007124T (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,5,8-10 * paragraphs [0004] , [ 0008] - [0039] - [ 0061] - [0073] - [ 0085] - [0107] - [ 0115] - [0134] * [A] 6,7 [I] 3,4 | International search | [Y]JP2010221858 (HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LTD) [Y] 2 * , paragraphs [0013], [0016], [0022] to [0024]; fig. 1 to 2 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2015011458 (DENSO CORP) [Y] 3-4* , paragraphs [0020] to [0021]; fig. 3 (Family: none) *; | [XYA]JP2015058902 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1, 5, 8-10 * , paragraphs [0014] to [0015], [0022], [0032] to [0037]; fig. 1, 7 (Family: none) * [Y] 2-4 [A] 6-7 |