EP3358585 - SEPARATOR FOR ELECTROCHEMICAL ELEMENT AND ELECTROCHEMICAL ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.07.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Kodoshi Corporation 648 Hirooka-kami Haruno-cho Kochi-shi, Kochi 781-0395 / JP | [2018/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IGAWA, Atsushi c/o NIPPON KODOSHI CORPORATION 648, Hirooka-kami Haruno-cho Kochi-shi, Kochi 781-0395 / JP | 02 /
ICHIMURA, Takumi c/o NIPPON KODOSHI CORPORATION 648, Hirooka-kami Haruno-cho Kochi-shi, Kochi 781-0395 / JP | 03 /
MATSUOKA, Gaku c/o NIPPON KODOSHI CORPORATION 648, Hirooka-kami Haruno-cho Kochi-shi, Kochi 781-0395 / JP | 04 /
WADA, Norihiro c/o NIPPON KODOSHI CORPORATION 648, Hirooka-kami Haruno-cho Kochi-shi, Kochi 781-0395 / JP | [2018/32] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [2018/32] | Application number, filing date | 16851507.0 | 27.09.2016 | [2018/32] | WO2016JP78402 | Priority number, date | JP20150189116 | 28.09.2015 Original published format: JP 2015189116 | [2018/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017057336 | Date: | 06.04.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3358585 | Date: | 08.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.04.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01G9/02, H01G11/52, H01M2/16 | [2018/32] | CPC: |
H01G9/02 (EP,KR,US);
H01G11/52 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/44 (US);
H01M50/4295 (KR,US);
H01M50/489 (EP,KR,US);
H01G4/16 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/32] | Title | German: | SEPARATOR FÜR ELEKTROCHEMISCHES ELEMENT UND ELEKTROCHEMISCHES ELEMENT | [2018/32] | English: | SEPARATOR FOR ELECTROCHEMICAL ELEMENT AND ELECTROCHEMICAL ELEMENT | [2018/32] | French: | SÉPARATEUR D'ÉLÉMENT ÉLECTROCHIMIQUE ET ÉLÉMENT ÉLECTROCHIMIQUE | [2018/32] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2018 | Translation filed | 16.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2018 | Search fee paid | 16.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/32] | 16.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6074523 (MIZOBUCHI TAIJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * column 8, line 52 - column 9, line 40 * * column 11, lines 43-58 ** column 18, lines 37-60 *; | [A]US2002004973 (SUHARA MANABU [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * paragraphs [0008] - [0015] - [0018] *; | [X]JP2011249008 (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0022] , [0023] , [0036] , [0038]; example 1 *; | [E]EP3125335 (KURARAY CO [JP]) [E] 1,3,4 * paragraph [0106]; example 5; table 1 * | International search | [A]JPH05267103 (Nippon Kodoshi Corp.) [A] 1-4 * , paragraphs [0017] to [0028] (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2000003834 (NIPPON KODOSHI CORP) [A] 1-4* , paragraphs [0027] to [0064] (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2014053259 (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD) [A] 1-4 * , claim 1 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2014056953 (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD) [A] 1-4 * , claim 1 (Family: none) * |