EP3358829 - IMAGE-CAPTURING ELEMENT, IMAGE-CAPTURING DEVICE, AND ELECTRONIC APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.08.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.04.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 19.07.2023 [2023/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nikon Corporation 15-3, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6290 / JP | [2018/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUNAMIZU, Wataru c/o NIKON CORPORATION Intellectual Property Division 15-3 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6290 / JP | 02 /
JUEN, Masahiro c/o NIKON CORPORATION Intellectual Property Division 15-3 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6290 / JP | 03 /
KOMAI, Atsushi c/o NIKON CORPORATION Intellectual Property Division 15-3 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6290 / JP | [2020/37] |
Former [2018/32] | 01 /
FUNAMIZU, Wataru c/o NIKON CORPORATION 15-3 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6290 / JP | ||
02 /
JUEN, Masahiro c/o NIKON CORPORATION 15-3 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6290 / JP | |||
03 /
KOMAI, Atsushi c/o NIKON CORPORATION 15-3 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6290 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2018/32] | Application number, filing date | 16851544.3 | 27.09.2016 | [2018/32] | WO2016JP78478 | Priority number, date | JP20150195279 | 30.09.2015 Original published format: JP 2015195279 | [2018/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017057373 | Date: | 06.04.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3358829 | Date: | 08.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3358829 | Date: | 09.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.04.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/378, H04N5/353, H04N5/374, H04N5/3745, H04N5/369 | [2019/11] | CPC: |
H04N25/709 (EP,CN,US);
H04N25/75 (US);
H04N25/77 (CN,US);
H04N25/78 (EP,CN);
H04N25/79 (EP,CN,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/32] | H04N5/374, H04N5/378 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BILDERFASSUNGSELEMENT, BILDERFASSUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2018/32] | English: | IMAGE-CAPTURING ELEMENT, IMAGE-CAPTURING DEVICE, AND ELECTRONIC APPARATUS | [2018/32] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE CAPTURE D'IMAGE À SEMI-CONDUCTEURS, DISPOSITIF DE CAPTURE D'IMAGE, ET APPAREIL ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2018/32] | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.2018 | Translation filed | 24.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.2018 | Search fee paid | 24.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/32] | 24.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.07.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.06.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.09.2016 | AL | 09.09.2020 | AT | 09.09.2020 | CY | 09.09.2020 | CZ | 09.09.2020 | DK | 09.09.2020 | EE | 09.09.2020 | ES | 09.09.2020 | FI | 09.09.2020 | HR | 09.09.2020 | IT | 09.09.2020 | LT | 09.09.2020 | LV | 09.09.2020 | MC | 09.09.2020 | MK | 09.09.2020 | MT | 09.09.2020 | PL | 09.09.2020 | RO | 09.09.2020 | RS | 09.09.2020 | SE | 09.09.2020 | SI | 09.09.2020 | SK | 09.09.2020 | SM | 09.09.2020 | TR | 09.09.2020 | NL | 23.09.2020 | IE | 27.09.2020 | LU | 27.09.2020 | BE | 30.09.2020 | CH | 30.09.2020 | LI | 30.09.2020 | BG | 09.12.2020 | NO | 09.12.2020 | GR | 10.12.2020 | IS | 09.01.2021 | PT | 11.01.2021 | [2023/29] |
Former [2022/32] | HU | 27.09.2016 | |
AL | 09.09.2020 | ||
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CY | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
IT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
MK | 09.09.2020 | ||
MT | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
TR | 09.09.2020 | ||
IE | 27.09.2020 | ||
LU | 27.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 27.09.2016 | |
AL | 09.09.2020 | ||
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CY | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
IT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
MT | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
TR | 09.09.2020 | ||
IE | 27.09.2020 | ||
LU | 27.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
IT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
IE | 27.09.2020 | ||
LU | 27.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
IE | 27.09.2020 | ||
LU | 27.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
LU | 27.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
LU | 27.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
LU | 27.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/27] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
LU | 27.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 09.09.2020 | |
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 09.09.2020 | |
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]US2009090844 (YAN HAI [US], et al) [X] 1,6,8,11 * figures 3-5 * [A] 2-4,9,10 [Y] 12 [I] 5,7; | [XAYI]US2009295968 (MATSUDA SEISUKE [JP], et al) [X] 1,8,11 * figures 3,4,9,10 * [A] 2-4,6,9,10 [Y] 12 [I] 5,7; | [YA]US2012307100 (IWANE MASAAKI [JP]) [Y] 12 * figures 1-5 *[A] 1-11; | [A]WO2015019836 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-10 * figures 2,3,11 * | International search | [A]JP2012244331 (OLYMPUS CORP) [A] 1-29* , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2015023391 (NIKON CORP) [A] 1-29 * , paragraph [0014]; fig. 1 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2015046656 (NIKON CORP) [A] 1-29 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) * | Examination | US2014263966 |