EP3357892 - INTERLAYER FOR LAMINATED GLASS, AND LAMINATED GLASS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.07.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sekisui Chemical Co., Ltd. 4-4, Nishitemma 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8565 / JP | [2018/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHINO, Hiromitsu c/o SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO. LTD. 1259 Izumi Minakuchi-cho Kouka-shi Shiga 528-8585 / JP | 02 /
HIROTA, Etsurou c/o SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO. LTD. 1259 Izumi Minakuchi-cho Kouka-shi Shiga 528-8585 / JP | 03 /
KUMAKURA, Koji c/o SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO. LTD. 1259 Izumi Minakuchi-cho Kouka-shi Shiga 528-8585 / JP | [2018/32] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2018/32] | Application number, filing date | 16851796.9 | 29.09.2016 | [2018/32] | WO2016JP78907 | Priority number, date | JP20150195405 | 30.09.2015 Original published format: JP 2015195405 | [2018/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017057625 | Date: | 06.04.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3357892 | Date: | 08.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.04.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C03C27/12, B60J1/02, B32B17/10 | [2019/22] | CPC: |
B32B17/10568 (EP,KR,RU,US);
B32B17/10036 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
B32B17/10 (CN);
B29C48/002 (EP,US);
B29C48/08 (EP,US);
B29C48/13 (EP,US);
B29C48/21 (EP,US);
B32B17/10018 (EP,US);
B32B17/10541 (EP,US);
B32B17/10559 (RU);
B32B17/10577 (EP,KR,US);
B32B17/10587 (EP,US);
B32B17/10596 (EP,US);
B32B17/10761 (EP,KR,RU,US);
B32B27/306 (CN);
B32B3/263 (US);
B32B38/06 (KR);
B60J1/02 (EP,US);
B60J3/007 (US);
B60K35/00 (US);
B29K2031/04 (US);
B29L2031/30 (US);
B29L2031/778 (US);
B32B2307/538 (KR);
B32B2309/105 (KR);
B32B2315/08 (KR);
B32B2367/00 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/32] | C03C27/12, B60J1/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/32] | Title | German: | ZWISCHENSCHICHT FÜR VERBUNDGLAS SOWIE VERBUNDGLAS | [2018/32] | English: | INTERLAYER FOR LAMINATED GLASS, AND LAMINATED GLASS | [2018/32] | French: | COUCHE INTERMÉDIAIRE POUR VERRE FEUILLETÉ ET VERRE FEUILLETÉ | [2018/32] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2018 | Translation filed | 21.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2018 | Search fee paid | 21.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/32] | 21.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2006188695 (YACOVONE VINCENT J [US]) [Y] 1-8 * paragraph [0019] *; | [Y]US2007009714 (LEE DAVID J [US], et al) [Y] 1-8 * figures 4-6 * * paragraphs [0017] , [0044] , [0060] , [0077] - [0088] *; | [Y]US2010314900 (LABROT MICHAEL [DE], et al) [Y] 1-8 * figures 3,4,7,8 * * claims 2,3 ** paragraphs [0048] , [0077] * | International search | [Y]JP2005068006 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [Y] 1-8 * , claims; paragraphs [0022], [0025]; examples; fig. 1 to 4 & US 2004/0053006 A1 claims; paragraphs [0063], [0067]; examples; fig. 1 to 4 & WO 1999/046213 A1 & EP 1063205 A1 & KR 10-2003-0069200 A *; | [Y]JP2010024138 (DU PONT) [Y] 1-8 * , claims; paragraphs [0020], [0023]; examples; fig. 1, 2, 4 to 6 & US 2004/0166288 A1 claims; paragraphs [0028], [0033]; examples; fig. 1, 2, 4 to 6 & WO 2002/103434 A1 *; | [A]JP2013006731 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [A] 1-8* , claims; paragraph [0146]; fig. 1 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2014156390 (KURARAY EUROPE GMBH) [A] 1-8 * , claims; paragraph [0063] & US 2014/0224423 A1 claims; paragraph [0070] & EP 2767393 A1 *; | [Y]JP2015116682 (KURARAY CO) [Y] 1-8 * , claims; paragraph [0077] (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2015116680 (KURARAY CO) [Y] 1-8 * , claims; paragraph [0087] (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2015116679 (KURARAY CO) [Y] 1-8 * , claims; paragraph [0086] (Family: none) * |