EP3360178 - FUNCTIONALIZED LEAD ACID BATTERY SEPARATORS, IMPROVED LEAD ACID BATTERIES, AND RELATED METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.09.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daramic, LLC 11430 North Community House Road Suite 350 Charlotte, NC 28277 / US | [2022/46] |
Former [2018/33] | For all designated states Daramic LLC 11430 North Community House Road Suite 350 Charlotte, NC 28277 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WHEAR, J. Kevin 9261 Poplar Spur Road Utica, Kentucky 42376 / US | 02 /
KRISHNAMOORTHY, Ahila 27A Vega Tata Aquila HMT Township Jalahalli Bengaluru Karnataka 530018 / IN | 03 /
APPIKATLA, Susmitha 400 E Highland Court Owensboro, Kentucky 42303 / US | [2018/33] | Representative(s) | Tomkins & Co 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [2018/33] | Application number, filing date | 16854217.3 | 05.10.2016 | [2018/33] | WO2016US55509 | Priority number, date | US201562237174P | 05.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562237174 P | [2018/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017062461 | Date: | 13.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3360178 | Date: | 15.08.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 13.04.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/16, H01M10/12, H01M2/14 | [2019/21] | CPC: |
H01M10/12 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M50/431 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/40 (CN);
H01M50/403 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/417 (KR);
H01M50/434 (EP,US);
H01M50/437 (EP,US);
H01M50/44 (EP,US);
H01M50/446 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/449 (KR);
H01M50/451 (EP,US);
H01M50/454 (EP,US);
H01M50/457 (EP,CN,US);
H01M50/463 (KR);
H01M50/489 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/33] | H01M2/16, H01M10/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/33] | Title | German: | FUNKTIONALISIERTE BLEISÄUREBATTERIESEPARATOREN, VERBESSERTE BLEISÄUREBATTERIEN UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VERFAHREN | [2018/33] | English: | FUNCTIONALIZED LEAD ACID BATTERY SEPARATORS, IMPROVED LEAD ACID BATTERIES, AND RELATED METHODS | [2018/33] | French: | SÉPARATEURS D'ACCUMULATEUR AU PLOMB-ACIDE FONCTIONNALISÉS, ACCUMULATEURS AU PLOMB-ACIDE AMÉLIORÉS, ET PROCÉDÉS CORRESPONDANTS | [2018/33] | Entry into regional phase | 09.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 09.04.2018 | Search fee paid | 09.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/33] | 09.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0507090 (GRACE W R & CO [US]) [X] 1,3-12,14-18 * column 5, line 21 - line 36; example 1 * [Y] 2; | [Y]US2008076028 (MILLER ERIC HENRI [US], et al) [Y] 2* paragraphs [0005] , [00 6] , [0 12] - [0014] - [0 17] *; | [XY]US2008241686 (SUGIE KAZUHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,8,9,11-15,17,18 * paragraphs [0031] , [0073] , [0097] * [Y] 2; | [X]US2012208070 (NAKASHIMA SATOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-9,12,14-16 * paragraphs [0126] , [0127]; example 7; claims 1, 6, 7, 9-13 *; | [XY]US2014255752 (MILLER ERIC H [US], et al) [X] 1,3-12,14-18 * paragraphs [0002] , [0 11] , [0 19] , [0 24] , [0 26] * [Y] 2 | International search | [X]US5633081 (CLOUGH THOMAS J [US], et al) [X] 1 * See abstract; and claims 1-19. *; | [A]US2001005560 (YOSHIDA YASUHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * See abstract; and paragraphs [0007]-[0033]. *; | [A]US2006121269 (MILLER ERIC H [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * See abstract; and paragraphs [0007]-[0058]. *; | [A]US2013273409 (NANDI SOUVIK [US], et al) [A] 1-6* See abstract; and paragraphs [0004]-[0040]. *; | [X]US2015171398 (ROUMI FARSHID [US]) [X] 1-6 * See abstract; paragraphs [0030]-[0182] and [0274]; and figures 3A-7. * |