EP3371916 - METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING A HARQ TRANSMISSION IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND A DEVICE THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.02.2022 [2022/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2018/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Sunyoung IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 02 /
YI, Seungjune IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | [2018/37] | Representative(s) | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/37] | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16862335.3 | 26.10.2016 | [2018/37] | WO2016KR12074 | Priority number, date | US201562250543P | 04.11.2015 Original published format: US 201562250543 P | [2018/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017078319 | Date: | 11.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3371916 | Date: | 12.09.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 11.05.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/18, H04L29/08 | [2018/37] | CPC: |
H04L1/1819 (EP,US);
H04L1/1812 (KR,US);
H04W28/04 (US);
H04L1/1874 (EP,US);
H04L69/324 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/37] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG EINER HARQ-ÜBERTRAGUNG IN EINEM DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM UND VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR | [2018/37] | English: | METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING A HARQ TRANSMISSION IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND A DEVICE THEREFOR | [2018/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION D'UNE TRANSMISSION HARQ DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL ET DISPOSITIF ASSOCIÉ | [2018/37] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2018 | Search fee paid | 20.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/37] | 20.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/06] | 28.09.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2021 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2015043489 (TSENG LI-CHIH [TW]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0164] - [0205] *; | [XI] - ERICSSON, "Skipping padding in SPS- and dynamic grants", vol. RAN WG2, no. Malmö, Sweden; 20151005 - 20151009, (20151004), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-154742 SKIPPING PADDING IN SPS- AND DYNAMIC GRANTS, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRAN, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20151004), XP051005231 [X] 1-3,5-9,11,12 * pages 1, 3 * [I] 4,10 | [A] - SAMSUNG, "Skipping uplink transmission with no data to transmit", vol. RAN WG2, no. Beijing, China; 20150824 - 20150828, (20150814), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-153332 SKIP UPLINK TX, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_91/Docs/, (20150814), XP050992479 [A] 1-12 * page 1 * | International search | [A]US2010070816 (PARK SUNG JUN [KR], et al) [A] 1-14 * See paragraphs [0062]-[0099]; and figures 5, 6. *; | [A]US2011310833 (LEE OK-SEON [KR], et al) [A] 1-14 * See paragraphs [0046]-[0082]; and figures 1-4. *; | [XY]US2015043489 (TSENG LI-CHIH [TW]) [X] 1, 3-8, 10-14 * See paragraphs [0120], [0173]-[0205]. * [Y] 2, 9; | [Y] - NOKIA NETWORKS, "Potential protocol enhancement for Fast uplink access", R2-154491, 3GPP TSG RAN WG2 Meeting #91bis, Malmo, Sweden, (20151009), pages 1 - 3, XP 055541425 [Y] 2, 9 * See section 1. * | [A] - SAMSUNG, "Skipping uplink transmission with no data to transmit", R2-153332, 3GPP TSG-RAN2 WG2 Meeting #91, Beijing, China, (20150814), XP 050992479 [A] 1-14 * See sections 2.1-2.2. * | by applicant | US2015043489 |