EP3375714 - SYSTEM FOR IN-ORBIT PROPULSION VIA FLOATING CONDUCTOR CABLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universidad Carlos III de Madrid Avda. Gregorio Peces - Barba, 1 28919 Leganés - Madrid / ES | For all designated states Universidad Politécnica de Madrid C/ Ramiro de Maeztu 7 28040 Madrid / ES | [2018/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SÁNCHEZ ARRIAGA, Gonzalo c/o Universidad Carlos III de Madrid Área Transferencia de Tecnología SEI Parque Científico Avda. Gregorio Peces Barba, 1 28919 Leganés (Madrid) / ES | 02 /
BOMBARDELLI, Claudio C/ Ramírez de Maeztu 7 28040 Madrid / IT | [2018/44] |
Former [2018/38] | 01 /
SÁNCHEZ ARRIAGA, Gonzalo Av. Gregorio Peces Barba 1 28919 Leganés / ES | ||
02 /
BOMBARDELLI, Claudio C/ Ramírez de Maeztu 7 28040 Madrid / IT | Representative(s) | Ungria López, Javier Avda. Ramón y Cajal, 78 28043 Madrid / ES | [2018/38] | Application number, filing date | 16863722.1 | 11.11.2016 | [2018/38] | WO2016ES70802 | Priority number, date | ES20150031649 | 13.11.2015 Original published format: ES 201531649 | [2018/38] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017081351 | Date: | 18.05.2017 | Language: | ES | [2017/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3375714 | Date: | 19.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3375714 | Date: | 22.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 18.05.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B64G1/10, B64G1/32, B64G1/40, B64G1/42, B64G1/64 | [2018/47] | CPC: |
B64G1/10 (EP,ES);
B64G1/242 (ES);
B64G1/32 (EP,ES);
B64G1/40 (EP);
B64G1/409 (ES);
B64G1/42 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2018/38] | B64G1/10, B64G1/32, B64G1/40, B64G1/42 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM FÜR ANTRIEB IM ORBIT ÜBER FLOTIERENDE LEITERKABEL | [2018/38] | English: | SYSTEM FOR IN-ORBIT PROPULSION VIA FLOATING CONDUCTOR CABLES | [2018/38] | French: | SYSTÈME DE PROPULSION EN ORBITE AU MOYEN DE CÂBLES CONDUCTEURS FLOTTANTS | [2018/38] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2018 | Translation filed | 13.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2018 | Search fee paid | 13.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/38] | 13.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.11.2016 | AL | 22.07.2020 | AT | 22.07.2020 | CY | 22.07.2020 | CZ | 22.07.2020 | DK | 22.07.2020 | EE | 22.07.2020 | ES | 22.07.2020 | FI | 22.07.2020 | HR | 22.07.2020 | IT | 22.07.2020 | LT | 22.07.2020 | LV | 22.07.2020 | MC | 22.07.2020 | MK | 22.07.2020 | MT | 22.07.2020 | NL | 22.07.2020 | PL | 22.07.2020 | RO | 22.07.2020 | RS | 22.07.2020 | SE | 22.07.2020 | SI | 22.07.2020 | SK | 22.07.2020 | SM | 22.07.2020 | TR | 22.07.2020 | BG | 22.10.2020 | NO | 22.10.2020 | GR | 23.10.2020 | GB | 11.11.2020 | IE | 11.11.2020 | LU | 11.11.2020 | IS | 22.11.2020 | PT | 23.11.2020 | BE | 30.11.2020 | CH | 30.11.2020 | LI | 30.11.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/32] | HU | 11.11.2016 | |
AL | 22.07.2020 | ||
AT | 22.07.2020 | ||
CY | 22.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
MK | 22.07.2020 | ||
MT | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SI | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
TR | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
GB | 11.11.2020 | ||
IE | 11.11.2020 | ||
LU | 11.11.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 11.11.2016 | |
AL | 22.07.2020 | ||
AT | 22.07.2020 | ||
CY | 22.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
MT | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SI | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
TR | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
GB | 11.11.2020 | ||
IE | 11.11.2020 | ||
LU | 11.11.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
AT | 22.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SI | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
GB | 11.11.2020 | ||
IE | 11.11.2020 | ||
LU | 11.11.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
AT | 22.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SI | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
GB | 11.11.2020 | ||
IE | 11.11.2020 | ||
LU | 11.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
AT | 22.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SI | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
GB | 11.11.2020 | ||
IE | 11.11.2020 | ||
LU | 11.11.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
AT | 22.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SI | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IE | 11.11.2020 | ||
LU | 11.11.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
AT | 22.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SI | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
LU | 11.11.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
AT | 22.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SI | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
LU | 11.11.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
AT | 22.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
LU | 11.11.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
AT | 22.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
AT | 22.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
AT | 22.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 22.07.2020 | |
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 22.07.2020 | |
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/17] | AT | 22.07.2020 | |
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 22.07.2020 | |
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 22.07.2020 | |
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | ES | 22.07.2020 | |
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 22.07.2020 | |
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]FR2809083 (AGENCE SPATIALE EUROPEENNE [FR]) [X] 1-3,5,6,13 * page 11, line 24 - line 37 * * page 22, line 4 - page 24, line 38; figures 1-4 * [I] 7-12,14,15; | [A]US6565044 (JOHNSON CHARLES L [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 48 - column 3, line 49; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US2003213874 (OCKELS WUBBO JOHANNES [NL], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 2, paragraph 25 - paragraph 34; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US6942186 (LEVIN EUGENE M [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 8, line 22 - column 10, line 55; figures 1-5 *; | [A]CN101767657 (HARBIN INST OF TECHNOLOGY) [A] 1* abstract *; | [XI]US2012104176 (YLONEN TATU J [FI]) [X] 1-4,6,12,13 * page 2, paragraph 31 - paragraph 34 * * page 3, paragraph 41 - paragraph 42 * * page 3, paragraph 49; figures 1-3 * [I] 5,7-11,14,15 | International search | [A]WO9848089 (FORWARD ROBERT L [US], et al) [A] 1-8, 10, 15 * ; page 1, lines 7 - 19; page 33, line 14 -page 35, line 11; page 36, lines 7 -10; page 38, lines 9 - 29; page 41, line 20 - page 42, line 30; figures 2a - 3, 5c - 7, 9 - 10f, 12a - 12b, 28a. *; | [A]US6419191 (HOYT ROBERT P [US], et al) [A] 1-8, 14 * ; column 12, lines 31 - 55; column 14, line 36 - column 15, line 13; column 33, lines 51 - 65; column 36, lines 14 - 34; column 38, lines 39 - 60; column 40, lines 33 -53; column 42, line 26 - column 45, line 57; figures 2a - 3, 22-26. *; | [A]US6755377 (LEVIN EUGENE M [US], et al) [A] 0 * . *; | [A]US2012138748 (BARNES IAN M [US], et al) [A] 0* . * |