EP3469819 - CORE NETWORK ONLINE CHARGING CONTROL FOR INTERMEDIATE NETWORK TRAFFIC STEERING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Redknee Inc. 2560 Matheson Boulevard East Suite 500 Mississauga, ON L4W 4Y9 / CA | [2019/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GLEINIG, Uwe c/o Redknee (Germany) GmbH Siemensdamm 62 D-13627 Berlin / DE | 02 /
JUNG, Michael c/0 Redknee (Germany) GmbH Siemensdamm 62 D-13627 Berlin / DE | 03 /
SCHENDEL, Jens c/o Redknee (Germany) GmbH Siemensdamm 62 D-13627 Berlin / DE | [2019/16] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2019/16] | Application number, filing date | 16904536.6 | 09.06.2016 | [2019/16] | WO2016IB53414 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017212318 | Date: | 14.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3469819 | Date: | 17.04.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 14.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/26, H04W40/00 | [2019/16] | CPC: |
H04L67/141 (EP);
H04L12/14 (EP);
H04L12/1403 (EP);
H04L12/1407 (EP);
H04L45/306 (EP);
H04M15/00 (EP);
H04M15/66 (EP);
H04M15/8214 (EP);
H04M15/8228 (EP);
H04W4/24 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/16] | Title | German: | STEUERUNG DER ONLINE-ABRECHNUNG EINES KERNNETZWERKS ZUR LENKUNG DES ZWISCHENNETZWERKVERKEHRS | [2019/16] | English: | CORE NETWORK ONLINE CHARGING CONTROL FOR INTERMEDIATE NETWORK TRAFFIC STEERING | [2019/16] | French: | COMMANDE DE FACTURATION EN LIGNE DE RÉSEAU CENTRAL POUR ORIENTATION DE TRAFIC DE RÉSEAU INTERMÉDIAIRE | [2019/16] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2018 | Search fee paid | 07.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/16] | 03.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/31] | 30.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2019 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2016057292 (GOLDNER ALLA [IL], et al) [A] 0; | [A] - "Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; Architecture enhancement forflexible mobile service steering", 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT, vol. 13 .0.0, (20150922), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Specs/archive/23_series/23.718/23718-d00.zip, (20170206), XP051294310 [A] 0 |