EP3505164 - AN EFFERVESCENT COMPOSITION COMPRISING ERDOSTEINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.11.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.07.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.12.2020 [2020/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Abdi Ibrahim Ilac Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S. Orhangazi Mah. Tunc Cad. No:3 34500 Esenyurt/Istanbul / TR | [2019/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koc, Erhan Abdi Ibrahim Ilac San. Ve Ticaret As. Ar-Ge Departmeni Orhan Gazi Mahallesi, Tunc Caddesi No:3 Esenyurt - Istanbul / TR | 02 /
Aktas, Tolga Abdi Ibrahim Ilac San. Ve Ticaret As. Ar-Ge Departmeni Orhan Gazi Mahallesi, Tunc Caddesi No:3 Esenyurt - Istanbul / TR | [2019/27] | Application number, filing date | 17020598.3 | 31.12.2017 | [2019/27] | Filing language | TR | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3505164 | Date: | 03.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/46, A61K9/20, A61K31/381, A61P11/12 | [2019/27] | CPC: |
A61K9/0007 (EP);
A61K31/381 (EP);
A61K9/2018 (EP);
A61P11/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/07] |
Former [2019/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BRAUSEZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT ERDOSTEIN | [2019/27] | English: | AN EFFERVESCENT COMPOSITION COMPRISING ERDOSTEINE | [2019/27] | French: | COMPOSITION EFFERVESCENTE COMPRENANT DE L'ERDOSTÉINE | [2019/27] | Examination procedure | 06.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/34] | 06.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time | 16.11.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/52] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 14.04.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 14.04.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.07.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]ZA963591 (ADCOCK INGRAM LTD) [X] 1-17 * page 5, line 9 - line 16 *; | [X]CN101181274 (BEIJING RUNDEKANG MEDICAL TECH [CN]) [X] 1-17 * page 5, line 30 - page 6, line 16; example 5 *; | [X]CN101199519 (BEIJING RUNDEKANG MEDICAL TECH [CN]) [X] 1-17* page 6, line 24 - page 7, line 9; example 4 *; | [X]CN101214245 (BEIJING RUNDEKANG MEDICAL TECH [CN]) [X] 1-17 * page 6, line 17 - line 30; example 4 *; | [X]CN101612154 (GUANGDONG ZHAOQING STAR LAKE B) [X] 1-17 * page 5, line 9 - line 22; example 4 * |