EP3189785 - TISSUE DEPTH ESTIMATION USING GATED ULTRASOUND AND FORCE MEASUREMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.06.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.11.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.01.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.01.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SM | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biosense Webster (Israel) Ltd. 4 Hatnufa Street Yokneam, 2066717 / IL | [2022/26] |
Former [2017/28] | For all designated states Biosense Webster (Israel), Ltd. 4 Hatnufa Street Yokneam, 2066717 / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALTMANN, Andres Claudio Biosense Webster (Israel) Ltd. 4 HATNUFA STREET P.O. Box 275 Yokneam 2066717 / IL | 02 /
GLINER, Vadim Biosense Webster (Israel) Ltd. 4 HATNUFA STREET P.O. Box 275 Yokneam 2066717 / IL | 03 /
EPHRATH, Yaron Biosense Webster (Israel) Ltd. 4 HATNUFA STREET P.O. Box 275 Yokneam 2066717 / IL | 04 /
GOVARI, Assaf Biosense Webster (Israel) Ltd. 4 HATNUFA STREET P.O. Box 275 Yokneam 2066717 / IL | [2017/33] |
Former [2017/28] | 01 /
GOVARI, Assaf 4 Hatnufa Street 2066717 Yokneam / IL | ||
02 /
ALTMANN, Andres Claudio 4 Hatnufa Street 2066717 Yokneam / IL | |||
03 /
EPHRATH, Yaron 4 Hatnufa Street 2066717 Yokneam / IL | |||
04 /
GLINER, Vadim 4 Hatnufa Street 2066717 Yokneam / IL | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2017/28] | Application number, filing date | 17150756.9 | 10.01.2017 | [2017/28] | Priority number, date | US201614992389 | 11.01.2016 Original published format: US201614992389 | [2017/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3189785 | Date: | 12.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3189785 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/08, A61B8/12, A61B8/00 | [2017/28] | CPC: |
A61B8/0858 (EP,IL,US);
A61B18/12 (CN);
A61B18/1492 (CN);
A61B8/085 (EP,IL,US);
A61B8/0883 (EP,IL,US);
A61B8/12 (EP,IL,US);
A61B8/429 (IL,US);
A61B8/4405 (EP,IL,US);
A61B8/485 (EP,IL,US);
A61B8/5207 (EP,IL,US);
A61B8/5223 (EP,IL,US);
G16H50/30 (EP);
A61B2018/00351 (CN);
A61B2018/00595 (CN);
A61B2018/00702 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/08] |
Former [2017/28] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | GEWEBETIEFENSCHÄTZUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG VON TORGESTEUERTEN ULTRASCHALL- UND KRAFTMESSUNGEN | [2017/28] | English: | TISSUE DEPTH ESTIMATION USING GATED ULTRASOUND AND FORCE MEASUREMENTS | [2017/28] | French: | ESTIMATION DE LA PROFONDEUR DE TISSUS PAR ULTRASONS À DÉCLENCHEMENT PÉRIODIQUE ET MESURES DE FORCE | [2017/28] | Examination procedure | 10.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/08] | 16.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 24.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.01.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 30.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.07.2023 | ES | 05.07.2023 | FI | 05.07.2023 | HR | 05.07.2023 | LT | 05.07.2023 | LV | 05.07.2023 | NL | 05.07.2023 | PL | 05.07.2023 | RS | 05.07.2023 | SE | 05.07.2023 | SM | 05.07.2023 | NO | 05.10.2023 | GR | 06.10.2023 | IS | 05.11.2023 | PT | 06.11.2023 | [2024/20] |
Former [2024/10] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 05.07.2023 | |
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 05.07.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2012086002 (NAT INST OF ADVANCED IND SCIEN, et al)[A] 1-14; | [A]WO2014115056 (KONINKL PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1-14 * page 1, line 2 - page 1, line 6; figure -; claim - * * page 3, line 1 - page 10, line 18 *; | [A]US2015018679 (ENDO KOGO [JP]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [XI]WO2015113813 (KONINKL PHILIPS NV [NL]) [X] 1,8 * page 1, line 20 - page 2, line 2 * * page 2, line 15 - page 15, line 22; figure -; claim - * [I] 2-7,9-14 | by applicant | US6226542 | US6301496 | US6814733 | US6892091 | US6997924 | US7156816 | US7536218 | US7756576 | US2011028848 | US2011144491 | US2012259194 | US8545408 | US8628473 | US2014100563 |