EP3192992 - COMBUSTION ENGINE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.01.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.04.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.01.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mahle International GmbH Pragstraße 26-46 70376 Stuttgart / DE | [2017/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGEL, Norman Cäsar-von-Hofacker-Anlage 2/1 71640 Ludwigsburg / DE | 02 /
NAUJOKS, Sascha Leutzenheldstraße 14 76327 Pfinztal / DE | 03 /
STRENG, Simon Ulmer Str. 318 70327 Stuttgart / DE | [2017/29] | Representative(s) | BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater Königstraße 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | [2017/29] | Application number, filing date | 17151914.3 | 18.01.2017 | [2017/29] | Priority number, date | DE201610200566 | 18.01.2016 Original published format: DE102016200566 | [2017/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3192992 | Date: | 19.07.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F02B37/04, F02B39/10, F02M26/08, F02M26/34, // F02M26/05, F02M26/06, F02M26/22, F02M26/35 | [2017/29] | CPC: |
F02B37/04 (EP);
F02B39/10 (EP);
F02M26/05 (EP);
F02M26/06 (EP);
F02M26/08 (EP);
F02M26/22 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/08] |
Former [2017/29] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BRENNKRAFTMASCHINENSYSTEM | [2017/29] | English: | COMBUSTION ENGINE SYSTEM | [2017/29] | French: | SYSTÈME DE MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2017/29] | Examination procedure | 18.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/08] | 26.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/09] | 22.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2014140153 (AVL LIST GMBH [AT]) [X] 1-3,5-7,9-13 * page 2, paragraph 2 - page 3, paragraph 4; figures 1, 2 * * page 5, paragraph 4 - page 7, paragraph 3 * [Y] 4; | [XA]WO2010012919 (RENAULT SA [FR], et al) [X] 1-3,6-12 * page 9, line 10 - page 9, line 16; figures 1-6 * * page 11, line 7 - line 15 * * page 12, line 25 - page 15, line 8 * [A] 4; | [XA]DE4320045 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [X] 1,3,5,7,9-13 * column 3, line 3 - line 15; figures 1,2 * [A] 4; | [XA]EP1493907 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) [X] 1-3,5-7,9,10,12,13 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0036]; figures 1, 6 * [A] 4; | [XA]DE102014225887 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,6,7,9,10,12,13 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0037]; figure 1 * [A] 4; | [YA]WO2006136790 (RICARDO UK LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 4 * page 8, line 23 - page 9, line 17 * [A] 1-3,5-13 |