EP3205514 - RUBBER COMPOSITION AND TIRE WITH TREAD FOR LOW TEMPERATURE PERFORMANCE AND WET TRACTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.04.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.01.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.02.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company 200 Innovation Way Akron, OH 44316 / US | [2017/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISITMAN, Nihat Ali 397 N. Main Street Hudson, OH Ohio 44236 / US | 02 /
STEINER, Pascal Patrick 10 rue des Prés L-9189 Vichten / LU | 03 /
POMPEI, Manuela Maison 46 L-9768 Reuler / LU | 04 /
SCHMIT, Philippe Voie de Meix 35 B-6742 Chantemelle / BE | 05 /
THIELEN, Georges Marcel Victor 49, rue GD Charlotte L-4995 Schouweiler / LU | [2017/33] | Representative(s) | Kutsch, Bernd Goodyear S.A. Patent Department Avenue Gordon Smith 7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | [2017/33] | Application number, filing date | 17155155.9 | 08.02.2017 | [2017/33] | Priority number, date | US201615043773 | 15.02.2016 Original published format: US201615043773 | [2017/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3205514 | Date: | 16.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3205514 | Date: | 23.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B60C1/00, C08L9/06, C08L9/00, C08K3/36, C08K3/04, C08L25/16, C08L93/00, C08L93/04, C08L45/02 | [2017/33] | CPC: |
B60C1/0016 (EP,CN,US);
C08L9/06 (EP,CN,US);
B60C11/0008 (US);
C08K3/04 (EP,US);
C08K3/22 (EP,US);
C08K3/36 (EP,US);
C08K5/09 (EP,US);
C08K5/31 (EP,US);
C08K5/47 (EP,US);
C08K5/548 (EP,US);
C08L25/16 (EP,US);
C08L9/00 (EP,US);
C08L91/00 (EP,US);
C08L91/06 (EP,US);
C08L93/00 (EP,US);
B60C2011/0025 (US);
C08K2201/006 (CN);
C08K2201/014 (CN);
| C-Set: |
C08L9/06, C08L25/16, C08L9/00, C08L91/00, C08L91/06, C08K3/36, C08K5/548, C08K3/04, C08K3/22, C08K3/04, C08K5/47, C08K5/31, C08K5/09 (US,EP);
C08L9/06, C08L9/00, C08L25/08, C08K9/06, C08K3/36, C08K5/09 (CN);
C08L9/06, C08L9/00, C08L45/00, C08K9/06, C08K3/36, C08K5/09 (CN);
C08L9/06, C08L93/00, C08L9/00, C08L91/00, C08L91/06, C08K3/36, C08K5/548, C08K3/04, C08K3/22, C08K3/04, C08K5/47, C08K5/31, C08K5/09 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/13] |
Former [2017/33] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | GUMMIZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND REIFEN MIT LAUFFLÄCHE FÜR NIEDRIGTEMPERATURLEISTUNG UND NASSTRAKTION | [2017/33] | English: | RUBBER COMPOSITION AND TIRE WITH TREAD FOR LOW TEMPERATURE PERFORMANCE AND WET TRACTION | [2017/33] | French: | COMPOSITION DE CAOUTCHOUC ET PNEU AYANT UNE BANDE DE ROULEMENT À PERFORMANCE BASSE TEMPÉRATURE ET TRACTION HUMIDE | [2017/33] | Examination procedure | 08.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/13] | 28.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.05.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.03.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.02.2017 | AL | 23.06.2021 | AT | 23.06.2021 | CY | 23.06.2021 | CZ | 23.06.2021 | DK | 23.06.2021 | EE | 23.06.2021 | ES | 23.06.2021 | FI | 23.06.2021 | HR | 23.06.2021 | LT | 23.06.2021 | LV | 23.06.2021 | MC | 23.06.2021 | MK | 23.06.2021 | MT | 23.06.2021 | NL | 23.06.2021 | PL | 23.06.2021 | RO | 23.06.2021 | RS | 23.06.2021 | SI | 23.06.2021 | SK | 23.06.2021 | SM | 23.06.2021 | TR | 23.06.2021 | BG | 23.09.2021 | NO | 23.09.2021 | GR | 24.09.2021 | IS | 23.10.2021 | PT | 25.10.2021 | IE | 08.02.2022 | LU | 08.02.2022 | BE | 28.02.2022 | CH | 28.02.2022 | LI | 28.02.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 08.02.2017 | |
AL | 23.06.2021 | ||
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CY | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
MK | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
TR | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
IE | 08.02.2022 | ||
LU | 08.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 08.02.2017 | |
AL | 23.06.2021 | ||
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CY | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
MK | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
IE | 08.02.2022 | ||
LU | 08.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 08.02.2017 | |
AL | 23.06.2021 | ||
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CY | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
IE | 08.02.2022 | ||
LU | 08.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 08.02.2017 | |
AL | 23.06.2021 | ||
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
IE | 08.02.2022 | ||
LU | 08.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 23.06.2021 | |
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
IE | 08.02.2022 | ||
LU | 08.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 23.06.2021 | |
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
IE | 08.02.2022 | ||
LU | 08.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 23.06.2021 | |
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
LU | 08.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | AL | 23.06.2021 | |
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 23.06.2021 | |
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 23.06.2021 | |
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 23.06.2021 | |
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 23.06.2021 | |
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 23.06.2021 | |
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 23.06.2021 | |
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
ES | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 23.06.2021 | |
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
NL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | FI | 23.06.2021 | |
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 23.06.2021 | |
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | FI | 23.06.2021 | |
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 23.06.2021 | |
LT | 23.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2289712 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [A] 1-15 * examples I-II; tables 1-3 *; | [A]WO2013040425 (MICHELIN & CIE [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 * example F1 ** paragraph [0004] *; | [A]EP2733170 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [A] 1-15 * tables 1-2 * | by applicant | - JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1938), vol. 60 | - The Vanderbilt Rubber Handbook, (1990), page 417,418 | - The Vanderbilt Rubber Handbook, (1978), pages 344 - 346 |