EP3364062 - BEARING HOUSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.08.2019 [2019/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KML Europe 4s BVBA Noordlaan 21 9200 Dendermonde / BE | [2018/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van Geertruyen, Peter KML Europe 4s BVBA Noordlaan 21 B-9200 Dendermonde / BE | 02 /
Steindamm, Jochen KML Europe 4s BVBA Noordlaan 21 B-9200 Dendermonde / BE | [2018/34] | Representative(s) | van der Krans, Arie IPecunia Patents B.V. P.O. Box 593 6160 AN Geleen / NL | [2018/34] | Application number, filing date | 17156487.5 | 16.02.2017 | [2018/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3364062 | Date: | 22.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F16C35/00, F16C35/02 | [2018/34] | CPC: |
F16C35/00 (EP);
F16C35/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LAGERGEHÄUSE | [2018/34] | English: | BEARING HOUSING | [2018/34] | French: | LOGEMENT DE PALIER | [2018/34] | Examination procedure | 23.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/32] | 14.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/32] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US554004 (PONTIOUS CORNELIUS) [A] 1-7 * page 1, line 26 - line 38; figure . *; | [A]US3941436 (KAZAMA HACHIRO) [A] 1-7* column 1, line 33 - column 2, line 36; figure - *; | [XYI]US4784499 (FUKUTE OSAMU [JP]) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 67 - column 3, line 45; figures 6-8 * [Y] 3,5-7 [I] 4; | [Y]DE102011051960 (ZF LENKSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [Y] 3,7 * paragraph [0028]; figure 1 *; | [Y]WO2016156962 (AB SKF (PUBL) [SE]) [Y] 5,6 * page 3, paragraphs 1,2; figure - * |