|
25.11.2022 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2022 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
25 |
|
03.11.2022 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.08.2022 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.08.2022 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.07.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.07.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.07.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.07.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.07.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.07.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.07.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.07.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.07.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
15.07.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
15.07.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.07.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
15.07.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
15.07.2022 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 01 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.07.2022 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 02 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.07.2022 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 03 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.07.2022 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 04 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.07.2022 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 05 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.07.2022 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 06 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.07.2022 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 07 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.07.2022 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 08 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.07.2022 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 09 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.07.2022 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 10 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.07.2022 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 11 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.07.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.07.2022 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
15.07.2022 |
Main request during appeals procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.04.2022 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.04.2022 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
11 |
|
08.04.2022 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.03.2021 |
F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.09.2020 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.08.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.08.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 01 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.08.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 01 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.08.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 02 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.08.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 02 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.08.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 03 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.08.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 03 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.08.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 04 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.08.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 04 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.08.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 05 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.08.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 06 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.08.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 07 |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.08.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 07 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.08.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 08 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.08.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 08 |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.08.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 09 |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.08.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 09 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.08.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 10 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.08.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 11 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.08.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 11 |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.08.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.08.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.08.2020 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
17 |
|
26.05.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.05.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.05.2020 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.04.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2020 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.04.2020 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
17.04.2020 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.04.2020 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.2020 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2019 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.12.2019 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.12.2019 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.12.2019 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2019 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
50 |
|
04.12.2019 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
50 |
|
28.11.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.11.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2019 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.11.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.11.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.11.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.11.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.11.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2019 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.10.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2019 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.10.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.10.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.10.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.10.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.10.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.10.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.10.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.10.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.10.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.10.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.10.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.10.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.10.2019 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
15.04.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.04.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.04.2019 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.01.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.01.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.01.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.09.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.09.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.09.2018 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.01.2018 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.01.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.01.2018 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.01.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.01.2018 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
12.01.2018 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.01.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.01.2018 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.01.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.01.2018 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
12.01.2018 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.06.2017 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.06.2017 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2017 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2017 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
30.05.2017 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.05.2017 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2017 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2017 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2017 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.02.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.02.2017 |
Description |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
21.02.2017 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.02.2017 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
21.02.2017 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.12.2006 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
22.12.2006 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
16.08.2004 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
16.08.2004 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
26 |