EP3375309 - SMART PROTECTIVE GLOVES WITH SEALED COLORIMETRIC LAYER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.04.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.05.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.01.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 115 Tabor Road M/S 4D3 P.O. Box 377 Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | [2018/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COBIANU, Cornel P. Honeywell International Inc., Intellectual Property - Patent Services P.O. Box 377 115 Tabor road, M/S 4D3 Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | 02 /
STRATULAT, Alisa Honeywell International Inc., Intellectual Property - Patent Services P.O. Box 377 115 Tabor road, M/S 4D3 Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | 03 /
SERBAN, Bogdan-Catalin Honeywell International Inc., Intellectual Property - Patent Services P.O. Box 377 115 Tabor road, M/S 4D3 Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | 04 /
BUIU, Octavian Honeywell International Inc., Intellectual Property - Patent Services P.O. Box 377 115 Tabor road, M/S 4D3 Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | 05 /
PIESKER, Andrea Honeywell International Inc., Intellectual Property - Patent Services P.O. Box 377 115 Tabor road, M/S 4D3 Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | 06 /
FARIN, Eric Honeywell International Inc., Intellectual Property - Patent Services P.O. Box 377 115 Tabor road, M/S 4D3 Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | [2021/24] |
Former [2018/38] | 01 /
COBIANU, Cornel P. Honeywell International Inc., Intellectual Property - Patent Services P.O. Box 377 115 Tabor road, M/S 4D3 Morris Plains, NJ New Jersey 07950 / US | ||
02 /
STRATULAT, Alisa Honeywell International Inc., Intellectual Property - Patent Services P.O. Box 377 115 Tabor road, M/S 4D3 Morris Plains, NJ New Jersey 07950 / US | |||
03 /
SERBAN, Bogdan-Catalin Honeywell International Inc., Intellectual Property - Patent Services P.O. Box 377 115 Tabor road, M/S 4D3 Morris Plains, NJ New Jersey 07950 / US | |||
04 /
BUIU, Octavian Honeywell International Inc., Intellectual Property - Patent Services P.O. Box 377 115 Tabor road, M/S 4D3 Morris Plains, NJ New Jersey 07950 / US | |||
05 /
PIESKER, Andrea Honeywell International Inc., Intellectual Property - Patent Services P.O. Box 377 115 Tabor road, M/S 4D3 Morris Plains, NJ New Jersey 07950 / US | |||
06 /
FARIN, Eric Honeywell International Inc., Intellectual Property - Patent Services P.O. Box 377 115 Tabor road, M/S 4D3 Morris Plains, NJ New Jersey 07950 / US | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/24] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | ||
Former [2018/38] | Houghton, Mark Phillip Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 17161447.2 | 16.03.2017 | [2018/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3375309 | Date: | 19.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3375309 | Date: | 16.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A41D19/00 | [2018/38] | CPC: |
A41D19/0082 (EP,US);
A41D19/0006 (US);
A41D19/0058 (US);
A41D19/04 (US);
A41D31/02 (US);
B29C41/22 (US);
B32B1/00 (US);
B32B25/08 (US);
A41D2400/52 (US);
A41D2500/54 (US);
B29C41/14 (US);
B29K2021/00 (US);
B29K2029/04 (US);
B29K2071/02 (US);
B29L2031/4864 (US);
B32B2437/02 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/38] | Title | German: | INTELLIGENTE SCHUTZHANDSCHUHE MIT ABGEDICHTETER KOLORIMETRISCHER SCHICHT | [2018/38] | English: | SMART PROTECTIVE GLOVES WITH SEALED COLORIMETRIC LAYER | [2018/38] | French: | GANTS DE PROTECTION INTELLIGENTS AYANT UNE COUCHE COLORIMÉTRIQUE ÉTANCHE | [2018/38] | Examination procedure | 16.03.2017 | Examination requested [2018/38] | 16.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.01.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 11.05.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.03.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.03.2017 | AL | 16.06.2021 | AT | 16.06.2021 | CY | 16.06.2021 | CZ | 16.06.2021 | DK | 16.06.2021 | EE | 16.06.2021 | ES | 16.06.2021 | FI | 16.06.2021 | HR | 16.06.2021 | IT | 16.06.2021 | LT | 16.06.2021 | LV | 16.06.2021 | MC | 16.06.2021 | MK | 16.06.2021 | MT | 16.06.2021 | NL | 16.06.2021 | PL | 16.06.2021 | RO | 16.06.2021 | RS | 16.06.2021 | SE | 16.06.2021 | SI | 16.06.2021 | SK | 16.06.2021 | SM | 16.06.2021 | BG | 16.09.2021 | NO | 16.09.2021 | GR | 17.09.2021 | IS | 16.10.2021 | PT | 18.10.2021 | IE | 16.03.2022 | LU | 16.03.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 16.03.2017 | |
AL | 16.06.2021 | ||
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CY | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
IT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
MK | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SI | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
IE | 16.03.2022 | ||
LU | 16.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 16.03.2017 | |
AL | 16.06.2021 | ||
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CY | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
IT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SI | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
IE | 16.03.2022 | ||
LU | 16.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 16.03.2017 | |
AL | 16.06.2021 | ||
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
IT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SI | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
IE | 16.03.2022 | ||
LU | 16.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 16.06.2021 | |
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
IT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SI | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
IE | 16.03.2022 | ||
LU | 16.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 16.06.2021 | |
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
IT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SI | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
IE | 16.03.2022 | ||
LU | 16.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 16.06.2021 | |
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
IT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SI | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 16.06.2021 | |
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
IT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SI | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 16.06.2021 | |
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SI | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 16.06.2021 | |
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 16.06.2021 | |
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 16.06.2021 | |
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 16.06.2021 | |
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 16.06.2021 | |
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 16.06.2021 | |
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | FI | 16.06.2021 | |
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 16.06.2021 | |
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | FI | 16.06.2021 | |
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 16.06.2021 | |
LT | 16.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5017427 (MACHIDA MORIHISA [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * claim - *; | [A]US2014289926 (FINZELBERG MATTIAS [DE]) [A] 1* paragraph [0017]; figure -; claim 1 *; | [E]EP3165104 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [E] 1,3-5,7,9,10,12,14 * paragraphs [0014] , [0019] , [0020]; figure 3; claims 1-6 * |