EP3376305 - WINDING DEVICE WITH PUSH-BUTTON FOR WATCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/38] | WINDING DEVICE WITH PUSH-BUTTON FOR MECHANICAL WATCH | ||
[2020/04] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Harry Winston SA Chemin du Tourbillon, 8 1228 Plan-les-Ouates / CH | [2018/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BÜHLER, Johnny Chemin des Cerisiers 7 1184 Luins / CH | 02 /
MONFERRER, Bernat Chemin de la Moraine 19 1162 St-Prex / CH | [2018/38] | Representative(s) | Giraud, Eric, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [2018/38] | Application number, filing date | 17161509.9 | 17.03.2017 | [2018/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3376305 | Date: | 19.09.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3376305 | Date: | 22.07.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G04B3/00, G04B3/04 | [2018/38] | CPC: |
G04B3/001 (EP,US);
G04B3/046 (CN,US);
G04B3/041 (US);
G04B3/045 (EP,US);
G04B3/048 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/17] |
Former [2018/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUFZIEHEN PER KNOPFDRUCK FÜR UHR | [2020/04] | English: | WINDING DEVICE WITH PUSH-BUTTON FOR WATCH | [2020/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE REMONTAGE A POUSSOIR POUR MONTRE | [2020/04] |
Former [2018/38] | VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUFZIEHEN PER KNOPFDRUCK FÜR MECHANISCHE UHR | ||
Former [2018/38] | WINDING DEVICE WITH PUSH-BUTTON FOR MECHANICAL WATCH | ||
Former [2018/38] | DISPOSITIF DE REMONTAGE A POUSSOIR POUR MONTRE MECANIQUE | Examination procedure | 22.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/17] | 19.03.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.03.2017 | AL | 22.07.2020 | AT | 22.07.2020 | CY | 22.07.2020 | CZ | 22.07.2020 | DK | 22.07.2020 | EE | 22.07.2020 | ES | 22.07.2020 | FI | 22.07.2020 | HR | 22.07.2020 | IT | 22.07.2020 | LT | 22.07.2020 | LV | 22.07.2020 | MC | 22.07.2020 | NL | 22.07.2020 | PL | 22.07.2020 | RO | 22.07.2020 | RS | 22.07.2020 | SE | 22.07.2020 | SI | 22.07.2020 | SK | 22.07.2020 | SM | 22.07.2020 | BG | 22.10.2020 | NO | 22.10.2020 | GR | 23.10.2020 | IS | 22.11.2020 | PT | 23.11.2020 | IE | 17.03.2021 | LU | 17.03.2021 | BE | 31.03.2021 | [2023/33] |
Former [2023/30] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
AT | 22.07.2020 | ||
CY | 22.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SI | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
IE | 17.03.2021 | ||
LU | 17.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
AT | 22.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SI | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
IE | 17.03.2021 | ||
LU | 17.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
AT | 22.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SI | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
IE | 17.03.2021 | ||
LU | 17.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
AT | 22.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SI | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
IE | 17.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
AT | 22.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SI | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
AT | 22.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SI | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
AT | 22.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
AT | 22.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 22.07.2020 | |
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 22.07.2020 | |
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/17] | AT | 22.07.2020 | |
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 22.07.2020 | |
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 22.07.2020 | |
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | ES | 22.07.2020 | |
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 22.07.2020 | |
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH12174 (STAUFFER TIMOTHEE [CH]) [A] 2 * page 1; figures 1,2; claims 1,2 *; | [XAYI]FR1269569 (GLOBO INVEST TRUST) [X] 1-3,5 * page 2, lines 3-5; figures 1-3 * [A] 8-11 [Y] 7,12-15 [I] 4,6; | [YA]WO02077724 (GLASHUETTER UHRENBETRIEB GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 7,12-15 * page 6, lines 9-12; figures 1-7 * * page 7, lines 3-16; claim 6 * [A] 2,6; | [A]FR2993062 (CHEVAL FRERES [FR]) [A] 1* figures 1-9 *; | [A]CH710271 (MONTRES BREGUET SA [CH]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0030] - [0035] - [0040] - [0041]; figures 1-4 * |