EP3263596 - IMMUNOGLOBULIN VARIANTS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.06.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.09.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.11.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.09.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.02.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.08.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.01.2024 [2024/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080-4990 / US | [2018/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ADAMS, Camellia W 638 Garden Lane Bristol, VA 24201 / US | 02 /
CHAN, Andrew C 1201 Cloud Avenue Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 03 /
CROWLEY, Craig W 2208 Caminito Del Barco Del Mar, CA 94014-3618 / US | 04 /
LOWMAN, Henry B P.O. Box 2556 400 San Juan Avenue El Granada, CA 94018 / US | 05 /
NAKAMURA, Gerald R 1529 Portola Drive San Francisco, CA 94127 / US | 06 /
PRESTA, Leonard G 1900 Gough Street 206 San Francisco, CA 91109 / US | [2018/25] |
Former [2018/01] | 01 /
ADAMS, Camellia W 1899 Lakebird Drive San Jose, CA 95124 / US | ||
02 /
CHAN, Andrew C 1201 Cloud Avenue Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | |||
03 /
CROWLEY, Craig W 2208 Caminito Del Barco Del Mar, CA 94014-3618 / US | |||
04 /
LOWMAN, Henry B P.O. Box 2556 400 San Juan Avenue El Granada, CA 94018 / US | |||
05 /
NAKAMURA, Gerald R 1529 Portola Drive San Francisco, CA 94127 / US | |||
06 /
PRESTA, Leonard G 1900 Gough Street 206 San Francisco, CA 91109 / US | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/01] | Hayes, Emily Anne Luxford, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 17167520.0 | 16.12.2003 | [2018/01] | Priority number, date | US20020434115P | 16.12.2002 Original published format: US 434115 P | US20030526163P | 01.12.2003 Original published format: US 526163 P | [2018/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3263596 | Date: | 03.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/00, A61K39/395, C12N15/63 | [2018/01] | CPC: |
C07K16/2887 (EP,NO,US);
C07K16/00 (KR);
A61K39/39558 (NO);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/12 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P11/08 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/08 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P17/14 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P21/04 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/16 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/06 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
A61P5/14 (EP);
A61P5/40 (EP);
A61P7/04 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/08 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/14 (EP);
C07K16/28 (KR);
C12N15/63 (KR,NO);
C12N5/16 (NO);
A61K2039/505 (EP,NO,US);
C07K2317/24 (EP,NO,US);
C07K2317/41 (EP,NO,US);
C07K2317/52 (EP,NO,US);
C07K2317/522 (US);
C07K2317/55 (EP,NO,US);
C07K2317/56 (EP,NO,US);
C07K2317/565 (EP,NO,US);
C07K2317/567 (US);
C07K2317/72 (EP,NO,US);
C07K2317/73 (EP,NO,US);
C07K2317/732 (EP,NO,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/32] |
Former [2018/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | IMMUNOGLOBULINVARIANTEN UND IHRE VERWENDUNGEN | [2018/01] | English: | IMMUNOGLOBULIN VARIANTS AND USES THEREOF | [2018/01] | French: | VARIANTES DE L'IMMUNOGLOBULINE ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2018/01] | Examination procedure | 21.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/32] | 21.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 20.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 11.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 10.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 08.09.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 22.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 21.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/02] | 23.08.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/02] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03813759.2 / EP1572744 | EP08005671.6 / EP1944320 | EP10179942.7 / EP2289936 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 30.01.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 30.01.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.02.2023 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 06.04.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 06.04.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.04.2022 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 21.06.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 21.06.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.06.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 21.09.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 21.09.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.09.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 09.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 09.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 09.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 09.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 09.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 08.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 10.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 10.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 09.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 19 | 09.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 20 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0009160 (IDEC PHARMA CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * page 4, line 9 - line 14 * * page 9, line 8 - page 10, line 7 *; | [A]WO0076542 (CONSIGLIO NAZIONALE RICERCHE [IT], et al) [A] 1-11 * claims 1-3 *; | [A]WO0113945 (BIOCRYSTAL LTD [US]) [A] 1-11 * example 4; claims 1-22 *; | [A]WO0222212 (IDEC PHARMA CORP [US]) [A] 1-11 * page 49; example 1 *; | [AP]WO03068821 (IMMUNOMEDICS INC [US], et al) [AP] 1-11 * page 10, line 4 - line 13 * * claims 7,8 * * page 35, line 12 - page 36, line 13 * * page 45, line 3 - line 23 * * page 49, paragraph 4 *; | [T]WO2005117978 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al); | [AD] - IDUSOGIE E E ET AL, "Engineered antibodies with increased activity to recruit complement", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (20010215), vol. 166, no. 4, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 2571 - 2575, XP002298345 [AD] 1-11 * figure 2 * | [A] - TEDDER T F, "ISOLATION AND STRUCTURE OF A CDNA ENCODING THE B1 (CD20) CELL-SURFACE ANTIGEN OF HUMAN B LYMPHOCYTES", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, (198801), vol. 85, no. 1, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 208 - 212, XP002016361 [A] 1-11 * figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.85.1.208 | [T] - LUDWIG KAPPOS, "Ocrelizumab in relapsing-remitting multiple sclerosis: a phase 2, randomised, placebo-controlled, multicentre trial", LANCET, (20111101), vol. 19, no. 378, pages 1779 - 1787, XP055406865 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-6736(11)61649-8 |