EP3251828 - FLEXIBLE HOSE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.10.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.06.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ultra Electronics Limited 417 Bridport Road Greenford, Middlesex UB6 8UA / GB | [2017/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BECK, Robert c/o Ultra Electronics Limited 417 Bridport Road Greenford, Middlesex UB6 8UA / GB | 02 /
COOPER, Ian c/o Ultra Electronics Limited 417 Bridport Road Greenford, Middlesex UB6 8UA / GB | 03 /
HARDING, Simon c/o Ultra Electronics Limited 417 Bridport Road Greenford, Middlesex UB6 8UA / GB | [2017/49] | Representative(s) | Wardle, Callum Tarn, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/48] | Wardle, Callum Tarn, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | ||
Former [2017/49] | Howell, Matthew Dafydd Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 17168381.6 | 27.04.2017 | [2017/49] | Priority number, date | GB20160009590 | 01.06.2016 Original published format: GB 201609590 | [2017/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3251828 | Date: | 06.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3251828 | Date: | 27.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B32B5/02, B32B7/08, B32B7/10, B32B15/085, B32B15/14, B32B15/18, B32B27/12, B32B27/32, B32B27/34, B32B1/08, F16L11/08 | [2017/49] | CPC: |
F16L11/088 (EP,US);
F16L11/085 (GB);
B32B1/08 (EP,US);
B32B15/085 (EP,US);
B32B15/14 (EP,US);
B32B15/18 (EP,US);
B32B27/12 (EP,US);
B32B27/322 (EP,US);
B32B27/34 (EP,US);
B32B5/02 (EP,US);
B32B5/028 (EP,US);
B32B7/10 (EP,US);
F16L11/10 (GB);
F16L11/115 (GB);
F16L11/118 (GB);
F16L11/125 (US);
B32B2262/0269 (EP,US);
B32B2307/306 (EP,US);
B32B2307/308 (EP,US);
B32B2307/7242 (EP,US);
B32B2307/7265 (EP,US);
B32B2307/736 (EP,US);
B32B2597/00 (EP,US);
B32B2605/00 (EP,US);
B32B2605/18 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/49] | Title | German: | FLEXIBLER SCHLAUCH | [2017/49] | English: | FLEXIBLE HOSE | [2017/49] | French: | TUYAU FLEXIBLE | [2017/49] | Examination procedure | 27.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/49] | 27.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.08.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.04.2017 | AL | 27.11.2019 | AT | 27.11.2019 | CY | 27.11.2019 | CZ | 27.11.2019 | EE | 27.11.2019 | FI | 27.11.2019 | HR | 27.11.2019 | LT | 27.11.2019 | LV | 27.11.2019 | MC | 27.11.2019 | MK | 27.11.2019 | MT | 27.11.2019 | PL | 27.11.2019 | RO | 27.11.2019 | RS | 27.11.2019 | SI | 27.11.2019 | SK | 27.11.2019 | SM | 27.11.2019 | BG | 27.02.2020 | GR | 28.02.2020 | IS | 27.03.2020 | PT | 19.04.2020 | IE | 27.04.2020 | LU | 27.04.2020 | CH | 30.04.2020 | LI | 30.04.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 27.04.2017 | |
AL | 27.11.2019 | ||
AT | 27.11.2019 | ||
CY | 27.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
MC | 27.11.2019 | ||
MT | 27.11.2019 | ||
PL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
IE | 27.04.2020 | ||
LU | 27.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
AT | 27.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
MC | 27.11.2019 | ||
PL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
IE | 27.04.2020 | ||
LU | 27.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
AT | 27.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
MC | 27.11.2019 | ||
PL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
LU | 27.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/52] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
AT | 27.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
MC | 27.11.2019 | ||
PL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
AT | 27.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
PL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | FI | 27.11.2019 | |
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 27.11.2019 | |
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 27.11.2019 | |
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 27.11.2019 | |
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4950436 (KITAMI TETSU [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,4,7,9-11 * figure 1 * * column 2, line 3 - column 3, line 46 *; | [X]US2007221281 (TAKAGI YUJI [JP]) [X] 1-3,7,9-11 * paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0101] * * figures 1A, 1B, 2 *; | [X]GB2502772 (C S TECHNICAL SERVICES LTD [GB]) [X] 1,3,4,7,9-11 * page 10 - page 13 * * figure 1 *; | [X]WO2015013618 (SMITHS TUBULAR SYSTEMS LACONIA INC [US]) [X] 1,3-8 * page 7, line 12 - page 8, line 30 * * figures 1,2 * * claims 1-20 * * page 3, line 2 - page 6, line 3 *; | [X]US2015247032 (TAKATANI KEN [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,4,7,9-11 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0048] *; | [X]CN204986084U (JIANGSU GUANGTONG TUBE MFG CO LTD) [X] 1,3-7 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0017] * * figures 1, 2 ** paragraph [0002] * |