EP3244189 - QUANTITATIVE ANALYTE ASSAY DEVICE AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.05.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lee, Jin Po 7337 Melodia Terrace Carlsbad, CA 92011 / US | [2017/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2017/46] | Representative(s) | Lloyd, John Scott, et al Script IP Limited Turnpike House 18 Bridge Street Frome Somerset BA11 1BB / GB | [2017/46] | Application number, filing date | 17171225.0 | 27.11.2009 | [2017/46] | Priority number, date | US20080317814 | 30.12.2008 Original published format: US 317814 | [2017/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3244189 | Date: | 15.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3244189 | Date: | 26.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01N1/30, G01N33/48, G01N33/558 | [2017/46] | CPC: |
G01N33/558 (EP);
G01N33/54388 (US);
G01N21/78 (EP,US);
G01N33/74 (EP,US);
G01N2021/6439 (EP,US);
G01N2021/7786 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/25] |
Former [2017/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR QUANTITATIVEN ANALYT-ASSAY | [2017/46] | English: | QUANTITATIVE ANALYTE ASSAY DEVICE AND METHOD | [2017/46] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE DOSAGE QUANTITATIF D'ANALYTE | [2017/46] | Examination procedure | 16.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/25] | 12.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.08.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 12.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09836476.3 / EP2384428 | Opposition(s) | 27.11.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2017 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   25.01.2018 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.11.2009 | AT | 26.02.2020 | CY | 26.02.2020 | CZ | 26.02.2020 | DK | 26.02.2020 | EE | 26.02.2020 | ES | 26.02.2020 | FI | 26.02.2020 | HR | 26.02.2020 | IT | 26.02.2020 | LT | 26.02.2020 | LV | 26.02.2020 | MC | 26.02.2020 | MK | 26.02.2020 | MT | 26.02.2020 | NL | 26.02.2020 | PL | 26.02.2020 | RO | 26.02.2020 | SE | 26.02.2020 | SI | 26.02.2020 | SK | 26.02.2020 | SM | 26.02.2020 | TR | 26.02.2020 | BG | 26.05.2020 | NO | 26.05.2020 | GR | 27.05.2020 | IS | 26.06.2020 | PT | 19.07.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 27.11.2009 | |
AT | 26.02.2020 | ||
CY | 26.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
MT | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
TR | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 26.02.2020 | |
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 26.02.2020 | |
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
NO | 26.05.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5384264 (CHEN TED M [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * fig 1-8, col 4, lines 8-42; claims 1-18 * [Y] 4-14; | [XI]WO0031539 (PRAXSYS BIOSYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [X] 1 * claims 1-42 * [I] 2-14; | [XI]US2003119203 (WEI NING [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * figure 1, 1B, 1A, 2; paragraphs 12- 13, 30-52, claims 1-22 * [I] 10-14; | [XI]US2006246513 (BOHANNON ROBERT C [US]) [X] 1-9 * claims 1-48, figures 3-4, par 14, 18, 76, 82, 103, 164, 178, 189, 203, 215-216; * [I] 10-14; | [Y]EP1879028 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [Y] 4-14 * fig 3,9; claims 23, 27; *; | [A] - GEERTRUIDA A POSTHUMA-TRUMPIE ET AL, "Lateral flow (immuno)assay: its strengths, weaknesses, opportunities and threats. A literature survey", ANALYTICAL AND BIOANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20080813), vol. 393, no. 2, ISSN 1618-2650, pages 569 - 582, XP019652854 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | by applicant | US733 | US4062 | US3646346 | US3654090 | US3791392 | US3791932 | US3817838 | US3966879 | US3996345 | US4062733 | US4067959 | US4104099 | US4120945 | US4160645 | US4233402 | US4235601 | US4287300 | US4720450 | US5384264 | US5821073 |