EP3232723 - SYNCHRONIZED UPLINK-DOWNLINK HOP FOR MEASUREMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.06.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.08.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.07.2023 [2023/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2020/48] |
Former [2017/42] | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAAL, Peter c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
BARBIERI, Alan c/o Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2017/42] | Representative(s) | Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2020/48] |
Former [2017/42] | Wegner, Hans Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17174157.2 | 28.06.2012 | [2017/42] | Priority number, date | US201161504083P | 01.07.2011 Original published format: US 201161504083 P | US201213534962 | 27.06.2012 Original published format: US201213534962 | [2017/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3232723 | Date: | 18.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3232723 | Date: | 25.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/08, // H04W72/02, H04W88/08, H04W28/04, H04W16/14 | [2020/26] | CPC: |
H04W72/541 (EP,US);
H04W16/14 (EP,US);
H04W28/04 (EP,US);
H04W72/02 (EP,US);
H04W72/542 (EP,US);
H04W88/08 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/42] | H04W72/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/42] | Title | German: | SYNCHRONISIERTER UPLINK-DOWNLINK-SPRUNG FÜR MESSUNGEN | [2017/42] | English: | SYNCHRONIZED UPLINK-DOWNLINK HOP FOR MEASUREMENTS | [2017/42] | French: | SAUT SYNCHRONISÉ DE LIAISON MONTANTE ET DE LIAISON DESCENDANTE POUR DES MESURES | [2017/42] | Examination procedure | 02.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/42] | 02.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.10.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12735990.9 / EP2727428 | Opposition(s) | 26.08.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.06.2012 | AL | 25.11.2020 | AT | 25.11.2020 | CY | 25.11.2020 | CZ | 25.11.2020 | DK | 25.11.2020 | EE | 25.11.2020 | ES | 25.11.2020 | FI | 25.11.2020 | HR | 25.11.2020 | IT | 25.11.2020 | LT | 25.11.2020 | LV | 25.11.2020 | MC | 25.11.2020 | NL | 25.11.2020 | PL | 25.11.2020 | RO | 25.11.2020 | RS | 25.11.2020 | SE | 25.11.2020 | SI | 25.11.2020 | SK | 25.11.2020 | SM | 25.11.2020 | BG | 25.02.2021 | NO | 25.02.2021 | GR | 26.02.2021 | IS | 25.03.2021 | PT | 25.03.2021 | IE | 28.06.2021 | LU | 28.06.2021 | BE | 30.06.2021 | CH | 30.06.2021 | LI | 30.06.2021 | [2023/29] |
Former [2023/24] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CY | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
ES | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
IT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
IE | 28.06.2021 | ||
LU | 28.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
ES | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
IT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
IE | 28.06.2021 | ||
LU | 28.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
ES | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
IT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
IE | 28.06.2021 | ||
LU | 28.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
ES | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
IT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
IE | 28.06.2021 | ||
LU | 28.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
ES | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
IT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
LU | 28.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
ES | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
IT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
ES | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
IT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
IT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
IT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 25.11.2020 | |
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 25.11.2020 | |
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 25.11.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9602979 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [Y] 1-6 * page 1, line 5 - line 10 * * page 6, line 29 - page 7, line 19 * * page 12, line 6 - page 15, line 3 * * page 20, line 4 - line 11 * * figures 3, 4 *; | [Y]WO03094395 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [Y] 1-6 * page 1, line 7 - line 8 * * page 4, line 17 - line 23 * * page 7, line 8 - line 14 * * page 19, line 1 - line 10 * * page 19, line 21 - page 20, line 16 * * page 22, line 23 - page 23, line 21 * * figures 2, 7 *; | [A]WO2010088586 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0002] , [0030] , [0033] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraphs [0049] , [0051] * * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0062] * * figures 3, 4, 8 *; | [A]WO2010111150 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0159] - paragraph [0161] * * paragraph [0169] - paragraph [0173] * * paragraph [0184] - paragraph [0189] ** figures 24, 25 *; | [Y]US2010322185 (PARK KENNETH J [US], et al) [Y] 1-6 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraphs [0051] , [0054] , [0058] * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0073] * * paragraph [0129] - paragraph [0132] * * figures 1, 3, 29 * |