EP3413463 - ELECTRONIC CIRCUIT AND METHOD OF OPERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.10.2019 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S. Organize Sanayi Bölgesi 45030 Manisa / TR | [2018/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ÇUBUKÇU, Baran C/O Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S. Organize Sanayi Bölgesi 45030 Manisa / TR | [2018/50] | Representative(s) | Flint, Adam Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/50] | Flint, Adam Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 17174607.6 | 06.06.2017 | [2018/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3413463 | Date: | 12.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H03G3/30, H03G5/16, H03F1/52, H03G9/02, H04R3/04 | [2018/50] | CPC: |
H03G5/165 (EP);
H03F1/30 (EP);
H03F1/52 (EP);
H03F3/187 (EP);
H03G3/3005 (EP);
H03G9/025 (EP);
H03F2200/03 (EP);
H03F2200/447 (EP);
H04R3/007 (EP);
H04R3/04 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE SCHALTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB | [2018/50] | English: | ELECTRONIC CIRCUIT AND METHOD OF OPERATION | [2018/50] | French: | CIRCUIT ÉLECTRONIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT | [2018/50] | Examination procedure | 13.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/47] | 03.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/47] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5473282 (JANSSENS JAN ALBERT MARIA [NL], et al) [X] 1,2,8,9 * abstract * * column 2, lines 61-63 * * column 3, lines 1-9, 46-64 * * column 5, line 66 - column 6, line 40 * * column 8, lines 26-39 * [I] 3-6,10-13; | [A]US5818301 (HIGASHIYAMA KATSUHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-6,8-13 * abstract * * column 6, lines 43-50 * * column 7, lines 14-33 * * column 8, line 66 - column 9, line 19 *; | [XI]JP2004040694 (ALPINE ELECTRONICS INC) [X] 1,2,8,9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [00 8] - [0018] *[I] 3,5-7,10,12-14; | [XI]JP2005065141 (SONY CORP) [X] 1-3,5,6,8-10,12,13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [00 9] - [0011] - [0 19] , [0021] , [0022] * [I] 4,11; | [XI]JP2007027821 (ALPINE ELECTRONICS INC) [X] 1,2,8,9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0023] - [0034] - [0 39] , [0 41] * [I] 3-6,10-13; | [XI]US2008273717 (WILLIS GERALD [US], et al) [X] 1,2,8,9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0025] , [0026] , [0028] - [0030] - [0033] - [0037] - [0039] , [0042] * [I] 3-6,10-13; | [A]US2016212533 (RISBERG PÄR GUNNARS [SE]) [A] 1-6,8-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0039] , [ 100] - [0102] *; | [XA]WO2016155853 (HARMAN BECKER AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,5,7,8,12,14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0060] , [0061] , [0123] - [0127] - [0155] - [0157] * [A] 2-4,6,9-11,13 |