EP3260227 - SAW BLADE FOR A CIRCULAR SAW, METHOD FOR PRODUCING A SAW BLADE AND CIRCULAR SAW MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.05.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KEURO Besitz GmbH & Co. EDV-Dienstleistungs KG Industriestrasse 14 77855 Achern / DE | [2017/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krebber, Sönke Florian Battertweg 1 76530 Baden-Baden / DE | 02 /
Stolzer, Armin Battertweg 1 76530 Baden-Baden / DE | [2017/52] | Representative(s) | LBP Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Siegfried-Kühn-Straße 4 76135 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/52] | Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Siegfried-Kühn-Straße 4 76135 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 17174794.2 | 07.06.2017 | [2017/52] | Priority number, date | DE201610111543 | 23.06.2016 Original published format: DE102016111543 | [2017/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3260227 | Date: | 27.12.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3260227 | Date: | 04.08.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B23D47/00, B23D59/02, B23D61/02 | [2017/52] | CPC: |
B23D59/025 (EP,US);
B23D47/005 (EP,US);
B23D59/02 (EP,US);
B23D61/025 (EP,US);
B23D65/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/25] |
Former [2017/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SÄGEBLATT FÜR EINE KREISSÄGE, VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINES SÄGEBLATTS UND KREISSÄGEMASCHINE | [2017/52] | English: | SAW BLADE FOR A CIRCULAR SAW, METHOD FOR PRODUCING A SAW BLADE AND CIRCULAR SAW MACHINE | [2017/52] | French: | LAME DE SCIE POUR UNE SCIE CIRCULAIRE, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE LAME DE SCIE ET SCIE CIRCULAIRE | [2017/52] | Examination procedure | 07.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/25] | 13.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.06.2017 | AL | 04.08.2021 | CY | 04.08.2021 | DK | 04.08.2021 | EE | 04.08.2021 | ES | 04.08.2021 | FI | 04.08.2021 | HR | 04.08.2021 | LT | 04.08.2021 | LV | 04.08.2021 | MC | 04.08.2021 | PL | 04.08.2021 | RO | 04.08.2021 | RS | 04.08.2021 | SE | 04.08.2021 | SI | 04.08.2021 | SK | 04.08.2021 | SM | 04.08.2021 | BG | 04.11.2021 | NO | 04.11.2021 | GR | 05.11.2021 | IS | 04.12.2021 | PT | 06.12.2021 | [2024/20] |
Former [2024/18] | HU | 07.06.2017 | |
AL | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | DK | 04.08.2021 | |
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | DK | 04.08.2021 | |
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | DK | 04.08.2021 | |
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | ES | 04.08.2021 | |
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | ES | 04.08.2021 | |
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | ES | 04.08.2021 | |
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 04.08.2021 | |
NO | 04.11.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]CN204148645U (SHANDONG WEIDA SAW CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4,5,10,12 * the whole document * [A] 3,7-9,11,13,14 [Y] 6,15; | [XA]CN104191467 (LONGYAN LISHILANG SAW CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4,7-10,12-14 * the whole document * [A] 3,5,6,11,15; | [XA]CN204019643U (LONGYAN LISHILANG SAW INDUSTRY CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4,7-10,12-14 * the whole document * [A] 3,5,6,11,15; | [Y]US927164 (PUFFER ALVIN W [US]) [Y] 6 * page 1, column r, line 75 - line 81 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]US2016008897 (MCGEHEE RONALD W [US]) [Y] 15 * paragraphs [0023] , [0024] * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP0239676 (VOLKENBORN A FA [DE]) [A] 2,11 * column 2, line 29 - line 35 * * column 3, line 21 - line 27 * |