EP3261147 - ORGANIC ELECTROLUMINESCENT MATERIALS AND DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.12.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.08.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.06.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universal Display Corporation 375 Phillips Boulevard Ewing, NJ 08618 / US | [2020/09] |
Former [2017/52] | For all designated states Universal Display Corporation 375 Ewing Blvd. Ewing, New Jersey 08618 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARGULIES, Eric A. c/o Universal Display Corporation 375 Phillips Boulevard Ewing, NJ New Jersey 08618 / US | 02 /
JI, Zhiqiang c/o Universal Display Corporation 375 Phillips Boulevard Ewing, NJ New Jersey 08618 / US | 03 /
TSAI, Jui-Yi c/o Universal Display Corporation 375 Phillips Boulevard Ewing, NJ New Jersey 08618 / US | 04 /
LIN, Chun c/o Universal Display Corporation 375 Phillips Boulevard Ewing, NJ New Jersey 08618 / US | 05 /
DYATKIN, Alexey Borisovich c/o Universal Display Corporation 375 Phillips Boulevard Ewing, NJ New Jersey 08618 / US | 06 /
SU, Mingjuan c/o Universal Display Corporation 375 Phillips Boulevard Ewing, NJ New Jersey 08618 / US | 07 /
MA, Bin c/o Universal Display Corporation 375 Phillips Boulevard Ewing, NJ New Jersey 08618 / US | 08 /
WEAVER, Michael S. c/o Universal Display Corporation 375 Phillips Boulevard Ewing, NJ New Jersey 08618 / US | 09 /
BROWN, Julia, J. c/o Universal Display Corporation 375 Phillips Boulevard Ewing, NJ New Jersey 08618 / US | 10 /
ZENG, Lichang c/o Universal Display Corporation 375 Phillips Boulevard Ewing, NJ New Jersey 08618 / US | 11 /
YEAGER, Walter c/o Universal Display Corporation 375 Phillips Boulevard Ewing, NJ New Jersey 08618 / US | 12 /
DEANGELIS, Alan c/o Universal Display Corporation 375 Phillips Boulevard Ewing, NJ New Jersey 08618 / US | 13 /
XIA, Chuanjun c/o Universal Display Corporation 375 Phillips Boulevard Ewing, NJ New Jersey 08618 / US | [2017/52] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Norbert Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/08] | Hansen, Norbert Maiwald Patentanwalts- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2017/52] | Hansen, Norbert Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17176695.9 | 19.06.2017 | [2017/52] | Priority number, date | US201662352139P | 20.06.2016 Original published format: US 201662352139 P | US201662352119P | 20.06.2016 Original published format: US 201662352119 P | US201762450848P | 26.01.2017 Original published format: US 201762450848 P | US201762479795P | 31.03.2017 Original published format: US 201762479795 P | US201762480746P | 03.04.2017 Original published format: US 201762480746 P | US201762516329P | 07.06.2017 Original published format: US 201762516329 P | US201715619217 | 09.06.2017 Original published format: US201715619217 | [2017/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3261147 | Date: | 27.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3261147 | Date: | 24.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01L51/54, C09K11/06 | [2017/52] | CPC: |
C09K11/06 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H10K85/342 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07F15/0033 (CN,US);
C07F1/00 (CN);
C07F15/002 (CN);
C07F15/0046 (CN);
C07F15/0086 (CN);
H10K50/11 (EP,CN,US);
H10K50/12 (KR);
H10K85/344 (CN,KR);
H10K85/346 (EP,CN,KR);
H10K85/348 (CN,KR);
H10K85/371 (CN,KR);
C09K2211/1007 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1011 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1022 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1029 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1033 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1044 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1088 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1092 (EP,US);
C09K2211/185 (EP,CN,US);
C09K2211/188 (CN);
H10K2101/10 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/30] |
Former [2017/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ORGANISCHE ELEKTROLUMINESZENTE MATERIALIEN UND VORRICHTUNGEN | [2017/52] | English: | ORGANIC ELECTROLUMINESCENT MATERIALS AND DEVICES | [2017/52] | French: | MATÉRIAUX ET DISPOSITIFS ÉLECTROLUMINESCENTS ORGANIQUES | [2017/52] | Examination procedure | 19.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/30] | 02.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.12.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21154291.5 / EP3843171 | Opposition(s) | 25.11.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.06.2017 | AL | 24.02.2021 | AT | 24.02.2021 | CY | 24.02.2021 | CZ | 24.02.2021 | DK | 24.02.2021 | EE | 24.02.2021 | ES | 24.02.2021 | FI | 24.02.2021 | HR | 24.02.2021 | IT | 24.02.2021 | LT | 24.02.2021 | LV | 24.02.2021 | MC | 24.02.2021 | NL | 24.02.2021 | PL | 24.02.2021 | RO | 24.02.2021 | RS | 24.02.2021 | SE | 24.02.2021 | SI | 24.02.2021 | SK | 24.02.2021 | SM | 24.02.2021 | BG | 24.05.2021 | NO | 24.05.2021 | GR | 25.05.2021 | IE | 19.06.2021 | LU | 19.06.2021 | IS | 24.06.2021 | PT | 24.06.2021 | BE | 30.06.2021 | CH | 30.06.2021 | LI | 30.06.2021 | [2023/30] |
Former [2023/28] | HU | 19.06.2017 | |
AL | 24.02.2021 | ||
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
IT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IE | 19.06.2021 | ||
LU | 19.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
IT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IE | 19.06.2021 | ||
LU | 19.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
IT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IE | 19.06.2021 | ||
LU | 19.06.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IE | 19.06.2021 | ||
LU | 19.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
LU | 19.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
AT | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 24.02.2021 | |
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 24.02.2021 | |
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 24.02.2021 | |
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 24.02.2021 | |
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2013328019 (XIA CHUANJUN [US], et al) [X] 1,10-13,15 * paragraph [0003]; compounds 2,3,9,10 * [A] 2-9; | [X] - ROBERT M. EDKINS ET AL, "The synthesis and photophysics of tris-heteroleptic cyclometalated iridium complexes", DALTON TRANSACTIONS, (20111014), vol. 40, no. 38, pages 9672 - 9678, XP055415764 [X] 1,11,13,15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c1dt10619h | [X] - PLUMMER E A ET AL, "ELECTROPHOSPHORESCENT DEVICES BASED ON CATIONIC COMPLEXES: CONTROL OF SWITCH-ON VOLTAGE AND EFFICIENCY THROUGH MODIFICATION OF CHARGE INJECTION AND CHARGE TRANSPORT", ADVANCED FUNCTIONAL MATERIALS, WILEY - V C H VERLAG GMBH & CO. KGAA, DE, (20050201), vol. 15, no. 2, doi:10.1002/ADFM.200400218, ISSN 1616-301X, pages 281 - 289, XP001225434 [X] 15 * figures 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/adfm.200400218 | Examination | - CHRISTOPHER S. BURKE ET AL, ")", RSC ADVANCES, (20160414), vol. 6, no. 47, doi:10.1039/C6RA06086B, pages 40869 - 40877, XP055653520 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C6RA06086B | by applicant | US4769292 | US5061569 | US5247190 | JPH0773529 | EP0650955 | US5639914 | US5703436 | US5707745 | KR0133652B | US5834893 | US5844363 | US6013982 | US6087196 | US6091195 | US6097147 | WO0139234 | US2001019782 | US6294398 | US6303238 | US6337102 | WO0215645 | US2002034656 | US6413656 | EP1238981 | EP1239526 | EP1244155 | US6468819 | US2002158242 | US6517957 | US2003068526 | US2003072964 | WO03040257 | US2003138657 | WO03060956 | US2003162053 | US2003175553 | US6653654 | US6656612 | US2003230980 | US6670645 | JP2004022334 | US6687266 | US2004036077 | US6699599 | US2004174116 | WO2004093207 | US6835469 | WO2005014551 | WO2005019373 | JP2005112765 | US2005123751 | US2005123788 | US2005123791 | JP2005149918 | US2005139810 | US6916554 | US6921915 | WO2005075451 | WO2005089025 | JP2005268199 | US2005238919 | US2005244673 | CN1696137 | US2005260449 | EP1602648 | US2006008670 | EP1617493 | EP1624500 | US2006065890 | EP1642951 | EP1647554 | WO2006056418 | US2006127696 | US2006134459 | US2006134462 | WO2006072002 | WO2006081780 | WO2006081973 | US2006182993 | EP1698613 | US2006202194 | US2006240279 | WO2006114966 | US2006251923 | WO2006121811 | EP1725079 | US2006280965 | EP1734038 | US7154114 | US2007018155 | US2007034863 | WO2007018067 | JP2007091719 | US2007087321 | US2007103060 | US2007104979 | US2007104980 | US2007104977 | US2007111026 | WO2007063754 | US2007138437 | US2007145888 | EP1806334 | US2007160905 | US2007181874 | US2007190359 | US2007224450 | WO2007108362 | JP2007254297 | US2007231600 | WO2007111263 | US7279704 | EP1841834 | WO2007115970 | WO2007115981 | US2007252140 | WO2007125714 | US2007278938 | US2007278936 | US2008005851 | US2008014464 | US2008020237 | JP2008021687 | US7332232 | WO2008023550 | WO2008023759 | WO2008035571 | US2008091025 | US2008106190 | US2008107919 | WO2008054584 | WO2008056746 | US7378162 | US2008124572 | EP1930964 | US2008145707 | US2008161567 | WO2008078800 | EP1956007 | WO2008096609 | EP1961743 | WO2008101842 | US2008210930 | EP1968131 | US2008220265 | EP1972613 | US2008233434 | US2008233410 | US7431968 | US2008261076 | EP1997799 | US2008297033 | US2008303417 | WO2009000673 | EP2011790 | WO2009003455 | WO2009003898 | WO2009008277 | US2009017330 | WO2009011327 | US2009030202 | EP2020694 | WO2009021126 | US2009039776 | EP2034538 | US2009066235 | US2009085476 | US2009104472 | WO2009050281 | US2009101870 | US2009108737 | EP2055700 | EP2055701 | EP1841834 | US2009115320 | US2009115322 | US2009115316 | US7534505 | WO2009063833 | EP2062907 | WO2009066778 | WO2009066779 | US2009140637 | US2009167167 | US2009167161 | US2009167162 | WO2009086028 | US2009179555 | US2009179554 | EP2085382 | WO2009100991 | US2009218940 | WO2009145016 | US2009302743 | WO2009148269 | US2009309488 | US2010012931 | US7675228 | WO2010028151 | US2010084966 | US2010090591 | US2010102716 | US2010105902 | US2010108990 | WO2010056066 | WO2010054731 | US7728137 | WO2010061824 | JP4478555B | US2010148663 | WO2010067894 | US7740957 | WO2010072300 | KR20100079458 | US7759489 | US2010187984 | WO2010086089 | WO2010107244 | US2010244004 | WO2010118029 | US2010270916 | US2010288362 | US2010295032 | US2011007385 | US2011057559 | WO2011044988 | WO2011051404 | US2011108822 | US7951947 | WO2011075644 | WO2011074770 | US7968146 | US2011156017 | US2011163302 | WO2011081423 | WO2011081431 | WO2011086863 | KR20110088898 | US2011204333 | US2011210320 | WO2011105373 | US2011215710 | WO2011107491 | US2011227049 | US2011240968 | TW201139402 | US2011278551 | US2011285275 | US8067099 | WO2012020327 | US2012075273 | KR20120032054 | JP2012074444 | US2012126221 | US2012146012 | US2012193612 | KR20120088644 | US2012205642 | US2012214993 | WO2012128298 | CN102702075 | WO2012133644 | WO2012133649 | US2012292601 | KR20120129733 | WO2012163471 | WO2012177006 | US2013009543 | WO2013018530 | US2013033172 | WO2013024872 | WO2013035275 | WO2013039073 | US8415031 | DE102012005215 | KR20130043460 | US2013105787 | WO2013081315 | JP2013110263 | WO2013079217 | US2013146848 | WO2013087142 | US2013165653 | WO2013094620 | KR20130077473 | US2013175519 | TW201329200 | US2013181190 | WO2013107487 | WO2013118812 | TW201332980 | WO2013120577 | US2013241401 | KR20130108183 | WO2013145667 | KR20130115564 | WO2013157367 | EP2660300 | US8592586 | WO2013175747 | WO2013174471 | WO2013180376 | US2013334521 | WO2013191404 | US2014001446 | WO2014002873 | WO2014007565 | EP2684932 | CN103508940 | WO2014009310 | WO2014008982 | US2014014925 | US2014014927 | JP2014009196 | WO2014015935 | WO2014015937 | US2014034914 | WO2014023377 | WO2014024131 | WO2014030872 | WO2014030921 | WO2014031977 | WO2014034791 | WO2014038456 | CN103694277 | US2014103305 | US2014117329 | EP2730583 | US2014183517 | WO2014104514 | US2014183503 | WO2014104499 | WO2014104535 | EP2757608 | WO2014112450 | US2014225088 | US2014246656 | WO2014142472 | US2014284580 | WO2014157018 | US8871361 | US2015060804 | - BALDO et al., "Highly Efficient Phosphorescent Emission from Organic Electroluminescent Devices", Nature, (19980000), vol. 395, doi:doi:10.1038/25954, pages 151 - 154, XP001002103 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/25954 | - BALDO et al., "Very high-efficiency green organic light-emitting devices based on electrophosphorescence", Appl. Phys. Lett., (19990000), vol. 75, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1063/1.124258, pages 4 - 6, XP012023409 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.124258 | WO2007US23098 | WO2009US42829 |