EP3263764 - DEVICE FOR DRILLING LINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.11.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.2019 [2019/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PRO.EFF GmbH Magdeburger Straße 10 32423 Minden / DE | [2018/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PUMPE, Ulrich Hasenkamp 41 32423 Minden / DE | [2018/01] | Representative(s) | Flötotto, Hubert Meldau - Strauss - Flötotto Patentanwälte Gartenstrasse 4 33332 Gütersloh / DE | [2018/01] | Application number, filing date | 17178025.7 | 27.06.2017 | [2018/01] | Priority number, date | DE201620103444U | 29.06.2016 Original published format: DE 202016103444 U | [2018/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3263764 | Date: | 03.01.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | D07B7/04, H01B13/02, // D07B3/02 | [2018/01] | CPC: |
D07B7/04 (EP,US);
D07B2207/409 (EP);
D07B2501/406 (EP);
D07B3/02 (EP,US);
H01B13/0207 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERDRILLEN VON LEITUNGEN | [2018/01] | English: | DEVICE FOR DRILLING LINES | [2018/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF DESTINÉ À TORSADER DES TUYAUX | [2018/01] | Examination procedure | 04.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/01] | 14.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/01] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2009283260 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 1-9 * paragraphs [0003] , [00 8] , [0 39] , [0 43] , [0 44] , [0 63] * * figures 1-8 *; | [Y]DE202009004914U (PRO EFF GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-9 * paragraphs [0009] , [0 10] * * figure 1 *; | [A]JP2009129729 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP, et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0021] * * figures 1-6 *; | [A]JP2007220378 (YAZAKI CORP) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0021] , [0 25] , [0 30] * * figure 3 *; | [A]JP2008062297 (BABA SHIGENORI) [A] 1 * figure 2 *; | [A]JP2005071753 (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS) [A] 1 * paragraph [0047] * * figure 9 * | by applicant | EP0917746 |