EP3263231 - METHOD OF SEPARATING PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 28.04.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2023 | New entry: Number of petition for review | 16.06.2023 | New entry: Petitioner in petition for review | 16.06.2023 | New entry: Date of filing of petition for review | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADR Technology B.V. Mekelweg 4 2628 CD Delft / NL | [2018/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Berkhout, Simon Peter Maria Molensingel 117 2614 LC Delft / NL | 02 /
Rem, Peter Carlo Jaagpad 5B 2288 AB Rijswijk / NL | [2018/01] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 Carnegieplein 5 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2018/01] | Application number, filing date | 17182187.9 | 01.04.2009 | [2018/01] | Priority number, date | NL20082001431 | 02.04.2008 Original published format: NL 2001431 | [2018/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3263231 | Date: | 03.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3263231 | Date: | 29.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B07B13/10 | [2018/01] | CPC: |
B07B13/10 (EP,US);
B07B15/00 (US);
B07B13/003 (US);
B22C5/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/01] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM TRENNEN VON TEILCHEN | [2018/01] | English: | METHOD OF SEPARATING PARTICLES | [2018/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE SÉPARATION DE PARTICULES | [2018/01] | Examination procedure | 19.07.2017 | Examination requested [2018/01] | 19.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09726543.3 / EP2271441 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
24.05.2019
ADMISSIBLE SGM Magnetics S.p.A. Via Leno 2/D 25025 Manerbio (BS) / IT Opponent's representative Concone, Emanuele, et al, et al Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Via Carducci 8 20123 Milano / IT | 02
28.05.2019
ADMISSIBLE KM Key Machinery GmbH Wachsenegg 3 87477 Sulzberg / DE Opponent's representative Patentanwaltzkanzlei Hutzelmann Schloß Osterberg 89296 Osterberg / DE | [2019/27] | 12.06.2019 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.10.2019 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 14.08.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.10.2020 | 16.10.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.03.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.05.2021 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 28.05.2021 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 23.03.2023 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2023/22] | Appeal following opposition | 29.07.2021 | Appeal received No. T1227/21 | 28.07.2021 | Payment of appeal fee | 28.09.2021 | Statement of grounds filed | 23.03.2023 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 11.04.2023 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 23.03.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | Petition(s) for review: | 05.06.2023 | Petition for review received | Number: R0010/23 | for appeal No. T1227/21-3207 | Petitioner: OP02 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.04.2009 | CY | 29.08.2018 | EE | 29.08.2018 | HR | 29.08.2018 | LV | 29.08.2018 | MC | 29.08.2018 | MK | 29.08.2018 | MT | 29.08.2018 | RO | 29.08.2018 | SI | 29.08.2018 | SK | 29.08.2018 | TR | 29.08.2018 | BG | 29.11.2018 | GR | 30.11.2018 | IS | 29.12.2018 | IE | 01.04.2019 | LU | 01.04.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 01.04.2009 | |
CY | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
MT | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
TR | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
IE | 01.04.2019 | ||
LU | 01.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 01.04.2009 | |
CY | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
TR | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
IE | 01.04.2019 | ||
LU | 01.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | CY | 29.08.2018 | |
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
TR | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
IE | 01.04.2019 | ||
LU | 01.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | EE | 29.08.2018 | |
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
TR | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
IE | 01.04.2019 | ||
LU | 01.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | EE | 29.08.2018 | |
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
TR | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
LU | 01.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | EE | 29.08.2018 | |
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
LU | 01.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/02] | EE | 29.08.2018 | |
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | EE | 29.08.2018 | |
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | EE | 29.08.2018 | |
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | HR | 29.08.2018 | |
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | HR | 29.08.2018 | |
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | HR | 29.08.2018 | |
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | IS | 29.12.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3757946 (BERKOWITZ L, et al) [A] 1,4 * abstract * * column 2, line 30 - line 43 * * column 5, line 64 - column 6, line 27 * * column 10, line 43 - column 11, line 17 * * figure - *; | [A]DE2436864 (RHEINSTAHL AG) [A] 1,4 * page 7, line 14 - line 30 * * claim - ** figure - *; | [A]WO2004082839 (UNIV DELFT TECH [NL], et al) [A] 1-4 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - line 8 * * page 1, line 22 - line 28 * * page 4, line 6 - page 5, line 20 * * page 5, line 32 - page 7, line 3 * * figure . * | Opposition | US2095385 | US3757946 | DE2436864 | DE9419448U | US5589654 | EP1676645 |