EP3293488 - SYSTEM AND METHOD OF SIMULATANEOUSLY GENERATING A MULTIPLE LANE MAP AND LOCALIZING A VEHICLE IN THE GENERATED MAP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.05.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.06.2019 [2019/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dura Operating, LLC 1780 Pond Run Auburn Hills, MI 48326 / US | [2018/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUANG, Shou 35261 Grand River Ave Apt 104 Farmington, MI Michigan 48327 / US | 02 /
SIDDIQUI, Danish Uzair 15 Viking Lane Apt 2504 Etobicoke, Ontario M9B0A4 / CA | [2018/11] | Representative(s) | Christophersen & Partner Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Im Mediapark 6A 50670 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/11] | Bungartz Christophersen Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Im Mediapark 6A 50670 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 17184840.1 | 04.08.2017 | [2018/11] | Priority number, date | US201615242151 | 19.08.2016 Original published format: US201615242151 | [2018/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3293488 | Date: | 14.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3293488 | Date: | 13.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/32, G06K9/00, G08G1/16 | [2018/11] | CPC: |
G08G1/167 (EP,US);
G08G1/166 (EP,CN,US);
G06V20/584 (US);
G01C21/3822 (EP,CN,US);
G01C21/3848 (EP,CN,US);
G01S19/48 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR SIMULTANEN ERZEUGUNG EINER MEHRFACHSPURKARTE UND ZUR LOKALISIERUNG EINES FAHRZEUGS IN DER ERZEUGTEN KARTE | [2018/11] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD OF SIMULATANEOUSLY GENERATING A MULTIPLE LANE MAP AND LOCALIZING A VEHICLE IN THE GENERATED MAP | [2018/11] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE GÉNÉRATION SIMULTANÉE D'UNE CARTE DE VOIES MULTIPLES ET DE LOCALISATION D'UN VÉHICULE DANS LA CARTE GÉNÉRÉE | [2018/11] | Examination procedure | 14.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/23] | 21.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/23] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2011298602 (CHEN YU-SUNG [TW], et al) [A] 2,4 * paragraphs [0007] - [0010] - [0 21] - [0024] ** figure 4 *; | [Y]US2012062745 (HAN YOUNG IN [KR], et al) [Y] 2,4 * paragraph [0036] *; | [IA]DE102013103953 (GM GLOBAL TECH OPERATIONS INC [US]) [I] 1,4,6,12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [0007] , [0020] , [0022] , [0028] , [0029] , [0033] - [0039] * * figures 1, 2 * [A] 2,3,14; | [IA]DE102012215322 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [I] 1,4,6,12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] - [0012] - [0 15] - [0017] - [0022] , [0029] , [0030] , [0035] , [0041] - [0044] - [0051] * * figures 1, 3, 5 * [A] 2,3,14; | [XYI]DE102013211696 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] , [0012] , [0014] - [0019] - [0 22] - [0026] - [0 36] - [0040] - [0 43] , [0 45] * * figures 2, 3 * [Y] 2,4 [I] 1,3,6,14; | [I]US2015292891 (KOJO NAOKI [US]) [I] 1-4,12,14 * the whole document * |