EP3285128 - HYDROELECTRIC POWER PLANT REAL-TIME MONITORING SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.05.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Power Vision Engineering Sàrl Rue des Jordils 40 1025 St-Sulpice / CH | [2021/02] |
Former [2018/08] | For all designated states Power Vision Engineering Sarl Chemin des Champs-Courbes 1 1024 Ecublens / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nicolet, Christophe Rue du Maupas 22 1004 Lausanne / CH | 02 /
Bollaert, Erik Avenue de l'Avenir 4 1009 Pully / CH | [2018/08] | Representative(s) | Ganguillet, Cyril, et al ABREMA SA Avenue du Théâtre 16 1005 Lausanne / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2020/47] | Ganguillet, Cyril, et al ABREMA SA Avenue du Théâtre 16 P.O. Box 5027 1002 Lausanne / CH | ||
Former [2018/08] | Ganguillet, Cyril, et al ABREMA Agence Brevets & Marques Ganguillet Avenue du Théâtre 16 P.O. Box 5027 1002 Lausanne / CH | Application number, filing date | 17193081.1 | 07.05.2013 | [2018/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3285128 | Date: | 21.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3285128 | Date: | 18.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G05B23/02, F03B13/06, G05B17/02 | [2018/08] | CPC: |
F03B13/06 (EP);
G05B17/02 (EP);
G05B23/0232 (EP);
F05B2260/80 (EP);
F05B2260/84 (EP);
Y02E10/20 (EP);
Y02E60/16 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/24] |
Former [2018/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | WASSERKRAFTWERK-ECHTZEITÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN | [2018/08] | English: | HYDROELECTRIC POWER PLANT REAL-TIME MONITORING SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2018/08] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE SURVEILLANCE DE CENTRALES HYDROÉLECTRIQUES EN TEMPS RÉEL | [2018/08] | Examination procedure | 26.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/24] | 09.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.10.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13166919.4 / EP2801879 | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.05.2013 | AL | 18.11.2020 | CY | 18.11.2020 | CZ | 18.11.2020 | DK | 18.11.2020 | EE | 18.11.2020 | FI | 18.11.2020 | HR | 18.11.2020 | LT | 18.11.2020 | LV | 18.11.2020 | MC | 18.11.2020 | NL | 18.11.2020 | PL | 18.11.2020 | RO | 18.11.2020 | RS | 18.11.2020 | SK | 18.11.2020 | SM | 18.11.2020 | BG | 18.02.2021 | GR | 19.02.2021 | IS | 18.03.2021 | IE | 07.05.2021 | LU | 07.05.2021 | BE | 31.05.2021 | [2023/30] |
Former [2023/29] | HU | 07.05.2013 | |
AL | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
IE | 07.05.2021 | ||
LU | 07.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
IE | 07.05.2021 | ||
LU | 07.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
IE | 07.05.2021 | ||
LU | 07.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
LU | 07.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | CZ | 18.11.2020 | |
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CZ | 18.11.2020 | |
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | CZ | 18.11.2020 | |
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | CZ | 18.11.2020 | |
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 18.11.2020 | |
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | FI | 18.11.2020 | |
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | FI | 18.11.2020 | |
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | FI | 18.11.2020 | |
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 18.11.2020 | |
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 18.11.2020 | |
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 18.11.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]KR20010056616 (KOREA WATER RESOURCES CORP [KR]) [A] 1,15* the whole document *; | [A]US2012072029 (PERSAUD GERALD [CA], et al) [A] 1,15 * the whole document *; | [IA]EP2525087 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [I] 1-7,11,13-17 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0069] * * paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0100] * [A] 8-10,12,18 |