EP3333474 - ADDITIVELY MANUFACTURED REINFORCED STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, LT | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 929 Long Bridge Drive Arlington, VA 22202 / US | [2023/12] |
Former [2018/24] | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VETO, Christopher C. The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | 02 /
GRAYSON, Gary David The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | 03 /
BARACKMAN, Victor John The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | [2018/24] | Representative(s) | Duxbury, Stephen, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [2018/24] | Application number, filing date | 17199094.8 | 30.10.2017 | [2018/24] | Priority number, date | US201615375640 | 12.12.2016 Original published format: US201615375640 | [2018/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3333474 | Date: | 13.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3333474 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F17C1/08 | [2018/24] | CPC: |
F17C1/08 (EP,CN,US);
B64G1/402 (US);
B33Y80/00 (US);
F17C13/002 (CN);
F17C13/008 (CN,US);
F17C2201/0109 (EP,US);
F17C2201/0147 (US);
F17C2201/032 (EP,US);
F17C2201/054 (EP,US);
F17C2203/012 (EP,CN,US);
F17C2203/0617 (EP,US);
F17C2203/0619 (EP,US);
F17C2203/0636 (EP,US);
F17C2203/0646 (EP,US);
F17C2203/0648 (EP,US);
F17C2209/21 (US);
F17C2209/232 (CN);
F17C2221/011 (EP,US);
F17C2221/012 (EP,US);
F17C2223/0153 (EP,US);
F17C2227/0302 (EP,US);
F17C2227/0337 (EP,US);
F17C2227/0381 (EP,US);
F17C2250/043 (EP,US);
F17C2250/0439 (EP,US);
F17C2260/011 (EP,US);
F17C2260/012 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/24] | Title | German: | GENERATIVE GEFERTIGTE VERSTÄRKTE STRUKTUR | [2018/24] | English: | ADDITIVELY MANUFACTURED REINFORCED STRUCTURE | [2018/24] | French: | STRUCTURE RENFORCÉE FABRIQUÉE DE MANIÈRE ADDITIVE | [2018/24] | Examination procedure | 30.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/24] | 30.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LT | 06.12.2023 | BG | 06.03.2024 | GR | 07.03.2024 | [2024/21] |
Former [2024/20] | GR | 07.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2016061381 (KOTLIAR IGOR K [US]) [X] 1,3,4,6,7 * figures 1-5 *[I] 2,5,9; | [XI]FR3025491 (ASSYSTEM FRANCE [FR]) [X] 1-12 * the whole document * [I] 13-15; | [X]EP3009344 (AIRBUS OPERATIONS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3-8 * paragraph [0017]; figures 2,6 * |