EP3346579 - RESONANT CIRCUIT FOR ENERGY TRANSFER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.06.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.07.2019 [2019/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Feldkircherstrasse 100 9494 Schaan / LI | [2018/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dr. Zenkner, Heinz Markgrafenstrasse 18d 86156 Augsburg / DE | [2018/28] | Representative(s) | Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Corporate Intellectual Property Feldkircherstrasse 100 Postfach 333 9494 Schaan / LI | [2018/28] | Application number, filing date | 17199857.8 | 03.11.2017 | [2018/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3346579 | Date: | 11.07.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H02J50/12 | [2018/28] | CPC: |
H02J50/12 (EP,US);
H01F27/24 (US);
H01F27/28 (US);
H01F38/14 (US);
H02J50/40 (US);
H02J7/02 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RESONANTER SCHWINGKREIS ZUM ÜBERTRAGEN VON ELEKTRISCHER ENERGIE | [2018/28] | English: | RESONANT CIRCUIT FOR ENERGY TRANSFER | [2018/28] | French: | CIRCUIT RÉSONANT POUR LE TRANSFERT D'ÉNERGIE | [2018/28] | Examination procedure | 20.09.2018 | Observations by third parties | 24.09.2018 | Observations by third parties | 12.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/28] | 19.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/28] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2306617 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0005]; figures 1,3 * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0074] *; | [A]JP2012023957 (TDK CORP) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0031]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2013223640 (URANO TAKASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-8* abstract *; | [A]JP2016187260 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0026]; figure 1 * |