blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3342656

EP3342656 - VEHICLE BRAKE SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A VEHICLE BRAKE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.08.2021
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  28.08.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.05.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.04.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  18.01.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  01.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip22.07.2022Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE, MK
published on 24.08.2022  [2022/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Robert Bosch GmbH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[2020/18]
Former [2018/27]For all designated states
Robert Bosch GmbH
P.O. Box 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Zhou, Wenguang
45010 Dunbarton Drive
Novi, MI 48375 / US
02 / Foitzik, Bertram
Ilsfelder Str. 28/1
74360 Ilsfeld / DE
03 / Wu, Kevin
43011 Brookstone Drive
Novi, MI 48377 / US
 [2018/27]
Representative(s)(deleted)
[2020/40]
Application number, filing date17202784.921.11.2017
[2018/27]
Priority number, dateUS20161539140327.12.2016         Original published format: US201615391403
[2018/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3342656
Date:04.07.2018
Language:EN
[2018/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3342656
Date:30.09.2020
Language:EN
[2020/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.04.2018
ClassificationIPC:B60T17/22, B60T13/66, B60T8/00, B60T13/14, B60T13/74, // B60T7/04, B60T8/40, B60T11/16, B60T13/68
[2020/21]
CPC:
B60T13/745 (EP,KR,US); B60T13/146 (EP,US); B60T13/662 (EP,US);
B60T13/686 (EP,KR,US); B60T17/221 (EP,US); B60T7/042 (EP,KR,US);
B60T8/00 (US); B60T8/4081 (EP,KR,US); B60T11/16 (EP,US);
B60T2220/04 (KR); B60T2270/404 (EP,US); B60T2270/82 (EP,US);
B60Y2400/306 (KR); B60Y2400/81 (KR) (-)
Former IPC [2018/27]B60T17/22, B60T13/66, // B60T7/04, B60T8/40, B60T11/16, B60T13/68
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/08]
Former [2018/27]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:FAHRZEUGBREMSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES FAHRZEUGBREMSSYSTEMS[2018/27]
English:VEHICLE BRAKE SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A VEHICLE BRAKE SYSTEM[2018/27]
French:SYSTÈME DE FREINAGE DE VÉHICULE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN SYSTÈME DE FREINAGE DE VÉHICULE[2018/27]
Examination procedure02.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/08]
04.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
24.04.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.08.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.05.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.08.2020Fee for grant paid
25.08.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.08.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)01.07.2021No opposition filed within time limit [2021/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU21.11.2017
AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CY30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
DK30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
ES30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
IT30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
MC30.09.2020
MK30.09.2020
MT30.09.2020
NL30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SI30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
TR30.09.2020
IE21.11.2020
LU21.11.2020
BE30.11.2020
CH30.11.2020
LI30.11.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
[2022/33]
Former [2022/27]HU21.11.2017
AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CY30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
DK30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
ES30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
IT30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
MC30.09.2020
MT30.09.2020
NL30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SI30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
TR30.09.2020
IE21.11.2020
LU21.11.2020
CH30.11.2020
LI30.11.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
Former [2022/23]AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
DK30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
ES30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
IT30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
MC30.09.2020
NL30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SI30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
IE21.11.2020
LU21.11.2020
CH30.11.2020
LI30.11.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
Former [2022/10]AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
DK30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
ES30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
IT30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
MC30.09.2020
NL30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SI30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
IE21.11.2020
LU21.11.2020
CH30.11.2020
LI30.11.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
PT01.02.2021
Former [2021/50]AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
DK30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
ES30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
IT30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
MC30.09.2020
NL30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SI30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
IE21.11.2020
LU21.11.2020
CH30.11.2020
LI30.11.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
Former [2021/48]AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
DK30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
ES30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
IT30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
MC30.09.2020
NL30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
IE21.11.2020
LU21.11.2020
CH30.11.2020
LI30.11.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
Former [2021/46]AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
DK30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
ES30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
MC30.09.2020
NL30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
IE21.11.2020
LU21.11.2020
CH30.11.2020
LI30.11.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
Former [2021/37]AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
DK30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
ES30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
MC30.09.2020
NL30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
LU21.11.2020
CH30.11.2020
LI30.11.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
Former [2021/33]AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
ES30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
MC30.09.2020
NL30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
LU21.11.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
Former [2021/31]AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
ES30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
MC30.09.2020
NL30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
Former [2021/30]AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
ES30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
NL30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
Former [2021/28]AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
ES30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
Former [2021/25]AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
ES30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
Former [2021/23]AT30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
PT01.02.2021
Former [2021/22]CZ30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
PT01.02.2021
Former [2021/21]FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
PT01.02.2021
Former [2021/20]FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
Former [2021/10]FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
Former [2021/08]FI30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
Former [2021/07]FI30.09.2020
NO30.12.2020
Documents cited:Search[A]GB2349676  (LUCAS IND PLC [GB]) [A] 1-20* the whole document *;
 [XI]US2004100146  (GIERS BERNHARD [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4-19 * figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0024] * [I] 3,20;
 [XI]CN1757551  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-13,15-19 * figures 1,19,22 * * page 42, line 22 - line 28 * * page 50, line 14 - line 19 * [I] 3,14,20;
 [XI]WO2011105405  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-8,10-15,17-19 * figures 2,5 * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0048] * [I] 20;
 [A]WO2014135370  (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2015035353  (DRUMM STEFAN A [DE]) [A] 3 * figures 1,2 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.