EP3332997 - VEHICLE INCLUDING STEERING STABILIZING IONIZER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.05.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2018/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SETOGUCHI, Daisuke c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
KATO, Yasushi c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 03 /
YAMADA, Koshi c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2018/24] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/24] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 17203863.0 | 27.11.2017 | [2018/24] | Priority number, date | JP20160239836 | 09.12.2016 Original published format: JP 2016239836 | [2018/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3332997 | Date: | 13.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B60H3/00, B60H1/24, A61L9/22, // F24F3/16 | [2018/24] | CPC: |
A61L9/22 (EP,US);
B60R16/06 (CN);
B62D37/02 (US);
B60H1/00564 (US);
B60H1/00821 (US);
B60H1/00985 (US);
B60H1/242 (EP,US);
B60H3/0071 (EP,CN,US);
F15D1/0075 (US);
F24F8/30 (EP,US);
H05F3/06 (CN);
A61L2209/16 (EP,US);
B60S1/023 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRZEUG MIT EINEM LENKUNGSSTABILISIERENDEN IONISIERER | [2018/24] | English: | VEHICLE INCLUDING STEERING STABILIZING IONIZER | [2018/24] | French: | VÉHICULE COMPRENANT UN IONISEUR STABILISATEUR DE DIRECTION | [2018/24] | Examination procedure | 27.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/24] | 27.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/24] | 21.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/24] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3662217 (BERCKHEIM CONSTANTIN GRAF VON) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2011020711 (BEHR GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [Y] 9* page 17, line 22 - page 18, line 20; figure 1 *; | [XYI]DE102014005955 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [X] 1-7 * paragraphs [0021] - [0026]; figure 1 * [Y] 9 [I] 8; | [XI]DE102014102826 (PORSCHE AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5 * the whole document * [I] 4,6 | by applicant | JP2016168951 |