EP3330171 - APPARATUS FOR PREDICTING A POWER CONSUMPTION OF A MARITIME VESSEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.08.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.03.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.01.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 19.07.2023 [2023/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Offshore Navigation Limited 201 Rogers Office Building Edwin Wallace Rey Drive 2640 George Hill / AI | [2018/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOKKEN, Sverre Nicou Pattichi 26 3071 Limassol / CY | 02 /
MAO, Wengang Chalmers University of Technology 412 96 Gothenburg / SE | 03 /
ANAGNOSTOPOULOS, Alexis G.M.S. Global Maritime Services Ltd. 12 Hibel Road Macclesfield, Cheshire SK10 2AB / GB | [2020/17] |
Former [2018/23] | 01 /
DOKKEN, Sverre Nicou Pattichi 26 3071 Limassol / CY | ||
02 /
MAO, Wengang c/o Chalmers University of Technology SE-412 96 Gothenburg / SE | |||
03 /
ANAGNOSTOPOULOS, Alexis c/o G.M.S. Global Maritime Services Ltd. 12 Hibel Road, Macclesfield Cheshire, SK10 2AB / GB | Representative(s) | Patentship Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Paul-Gerhardt-Allee 50 81245 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/23] | Patentship Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elsenheimerstraße 65 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17204814.2 | 30.11.2017 | [2018/23] | Priority number, date | EP20160201572 | 30.11.2016 Original published format: EP 16201572 | [2018/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3330171 | Date: | 06.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3330171 | Date: | 08.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3330171 | Date: | 09.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/20, B63B49/00, G01W1/10, G01W1/00 | [2020/07] | CPC: |
G01C21/203 (EP);
B63B49/00 (EP);
G01W1/10 (EP);
G01W2001/006 (EP);
G06N20/00 (EP);
Y02T70/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2018/30] | B63B49/00, B63B9/00, G01C21/20, G01W1/00, G01W1/10 | ||
Former IPC [2018/23] | B63B49/00, B63B9/00, G01C21/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/02] |
Former [2018/23] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR VORHERSAGE DES STROMVERBRAUCHS EINES SEESCHIFFES | [2018/23] | English: | APPARATUS FOR PREDICTING A POWER CONSUMPTION OF A MARITIME VESSEL | [2018/23] | French: | APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE PRÉDIRE UNE CONSOMMATION D'ÉNERGIE D'UN VAISSEAU MARITIME | [2018/23] | Examination procedure | 03.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/02] | 03.12.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.12.2019 | 12.12.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 31.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.07.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP20194982.3 / EP3825651 | Opposition(s) | 10.06.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.11.2017 | AL | 09.09.2020 | AT | 09.09.2020 | CY | 09.09.2020 | CZ | 09.09.2020 | DK | 09.09.2020 | EE | 09.09.2020 | ES | 09.09.2020 | HR | 09.09.2020 | IT | 09.09.2020 | LT | 09.09.2020 | LV | 09.09.2020 | MC | 09.09.2020 | MK | 09.09.2020 | MT | 09.09.2020 | PL | 09.09.2020 | RO | 09.09.2020 | RS | 09.09.2020 | SI | 09.09.2020 | SK | 09.09.2020 | SM | 09.09.2020 | TR | 09.09.2020 | NL | 23.09.2020 | BE | 30.11.2020 | CH | 30.11.2020 | IE | 30.11.2020 | LI | 30.11.2020 | LU | 30.11.2020 | BG | 09.12.2020 | GR | 10.12.2020 | IS | 09.01.2021 | PT | 11.01.2021 | [2023/29] |
Former [2022/33] | HU | 30.11.2017 | |
AL | 09.09.2020 | ||
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CY | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
IT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
MK | 09.09.2020 | ||
MT | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
TR | 09.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
IE | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
LU | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 30.11.2017 | |
AL | 09.09.2020 | ||
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CY | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
IT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
MT | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
TR | 09.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
IE | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
LU | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
IT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
IE | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
LU | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
IE | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
LU | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
LU | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
LU | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
LU | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 09.09.2020 | |
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 09.09.2020 | |
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | HR | 09.09.2020 | |
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/10] | HR | 09.09.2020 | |
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | LT | 09.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2015149074 (LEPISTÖ MIKKO [FI], et al) [X] 1,13,15 * paragraphs [0005] , [0022] - [0024] - [0029] - [0030] - [0033] - [0034] - [0041] , [0047] , [0063] - [0068] * [I] 6-12,14; | [XA]US2016251064 (ISHIOKA MASAHITO [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,12,13,15 * paragraphs [0030] , [0031] , [0 32] , [0033] , [0035] , [0036] , [0 56] - [0060] - [0062] , [0063] , [0071] , [0072]; figure 2 * [A] 6-11,14; | [A] - "Training, test, and validation sets", (20161129), Wikipedia, URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Training,_test,_and_validation_sets&oldid=752127502, (20180618), XP002782141 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - "Regression analysis", (20161128), Wikipedia, URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Regression_analysis&oldid=751970896, (20180618), XP002782142 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |