EP3349027 - METHOD FOR OFFSET COMPENSATION OF A SENSOR SIGNAL OF A HALL SENSOR AND SENSOR ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.08.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.02.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastraße 27c 80686 München / DE | [2018/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stahl-Offergeld, Markus Dieselstr. 14 91058 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
Sand, Markus St.-Jodok-Straße 6 92723 Tännesberg / DE | 03 /
Hohe, Hans-Peter Burggrub 28 91332 Heiligenstadt / DE | [2018/29] | Representative(s) | Hersina, Günter, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [2018/29] | Application number, filing date | 17206737.3 | 12.12.2017 | [2018/29] | Priority number, date | DE201610225305 | 16.12.2016 Original published format: DE102016225305 | [2018/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3349027 | Date: | 18.07.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3349027 | Date: | 25.07.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3349027 | Date: | 16.10.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/00, G01R33/07 | [2018/29] | CPC: |
G01R33/0017 (EP,US);
G01R33/0029 (EP,US);
G01R33/0064 (EP,US);
G01R33/07 (EP,US);
G01R33/075 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/10] |
Former [2018/29] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR OFFSET-KOMPENSATION EINES SENSORSIGNALS EINES HALL-SENSORS UND SENSORANORDNUNG | [2018/29] | English: | METHOD FOR OFFSET COMPENSATION OF A SENSOR SIGNAL OF A HALL SENSOR AND SENSOR ARRANGEMENT | [2018/29] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMPENSATION OFFSET D'UN SIGNAL DE CAPTEUR D'UN CAPTEUR À EFFET HALL ET DISPOSITIF CAPTEUR | [2018/29] | Examination procedure | 25.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/10] | 25.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 14.08.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.09.2019 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 04.09.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/39] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.12.2017 | AL | 16.10.2019 | CY | 16.10.2019 | CZ | 16.10.2019 | DK | 16.10.2019 | EE | 16.10.2019 | ES | 16.10.2019 | FI | 16.10.2019 | HR | 16.10.2019 | IT | 16.10.2019 | LT | 16.10.2019 | LV | 16.10.2019 | MC | 16.10.2019 | MK | 16.10.2019 | MT | 16.10.2019 | NL | 16.10.2019 | PL | 16.10.2019 | RO | 16.10.2019 | RS | 16.10.2019 | SE | 16.10.2019 | SI | 16.10.2019 | SK | 16.10.2019 | SM | 16.10.2019 | TR | 16.10.2019 | IE | 12.12.2019 | LU | 12.12.2019 | FR | 16.12.2019 | BE | 31.12.2019 | BG | 16.01.2020 | NO | 16.01.2020 | GR | 17.01.2020 | IS | 16.02.2020 | PT | 17.02.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 12.12.2017 | |
AL | 16.10.2019 | ||
CY | 16.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
IT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
MC | 16.10.2019 | ||
MT | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
SI | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
TR | 16.10.2019 | ||
IE | 12.12.2019 | ||
LU | 12.12.2019 | ||
FR | 16.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/34] | HU | 12.12.2017 | |
AL | 16.10.2019 | ||
CY | 16.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
IT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
MC | 16.10.2019 | ||
MT | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
SI | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
IE | 12.12.2019 | ||
LU | 12.12.2019 | ||
FR | 16.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 12.12.2017 | |
AL | 16.10.2019 | ||
CY | 16.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
IT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
MC | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
SI | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
IE | 12.12.2019 | ||
LU | 12.12.2019 | ||
FR | 16.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
CY | 16.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
IT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
MC | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
SI | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
IE | 12.12.2019 | ||
LU | 12.12.2019 | ||
FR | 16.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
IT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
MC | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
SI | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
IE | 12.12.2019 | ||
LU | 12.12.2019 | ||
FR | 16.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
IT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
MC | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
IE | 12.12.2019 | ||
LU | 12.12.2019 | ||
FR | 16.12.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
IT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
MC | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
IE | 12.12.2019 | ||
LU | 12.12.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
IT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
MC | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
IT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 16.10.2019 | |
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 16.10.2019 | |
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 16.10.2019 | |
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 16.10.2019 | |
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NL | 16.10.2019 | |
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | NL | 16.10.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1498697 (ASAHI KASEI EMD CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-26 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0079] ** abstract *; | [A]DE102007044471 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [A] 1-26 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0046] * * abstract * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0026] *; | [YA]DE102011102483 (AUSTRIAMICROSYSTEMS AG [AT]) [Y] 1-3,7,8,11-15,17-19,22,23 * abstract * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0055] * [A] 4-6,9,10,16,20,21,24-26; | [YA]US2014225597 (ROMERO HERNAN D [AR], et al) [Y] 1-3,7,8,11-15,17-19,22,23 * abstract * * paragraph [0138] - paragraph [0140] * * paragraph [0157] - paragraph [0164] * [A] 4-6,9,10,16,20,21,24-26; | [YA]US2014266176 (FERNANDEZ DEVON [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,7,8,11-15,17-19,22,23 * abstract * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0069] * * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0096] * * paragraph [0115] - paragraph [0116] * * paragraph [0125] * * paragraph [0131] - paragraph [0133] * * paragraph [0139] * * paragraph [0189] - paragraph [0191] * [A] 4-6,9,10,16,20,21,24-26; | [A]US2015338473 (DIACONU AURELIAN [US]) [A] 1-26 * abstract * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0080] * * paragraph [0107] - paragraph [0113] *; | [A] - TIMO KAUFMANN ET AL, "Piezoresistive Response of Vertical Hall Devices", IEEE SENSORS JOURNAL, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20111101), vol. 11, no. 11, doi:10.1109/JSEN.2011.2153194, ISSN 1530-437X, pages 2628 - 2635, XP011363316 [A] 1-26 * abstract * * und entsprechende Beschreibungen. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JSEN.2011.2153194 |