EP3506207 - DYNAMIC STREETVIEW WITH VIEW IMAGES ENHANCEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.04.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Centre National d'Etudes Spatiales 2, Place Maurice Quentin 75039 Paris Cedex 01 / FR | [2019/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARMET, François-Xavier 27, av. du Général de Gaulle 31600 MURET / FR | [2019/27] | Representative(s) | Germain Maureau 12, rue Boileau 69006 Lyon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2019/27] | Nguyen-Van-Yen, Christian Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble Visium 22, Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 17306946.9 | 28.12.2017 | [2019/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3506207 | Date: | 03.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06T11/00, G06F17/30, G06Q30/02 | [2019/27] | CPC: |
G06T11/00 (EP);
G01C21/3691 (US);
G01C21/3647 (EP);
G06F16/29 (US);
G06Q30/0241 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/06] |
Former [2019/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DYNAMISCHE STRASSENANSICHT MIT SICHTBILDVERBESSERUNG | [2019/27] | English: | DYNAMIC STREETVIEW WITH VIEW IMAGES ENHANCEMENT | [2019/27] | French: | STREETVIEW DYNAMIQUE À IMAGES DE VISUALISATION AMÉLIORÉES | [2019/27] | Examination procedure | 26.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/06] | 26.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2010250581 (CHAU STEPHEN [US]); | [X]US2014297575 (RAPOPORT EVAN [US], et al); | [X]US2014324843 (RAPOPORT EVAN [US], et al); | [X]WO2015000434 (TENCENT TECH SHENZHEN CO LTD [CN]) | by applicant | US2014277939 | US9695100 |