EP3270750 - BEVERAGE MAKER, IN PARTICULAR COFFEE MACHINE, FOR MAINS-WATER CONNECTION, AND MAINS-WATER KIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WMF Group GmbH Eberhardstrasse 35 73312 Geislingen/Steige / DE | [2018/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EICKE, Joel Virchowstraße 56 89075 Ulm / DE | 02 /
GÖLTENBOTH, Frank Hangweg 8 89134 Blaustein / DE | 03 /
STÄB, Rolf Rosenweg 6 89191 Nellingen / DE | [2018/04] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2018/04] | Application number, filing date | 17704480.7 | 13.02.2017 | [2018/04] | WO2017EP53148 | Priority number, date | DE201610202257 | 15.02.2016 Original published format: DE102016202257 | [2018/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017140618 | Date: | 24.08.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3270750 | Date: | 24.01.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.08.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3270750 | Date: | 29.04.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/44, A47J31/46 | [2018/04] | CPC: |
A47J31/462 (EP,KR,US);
A47J31/4403 (EP,KR,US);
A47J31/5251 (EP,US);
A47J31/521 (KR);
A47J31/525 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GETRÄNKEBEREITER, INSBESONDERE KAFFEEMASCHINE, FÜR FESTWASSERANSCHLUSS SOWIE FESTWASSERKIT | [2018/04] | English: | BEVERAGE MAKER, IN PARTICULAR COFFEE MACHINE, FOR MAINS-WATER CONNECTION, AND MAINS-WATER KIT | [2018/04] | French: | APPAREIL DE PRÉPARATION DE BOISSONS, EN PARTICULIER MACHINE À CAFÉ, POUR RACCORDEMENT À UNE ARRIVÉE D'EAU ET KIT DE RACCORDEMENT À UNE ARRIVÉE D'EAU | [2018/04] | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/04] | 19.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 01.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.02.2017 | AL | 29.04.2020 | CY | 29.04.2020 | CZ | 29.04.2020 | DK | 29.04.2020 | EE | 29.04.2020 | ES | 29.04.2020 | FI | 29.04.2020 | HR | 29.04.2020 | LT | 29.04.2020 | LV | 29.04.2020 | MC | 29.04.2020 | RO | 29.04.2020 | RS | 29.04.2020 | SE | 29.04.2020 | SI | 29.04.2020 | SK | 29.04.2020 | SM | 29.04.2020 | BG | 29.07.2020 | NO | 29.07.2020 | GR | 30.07.2020 | IS | 29.08.2020 | PT | 31.08.2020 | [2023/33] |
Former [2023/30] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
CY | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/41] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 29.04.2020 | |
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 29.08.2020 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9827852 (GRINDMASTER CORP [US]) [Y] 1-14 * figure 1 *; | [Y]WO2005077232 (BUNN O MATIC CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-14* With reference to Fig. 1, the water delivery system 24 as disclosed includes but is not limited to several components, structures and features. An entry end 46 of a water supply line 48 is connected to a check valve assembly 50 between the water reservoir 22 cavity 42 and the supply line 48. The check valve assembly 50 functions to allow water to flow from the reservoir 22 to the entry end 46 when the reservoir is positioned on the base 101. When the reservoir 22 is removed from the base 101 as described in greater detail below, the check valve assembly prevents leakage of water from the reservoir and from the entry end 46. A pump feed end 52 of the water supply line 48 spaced from the entry end 46 connects to a pump assembly 54. The pump assembly 54 as illustrated is a gear pump of known construction. While a gear pump 54 is illustrated in figure 4, other varieties of pumps may be used including but not limited to peristaltic pumps, piston pump, wave pumps, diaphragm pumps as well as other pumps which move water from one position to another. The gear pump 54 and operation thereof will be described in greater detail hereinbelow. The pump 54 provides a positive pumping action on water supplied from the reservoir 22 through the supply line 48. Water pumped from the pump assembly 54 is moved through a inlet line 56 to a heater assembly 58. The heater assembly 58 includes a cavity 60 which retains a quantity of water for heating by a heating element;; figure 1 *; | [XY]US2015245736 (REYHANLOO SHAHRYAR [CH]) [X] 1 * [0040] Die Steuereinrichtung 30 ist weiterhin mit einer Signalleitung 33 verbunden, welche zumindest in Teilen durch das Gehäuse des Festwasserclips 13 zu einem ersten Füllstandsensor 41 und einem zweiten Füllstandsensor 42, die an einer Sensorlanze 40 angeordnet sind, führt und eine elektrische Signalverbindung mit den Füllstandsensoren 41, 42 herstellt. Sensorlanze 40, erster Füllstandsensor 41 sowie zweiter Füllstandsensor 42 sind in der vergrösserten Darstellung des Festwasserclips 13 in Fig. 2 zu erkennen. [0041] Ferner werden über die Signalleitung 33 zusätzlich Informationen an die Steuereinrichtung 30 übertragen, die kennzeichnen, ob der Festwasserclip 13 ordnungsgemäss auf den Wasserbehälter 10 gesteckt wurde. Hierzu weist der Festwasserclip 13 einen Detektionsschalter 121 auf, der ein entsprechendes Signal an die Steuereinrichtung 30 übermittelt. Für den Fall, dass der Festwasserclip 13 nicht ordnungsgemäss an dem Wasserbehälter 10 montiert wurde, ist vorgesehen, dass die Steuereinrichtung 30 ein Befüllen des Wasserbehälters 10, d. h. ein Öffnen des Servomagnetventils 20, verhindert. Gleichzeitig wird ein optisches Signal an den Bediener ausgegeben, indem die Steuereinrichtung 30 über die Signalleitung 33 eine LED 120 aktiviert. [0042] Der erste Füllstandsensor 41 ist auf einem ersten Wasserfüllstandsniveau angeordnet und gibt ein entsprechendes Signal über die Signalleitung 33 an die Steuereinrichtung 30 aus, wenn er von Flüssigkeit benetzt ist, d. h. sobald der ihm zugeordnete Füllstand innerhalb des Wasserbehälters 10 erreicht oder überschritten wird. In entsprechender Weise übermittelt der darüberliegend angeordnete zweite Füllstandsensor 42 ebenfalls ein Signal über die Signalleitung 33 an die Steuereinrichtung 30, sobald ein zweiter Füllstand, d. h. ein höherer Füllstand innerhalb des Wasserbehälters 10 erreicht oder überschritten wird.; paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0042]; figure 1 * [Y] 2-14 | by applicant | CH706100 | EP2702908 | DE102014212645 |